JONES v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: LEE JONES
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2017cv06777
Filed: September 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Peter G. Sheridan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 1/16/2018. (mps)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Respondent shall file a full and complete answer to the Motion within 45 days of the entry of this Order. Petitioner may file and serve a reply in support of the Motion within 45 days after the answer is filed. The Clerk shall serve this Order on Petitioner by regular mail. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 11/7/2017. (mps)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Petitioner's 2 Motion for Pro Bono Counsel is denied without prejudice. The Clerk shall administratively terminate this case. The Clerk shall forward Petitioner a blank form for a Motion under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 A 0243 (modified): DNJ-Habeas-004 (Rev. 01-2014). If Petitioner wishes to reopen the case he shall notify the Court within 30 days of the date of entry of this Memorandum and Order. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this Order upon Petitioner by regular mail. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 9/7/2017. (mps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LEE JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: COURTNEY A. HOWARD
Represented By: FABIANA PIERRE-LOUIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?