ZIGICH v. LANIGAN et al
Plaintiff: GARRY S. ZIGICH, JR.
Defendant: GARY M. LANIGAN, UNIVERSITY CORRECTIONAL HEALTHCARE, ARTHUR BREWER and IHUOMA NWACHUKWU
Case Number: 3:2017cv06105
Filed: August 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Douglas E. Arpert
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Shipp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 5/21/2019. (mps)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the entire Complaint is permitted to proceed past 28 USC 1915 screening; that the Clerk shall issue summons to be served by the US Marshals Service; directing the Clerk to mail Plaintiff certain forms. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 3/26/2018. (mmh)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting Plaintiff's IFP Application. Summons shall not be issued at this time. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 10/11/2017. (km)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED; that Plaintiff shall, within 30 days of this Order, cure the deficiencies in the IFP application; that for the purposes of the preliminary injunction application the Clerk shall serve a copy of this Order on the Attorney General for the State of New Jersey and the Administrator of the New Jersey State Prison. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/13/2017. (mmh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZIGICH v. LANIGAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARRY S. ZIGICH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY M. LANIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY CORRECTIONAL HEALTHCARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARTHUR BREWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IHUOMA NWACHUKWU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?