CARTER v. GIANNA
Plaintiff: KEVIN CARTER
Defendant: SALVATORE GIANNA
Case Number: 3:2017cv02709
Filed: April 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Lois H. Goodman
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Shipp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/26/2019. (jem)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM and ORDER Dismissing all claims against Defendant NJ TRANSIT CORPORATION without prejudice. Plaintiff's time to serve Defendant Gianna is extended 90 days. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 1/18/2018. (km)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the entire Complaint is permitted to proceed. The Clerk shall issue summons ad the United States Marshal shall serve the summons, the Complaint and this Order upon Defendant. Defendant shall file and serve an answer. The Clerk shall notify Plaintiff of the opportunity to apply in writing to the assigned judge for the appointment of pro bono counsel. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 6/12/2017. (mps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARTER v. GIANNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALVATORE GIANNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?