LEWIS v. MILLS et al
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY M. LEWIS
Defendant: T. MILLS, TAPIA, BANZ, D. ROSA, LOCORRIERE and I. ORTIZ
Case Number: 3:2017cv12798
Filed: December 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Lois H. Goodman
Presiding Judge: Brian R. Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM ORDER that within 45 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff may file a supplemental brief addressing the issues identified herein; should Plaintiff fail to file a supplemental brief, the Court will adjudicate the Motion with the briefin g already submitted; within 30 days after Plaintiff files his supplemental brief, the Medical Defendants may submit a response; the Clerk of the Court shall ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE the Medical Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 70 ; upon completion of the supplemental briefing, the Court will re-instate the Motion. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 7/22/2019. (jem)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's excessive force and failure to protect claims against Defendants Mills, Tapia, Banz, Rosa, Locorriere, and Ortiz shall proceed at this time. The Clerk shall mail to Plaintiff a transmittal letter explaining the procedure for completing United States Marshal 285 Forms. The Clerk of the Court shall serve Plaintiff with copies of this Order via regular mail. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 3/1/2018. (mps)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is denied without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall administratively terminate this case. The Clerk of the Court shall send Plaintiff a blank form application t o proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff wishes to reopen this case, he shall notify the Court with 30 days of the date of entry of this Order. The Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Order upon Plaintiff by regular U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 12/11/2017. (mps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEWIS v. MILLS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY M. LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. MILLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAPIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. ROSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOCORRIERE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. ORTIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?