PATHEON SOFTGELS INC. et al v. APOTEX INC. et al
Plaintiff: PATHEON SOFTGELS INC., BIONPHARMA INC. and BIONPHARMA HEALTHCARE LLC
Defendant: APOTEX CORP., APOTEX INC., CATALENT PHARMA SOLUTIONS, LLC and OHM LABORATORIES INC.
Case Number: 3:2017cv13819
Filed: December 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER adding Catalent as a Defendant and Order of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 6/04/2019. (jem)
June 3, 2019 Filing 103 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Michael A. Shipp, U.S.D.J. regarding executed Stipulation and proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
June 3, 2019 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by ARNOLD B. CALMANN on behalf of CATALENT PHARMA SOLUTIONS, LLC (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
May 24, 2019 Filing 101 Letter from Winston & Strawn LLP. (RICHTER, JAMES)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 LETTER ORDER: Plaintiffs' Opposition to Ohm's Motion to Substitute is due 5/24/2019. Ohm's Reply is due 5/31/2019. Deadline for Parties to Move to Amend Pleadings or Add Parties is due 6/7/2019. Fact Discovery due by 7/12/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 9/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 5/7/2019. (mps)
May 2, 2019 Filing 99 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Lois H. Goodman, U.S.M.J. re #98 Order,. (WALSH, LIZA)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 LETTER ORDER that Plaintiffs' Opposition to Ohm's Motion to Substitute is due 5/3/2019. Ohm's Reply in further support of its Motion is due 5/10/2019. The deadline for parties to move to amend the pleadings or add parties is due 5/17/2019. Fact Discovery due 6/21/2019. Dispositive Motions due 9/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 4/26/2019. (mps)
April 12, 2019 Filing 97 Letter from Winston & Strawn LLP re #95 Scheduling Order,. (RICHTER, JAMES)
March 29, 2019 Filing 96 Letter from Liza M. Walsh on Behalf of All Parties. (WALSH, LIZA)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 LETTER ORDER: Plaintiffs' opposition to Ohm's #83 Motion to Substitute is due 3/29/2019. Ohm's reply is due 4/5/2019. Any motion to amend the pleadings or add new parties is due 4/12/2019. Fact Discovery due by 5/17/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/29/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 3/20/2019. (mps)
March 14, 2019 Filing 94 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Lois H. Goodman, U.S.M.J. Requesting Extension of Certain Deadlines. (WALSH, LIZA)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 LETTER ORDER that Plaintiffs' Opposition to Ohm's Motion to Substitute is due 3/15/2019. Ohm's Reply in further support of its Motion is due 3/22/2019. The deadline for parties to move to amend the pleadings or add parties is due 3/29/2019. Fact Discovery due 5/3/2019. Dispositive Motions due 7/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 2/15/2019. (mps)
February 8, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Telephone Conference held on 2/8/2019. (if, )
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 LETTER ORDER that Plaintiffs' Opposition to Ohm's #83 Motion to Substitute is due 2/15/2019. Ohm's Reply is due 2/22/2019. Fact Discovery is due 4/5/2019. Dispositive Motions are due 6/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 2/5/2019. (mps)
February 1, 2019 Filing 91 Letter from Winston & Strawn LLP. (RICHTER, JAMES)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 TEXT ORDER that the telephonic status conference scheduled for 01/29/2019 is hereby adjourned to 02/08/2019 at 12:00 p.m. Counsel for Plaintiff is to initiate the call to chambers at that time. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 01/29/2019. (Gonzalez, P)
January 28, 2019 Filing 89 Letter from Winston & Strawn LLP re request to adjourn January 29 Status Call. (RICHTER, JAMES)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 LETTER ORDER that Plaintiffs' Opposition to Ohm's Motion to Substitute is due 2/1/2019. Ohm's Reply in further support of it's Motion is due 2/8/2019. Deadline for Parties to move to amend pleadings or add parties is due 2/15/2019. Fact Discovery is due 3/22/2019. Counsel are to report as to the status by 1/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 1/18/2019. (mps)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendants APOTEX CORP. and APOTEX INC. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 1/9/2019. (mps)
January 8, 2019 Filing 86 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Michael A. Shipp enclosing Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 LETTER ORDER extending deadlines listed herein; all other deadlines of the 12/11/2018 Scheduling Order shall remain the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 1/4/2019. (km)
December 17, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #83 MOTION to Substitute Party . Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
December 14, 2018 Filing 84 BRIEF in Support of Motion to Substitute (filed under seal) with supporting exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-I (Under seal))(RICHTER, JAMES)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
December 14, 2018 Filing 83 MOTION to Substitute Party by OHM LABORATORIES INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Richter, #2 Exhibit J, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(RICHTER, JAMES)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #78 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 12/14/2018. (mps)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #66 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 12/14/2018. (mps)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 LETTER ORDER: Any motion to amend the pleadings or join new parties is due 1/18/2019. Fact Discovery due by 3/15/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 12/11/2018. (mps)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/29/2019 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Counsel for Plaintiffs is to initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 12/6/2018. (mps)
December 3, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #78 MOTION to Seal submissions in connection with substitution reques and Supporting Documents. Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
November 30, 2018 Filing 78 MOTION to Seal submissions in connection with substitution reques and Supporting Documents by OHM LABORATORIES INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Index, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(RICHTER, JAMES)
November 26, 2018 Filing 77 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by APOTEX CORP., APOTEX INC..(BLANEY, RYAN)
November 20, 2018 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Telephone Conference held on 11/20/2018. (if, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 76 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Lois Goodman regarding Ohm's request to substitute Catalent as a Defendant and Ohm's production pursuant L. Pat. R. 3.6(j) re #75 Letter,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(WALSH, LIZA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 16, 2018 ATTENTION COUNSEL: The Telephone Conference Call scheduled for 11/16/18 with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman has been rescheduled to 11/20/18 at 3:00 p.m. (if, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 75 Letter from Winston & Strawn re #74 Letter,, #68 Letter,. (RICHTER, JAMES)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 15, 2018 ATTENION COUNSEL: The Telephone Conference Call scheduled for 11/15/18 with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman has been rescheduled to 11/16/18 at 1:30 p.m. (if, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 74 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Lois H. Goodman, U.S.M.J. Regarding Ohm's Request for Substitution and Failure to Comply with Rule 3.6(j). (WALSH, LIZA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 12, 2018 Filing 73 AMENDED COMPLAINT against APOTEX CORP., APOTEX INC., filed by BIONPHARMA INC., PATHEON SOFTGELS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(WALSH, LIZA)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #65 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 11/8/2018. (mps)
November 8, 2018 Filing 71 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Lois Goodman regarding Ohm's request to substitute Catalent as a Defendant. (WALSH, LIZA)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 LETTER ORDER that the Amended Complaint must be filed within 5 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 11/7/2018. (mps)
November 6, 2018 Filing 69 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Hon. Lois Goodman regarding Proposed Amended Complaint against Apotex. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(WALSH, LIZA)
October 30, 2018 Filing 68 Letter from Winston & Strawn LLP. (RICHTER, JAMES)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 TEXT ORDER setting a Telephone Conference Call for 11/15/18 at 12:00 p.m. with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Ms. O'Reilly to initiate the call at that time. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 10/29/18. (if, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 66 MOTION to Seal by OHM LABORATORIES INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Richter, #2 Index, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(RICHTER, JAMES)
October 29, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #66 MOTION to Seal . Motion set for 12/3/2018 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
October 29, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #65 MOTION to Seal Document #63 Redacted Document . Motion set for 11/19/2018 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
October 26, 2018 Filing 65 MOTION to Seal Document #63 Redacted Document by APOTEX CORP., APOTEX INC.. (Attachments: #1 Statement In Lieu Of Brief, #2 Exhibit (1) Material Sought to be Filed Under Seal from 10/12/18 Joint Status Letter, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(BLANEY, RYAN)
October 26, 2018 Filing 64 REDACTION to #52 Amended Document,, by All Plaintiffs. (WALSH, LIZA)
October 26, 2018 Filing 63 REDACTION to #50 Letter, by All Plaintiffs. (WALSH, LIZA)
October 26, 2018 Filing 62 REDACTION to #51 Letter, by All Plaintiffs. (WALSH, LIZA)
October 23, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, KERI L. SCHAUBERT, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mps)
October 22, 2018 Filing 61 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Keri L. Schaubert to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9112773.) (BLANEY, RYAN)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Keri L. Schaubert, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 10/19/2018. (mps)
October 19, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #59 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 11/19/2018 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
October 18, 2018 Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by APOTEX CORP., APOTEX INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Ryan P. Blaney, #2 Certification of Keri L. Schaubert, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(BLANEY, RYAN)
October 16, 2018 Filing 58 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Sky Adams to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9097687.) (WALSH, LIZA)
October 16, 2018 Filing 57 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Megan Y. Yung to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9097681.) (WALSH, LIZA)
October 16, 2018 Filing 56 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Anne S. Toker to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9097675.) (WALSH, LIZA)
October 16, 2018 Filing 55 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice John Christopher Rozendaal to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9097669.) (WALSH, LIZA)
October 16, 2018 Filing 54 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Joshua I. Miller to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9097661.) (WALSH, LIZA)
October 16, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, SKY ADAMS, MEGAN Y. YUNG, ANNE S. TOKER, JOHN CHRISTOPHER ROZENDAAL and JOSHUA I. MILLER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mps)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting admission pro hac vice as to Anne S. Toker, Esq., Megan Y. Yung, Esq. and Sky Adams, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 10/15/2018. (mmh)
October 15, 2018 Filing 52 AMENDED DOCUMENT by All Plaintiffs. Amendment to #51 Letter, from Liza Walsh re Ohm Status Update. (WALSH, LIZA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 12, 2018 Filing 51 Letter from Liza Walsh regarding Ohm matter. (WALSH, LIZA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 12, 2018 Filing 50 Letter from Liza Walsh regarding Apotex Matter. (WALSH, LIZA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TEXT ORDER that in light of the parties' letter #48 reporting that no claim construction is required for this matter, counsel are instructed to meet and confer as to an accelerated pretrial schedule and submit a joint proposed amended schedule by no later than 10/22/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 10/12/2018. (Gonzalez, P)
October 10, 2018 Filing 48 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Michael A. Shipp, U.S.D.J. Regarding Terms for Construction. (WALSH, LIZA)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 LETTER ORDER granting the application to withdraw attorney SEAN BOYLE as pro hac vice counsel for Patheon Softgels, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 10/1/2018. (mmh)
September 28, 2018 Filing 46 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Lois H. Goodman, U.S.M.J. Requesting Approval of Withdrawal of Pro Hac Vice Attorney, Sean Boyle. (WALSH, LIZA)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 TEXT ORDER setting a Telephone Conference Call for 11/26/18 at 10:00 a.m. with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Plaintiffs' counsel to initiate the call at that time. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 9/26/18. (if, )
September 25, 2018 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Telephone Conference held on 9/25/2018. (if, )
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 LETTER ORDER that Contentions are due 9/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 9/18/2018. (mps)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 LETTER ORDER granting request for an extension of certain deadlines. Deadline for Plaintiffs' Responsive Validity Contentions to Ohm is extended to 9/14/2018. Deadline for Plaintiffs' Responsive Validity Contentions to Apotex is extended to 9/21/2018. Deadline for the exchange of Proposed Terms for Construction between Plaintiffs and Apotex, and Plaintiffs and Ohm is extended to 9/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 9/12/2018. (mps)
September 5, 2018 Filing 42 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney SAMUEL SEHO PARK terminated. (RICHTER, JAMES)
August 22, 2018 Filing 41 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Michael A. Shipp, U.S.D.J. RE IPR Decisions. (WALSH, LIZA)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/27/2018. (mps)
July 25, 2018 Filing 39 Letter from Liza M. Walsh enclosing (Proposed) Discovery Confidentiality Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 LETTER ORDER granting request for a one-week extension to submit the Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/19/2018. (mps)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/25/2018 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Counsel for Plaintiff is to initiate the call. Any motion to amend the pleadings or join new parties is due 1/11/2019, returnable 2/4/2019. Fact Discovery due by 3/15/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/18/2018. (mps)
July 12, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES S. RICHTER on behalf of OHM LABORATORIES INC. (RICHTER, JAMES)
June 26, 2018 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/26/2018. (if, )
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 LETTER ORDER granting request for withdrawal of C. Kyle Musgrove, Esq., Elizabeth M. Crompton, Esq. and Yongjim Zhu, Esq.as pro hac vice counsel on behalf of Plaintiff.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 6/26/2018. (mps)
June 25, 2018 Filing 34 Letter from Liza M. Walsh re #24 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear. (WALSH, LIZA)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Joshua I. Miller, Esq. and John Christopher Rozendaal, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 6/12/2018. (mps)
June 12, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by DENNIES VARUGHESE on behalf of BIONPHARMA HEALTHCARE LLC, BIONPHARMA INC. (VARUGHESE, DENNIES)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CONSENT ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The related actions are consolidated for discovery and trial purposes. The parties shall file all documents in Civil Action No. 17-13819. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 5/18/2018. (mps)
May 15, 2018 Filing 30 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to The Honorable Michael A. Shipp, U.S.D.J. enclosing Consent Order on Consolidation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/26/2018 03:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 5/10/2018. (mps)
April 23, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, SEAN BOYLE, ELIZABETH M. CROMPTON, C. KYLE MUSGROVE and YONGJIN ZHU, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mmh)
April 20, 2018 Filing 28 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Yongjin Zhu to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8679975.) (WALSH, LIZA)
April 20, 2018 Filing 27 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice C. Kyle Musgrove to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8679965.) (WALSH, LIZA)
April 20, 2018 Filing 26 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Elizabeth M. Crompton to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8679951.) (WALSH, LIZA)
April 20, 2018 Filing 25 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Sean Boyle to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8679924.) (WALSH, LIZA)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to C. Kyle Musgrove, Esq., Elizabeth M. Crompton, Esq. and Yongjim Zhu, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 3/19/2018. (mmh)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CONSENT ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sean Boyle, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 3/13/2018. (mmh)
March 13, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 4/16/2018 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
March 12, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by PATHEON SOFTGELS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Liza M. Walsh, #2 Certification of Sean M. Boyle, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
March 9, 2018 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by APOTEX CORP., APOTEX INC. identifying Apotex Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (BLANEY, RYAN)
March 9, 2018 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint (Dkt. Entry #1 ) by APOTEX CORP., APOTEX INC..(BLANEY, RYAN)
March 8, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, KERRY B. MCTIGUE, BARRY P. GOLOB, WILLIAM BLAKE COBLENTZ, AARON S. LUKAS and ERIC J. CHOI, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mps)
March 7, 2018 Filing 19 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Eric J. Choi to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8532314.) (BLANEY, RYAN)
March 7, 2018 Filing 18 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Aaron S. Lukas to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8532293.) (BLANEY, RYAN)
March 7, 2018 Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice William Blake Coblentz to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8532280.) (BLANEY, RYAN)
March 7, 2018 Filing 16 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Barry P. Golob to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8532272.) (BLANEY, RYAN)
March 7, 2018 Filing 15 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Kerry B. McTigue to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8532249.) (BLANEY, RYAN)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to KERRY B. MCTIGUE, ESQ., BARRY P. GOLOB, ESQ., WILLIAM BLAKE COBLENTZ, ESQ., AARON S. LUKAS ESQ., and ERIC J. CHOI, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 2/28/2018. (mps)
February 27, 2018 Filing 13 Certification of Ryan P. Blaney in Support of Motion to admit Kerry B. McTigue, Barry P. Golob, William Blake Coblentz, Aaron S. Lukas and Eric J. Choi Pro Hac Vice on behalf of APOTEX CORP., APOTEX INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Ryan P. Blaney in support of Pro Hac Vice application of Kerry B. McTigue, Barry P. Golob, William Blake Coblentz, Aaron S. Lukas and Eric J. Choi, #2 Certification of Kerry B. McTigue, #3 Certification of Barry P. Golob, #4 Certification of William Blake Coblentz, #5 Certification of Aaron S. Lukas, #6 Certification Eric J. Choi, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(BLANEY, RYAN)
February 23, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by PATHEON SOFTGELS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Liza Walsh, #2 Certification of Kyle Musgrove, #3 Certification of Elizabeth Crompton, #4 Certification of Yongjin Zhu, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
February 23, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 3/19/2018 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
February 6, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN PATRICK BLANEY on behalf of APOTEX CORP., APOTEX INC. (BLANEY, RYAN)
February 1, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR on behalf of BIONPHARMA HEALTHCARE LLC, BIONPHARMA INC., PATHEON SOFTGELS INC. (WALSH, WILLIAM)
January 10, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PATHEON SOFTGELS INC., BIONPHARMA HEALTHCARE LLC, BIONPHARMA INC.. APOTEX INC. waiver sent on 1/8/2018, answer due 3/9/2018. (WALSH, LIZA)
January 10, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PATHEON SOFTGELS INC., BIONPHARMA HEALTHCARE LLC, BIONPHARMA INC.. APOTEX CORP. waiver sent on 1/8/2018, answer due 3/9/2018. (WALSH, LIZA)
January 3, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to APOTEX CORP., APOTEX INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiff's attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Moller* (jem)
January 3, 2018 Filing 6 AO120 Patent Form filed. (jem)
January 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by KATELYN O'REILLY on behalf of BIONPHARMA HEALTHCARE LLC, BIONPHARMA INC., PATHEON SOFTGELS INC. (O'REILLY, KATELYN)
December 29, 2017 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (dm )
December 29, 2017 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BIONPHARMA HEALTHCARE LLC, BIONPHARMA INC.. (WALSH, LIZA)
December 29, 2017 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PATHEON SOFTGELS INC. identifying THERMO FISHER SCIENTIFIC INC. as Corporate Parent.. (WALSH, LIZA)
December 29, 2017 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BIONPHARMA HEALTHCARE LLC, BIONPHARMA INC.. (WALSH, LIZA)
December 29, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against APOTEX CORP., APOTEX INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8363000), filed by PATHEON SOFTGELS INC., BIONPHARMA HEALTHCARE LLC, BIONPHARMA INC.. (Attachments: #1 AO120, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(WALSH, LIZA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PATHEON SOFTGELS INC. et al v. APOTEX INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATHEON SOFTGELS INC.
Represented By: KATELYN O'REILLY
Represented By: WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIONPHARMA INC.
Represented By: DENNIES VARUGHESE
Represented By: KATELYN O'REILLY
Represented By: WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIONPHARMA HEALTHCARE LLC
Represented By: DENNIES VARUGHESE
Represented By: KATELYN O'REILLY
Represented By: WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX CORP.
Represented By: RYAN PATRICK BLANEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX INC.
Represented By: RYAN PATRICK BLANEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATALENT PHARMA SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OHM LABORATORIES INC.
Represented By: JAMES S. RICHTER
Represented By: MELISSA STEEDLE BOGAD
Represented By: SAMUEL SEHO PARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?