SAUVE v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Plaintiff: APRIL SAUVE
Defendant: IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC ("IMERYS TALC"), JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON and PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL ("PCPC")
In Re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 3:2017cv12515
Filed: December 4, 2017
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Trenton Office
County: Middlesex
0 Judge: Lois H Goodman
1 Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2018 10 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney ROLF T. FIEBIGER terminated. Attorney STACY KATHRYN HAUER for APRIL SAUVE added.. (HAUER, STACY)
January 22, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by LORNA A. DOTRO on behalf of IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC ("IMERYS TALC") (DOTRO, LORNA)
December 28, 2017 8 NOTICE of Appearance by GENE M. WILLIAMS on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (WILLIAMS, GENE)
December 28, 2017 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (TERSIGNI, JULIE)
December 28, 2017 6 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (SHARKO, SUSAN)
December 20, 2017 5 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT)
December 19, 2017 4 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN)
December 18, 2017 3 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS T. LOCKE on behalf of PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL ("PCPC") (LOCKE, THOMAS)
December 6, 2017 Member Case Direct File on 12/4/2017, for MDL 2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (mfg, )
December 6, 2017 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC ("IMERYS TALC"), JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC, PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL ("PCPC") Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *MARIA F. GARCIA* (mfg, )
December 5, 2017 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (sab)
December 4, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC ("IMERYS TALC"), JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC, PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL ("PCPC") ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8302152) with JURY DEMAND, filed by APRIL SAUVE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(FIEBIGER, ROLF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAUVE v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APRIL SAUVE
Represented By: ROLF T. FIEBIGER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC ("IMERYS TALC")
Represented By: LORNA A. DOTRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC
Represented By: GENE M. WILLIAMS
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Represented By: KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Represented By: SUSAN M. SHARKO
Represented By: JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: GENE M. WILLIAMS
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Represented By: KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Represented By: SUSAN M. SHARKO
Represented By: JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL ("PCPC")
Represented By: THOMAS T. LOCKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?