ROGERS et al v. GREWAL et al

Plaintiff: ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC. and THOMAS R. ROGERS
Defendant: GURBIR GREWAL, PATRICK J. CALLAHAN, JOSEPH W. OXLEY, N. PETER CONFORTI and KENNETH J. BROWN, JR.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01544
Filed: February 5, 2018
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Trenton Office
County: Monmouth
0 Judge: Douglas E Arpert
1 Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2018 31 NOTICE of Appearance by MICCI J. WEISS on behalf of KENNETH J. BROWN, JR (WEISS, MICCI)
October 15, 2018 30 MANDATE of USCA granting motion for summary action as to #28 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC., THOMAS R. ROGERS (Finance notified) (ca3cjg)
June 21, 2018 29 USCA Case Number 18-2366 for #28 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC., THOMAS R. ROGERS. USCA Case Manager Carmella (Document Restricted - Court Only)(ca3cw, )
June 18, 2018 28 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #27 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #26 Opinion by ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC., THOMAS R. ROGERS. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0312-8821303. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
May 21, 2018 27 Featured Case ORDER that Defendants' motions to dismiss are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 5/21/2018. (mmh)
May 21, 2018 26 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 5/21/2018. (mmh)
May 14, 2018 25 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by PATRICK J. CALLAHAN, N. PETER CONFORTI, GURBIR GREWAL, JOSEPH W. OXLEY re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint in Lieu of Answer, #18 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LUCAS, BRYAN)
April 26, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint in Lieu of Answer. Motion reset for 5/21/2018 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
April 26, 2018 24 Featured Case LETTER ORDER that the pending Motion to Dismiss is adjourned to 5/21/2018. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 4/26/2018. (mmh)
April 25, 2018 23 Letter from Gurbir S. Grewal, Patrick J. Callahan, Hon. Joseph W. Oxley, J.S.C., and Hon. N. Peter Conforti, J.S.C. (LUCAS, BRYAN)
April 23, 2018 22 BRIEF in Opposition filed by ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC., THOMAS R. ROGERS re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint in Lieu of Answer, #18 MOTION to Dismiss (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
April 12, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, DAVID H. THOMPSON, PETER A. PATTERSON and JOHN D. OHLENDORF, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (km)
April 11, 2018 21 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice John D. Ohlendorf to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
April 11, 2018 20 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Peter A. Patterson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
April 11, 2018 19 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David H. Thompson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
April 11, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee of $300 received as to David H. Thompson, Esq., Peter A. Patterson, Esq., receipt number TRE090658. (jem)
April 11, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee OF $150 received as to John D. Ohlendorf, Esq., receipt number TRE090659. (jem)
April 11, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 5/7/2018 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
April 10, 2018 18 MOTION to Dismiss by KENNETH J. BROWN, JR. Responses due by 4/23/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(LASALLE, PAUL)
April 5, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER Granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to David H. Thompson, Peter A. Patterson, and John D. Ohlendorf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/5/2018. (km)
April 3, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint in Lieu of Answer. Motion set for 5/7/2018 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
April 3, 2018 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint in Lieu of Answer by PATRICK J. CALLAHAN, N. PETER CONFORTI, GURBIR GREWAL, JOSEPH W. OXLEY. Responses due by 4/23/2018 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Form of Order, #3 Brief)(LUCAS, BRYAN)
March 28, 2018 15 Featured Case CONSENT ORDER that Defendant Kenneth J. Brown, Jr. be permitted to respond to the Complaint by 4/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/27/2018. (mmh)
March 27, 2018 14 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL L LASALLE on behalf of KENNETH J. BROWN, JR (LASALLE, PAUL)
March 27, 2018 13 Proposed Pretrial Order Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by KENNETH J. BROWN, JR. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(LASALLE, PAUL)
March 5, 2018 12 Featured Case CONSENT ORDER that Defendants Gurbir S. Grewal, Patrick J. Callahan, Hon. Joseph W. Oxley, J.S.C. and Hon. N. Peter Conforti, J.S.C. are permitted to respond to the Complaint for an additional period of 21 days or no later than 4/3/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/5/2018. (mmh)
March 2, 2018 11 Letter from Defendants Gurbir S. Grewal, Patrick J. Callahan, Hon. Joseph W. Oxley, J.S.C., and Hon. N. Peter Conforti, J.S.C.. (LUCAS, BRYAN)
February 22, 2018 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THOMAS R. ROGERS, ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC.. N. PETER CONFORTI served on 2/6/2018, answer due 3/13/2018. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
February 22, 2018 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THOMAS R. ROGERS, ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC.. KENNETH J. BROWN, JR served on 2/6/2018, answer due 2/27/2018. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
February 22, 2018 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THOMAS R. ROGERS, ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC.. PATRICK J. CALLAHAN served on 2/6/2018, answer due 3/13/2018. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
February 22, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THOMAS R. ROGERS, ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC.. JOSEPH W. OXLEY served on 2/6/2018, answer due 3/13/2018. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
February 22, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THOMAS R. ROGERS, ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC.. GURBIR GREWAL served on 2/6/2018, answer due 3/13/2018. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
February 22, 2018 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Gurbir Grewal on 2/6/2018, filed by ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC., THOMAS R. ROGERS. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
February 16, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by JOSEPH W. OXLEY, PATRICK J. CALLAHAN, GURBIR GREWAL, N. PETER CONFORTI has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/13/2018. (mmh)
February 15, 2018 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants Gurbir S. Grewal, Patrick J. Callahan, Hon. Joseph W. Oxley, J.S.C., and Hon. N. Peter Conforti, J.S.C.. Attorney BRYAN EDWARD LUCAS for PATRICK J. CALLAHAN,BRYAN EDWARD LUCAS for N. PETER CONFORTI,BRYAN EDWARD LUCAS for GURBIR GREWAL,BRYAN EDWARD LUCAS for JOSEPH W. OXLEY added. (LUCAS, BRYAN)
February 5, 2018 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to KENNETH J. BROWN, JR, PATRICK J. CALLAHAN, N. PETER CONFORTI, GURBIR GREWAL, JOSEPH W. OXLEY Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiff's attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Moller* (jem)
February 5, 2018 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jem)
February 5, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC.. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
February 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against KENNETH J. BROWN, JR, PATRICK J. CALLAHAN, N. PETER CONFORTI, GURBIR GREWAL, JOSEPH W. OXLEY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8453532), filed by THOMAS R. ROGERS, ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROGERS et al v. GREWAL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GURBIR GREWAL
Represented By: BRYAN EDWARD LUCAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK J. CALLAHAN
Represented By: BRYAN EDWARD LUCAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH W. OXLEY
Represented By: BRYAN EDWARD LUCAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. PETER CONFORTI
Represented By: BRYAN EDWARD LUCAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH J. BROWN, JR.
Represented By: PAUL L LASALLE
Represented By: MICCI J. WEISS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASSOCIATION OF NEW JERSEY RIFLE & PISTOL CLUBS, INC.
Represented By: DANIEL L. SCHMUTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS R. ROGERS
Represented By: DANIEL L. SCHMUTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?