BONNER v. HUBER et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: ANDREW K. BONNER, JR.
Defendant: MARISSA M. HUBER, JUSTIA.COM, NJ COURT OF APPEALS CLERKS OFFICE, JUSTIA INCORPORATED and MARISSA HUBER
Intervenor: EUGENE VOLOKH
Case Number: 3:2018cv09187
Filed: May 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Peter G Sheridan
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Defendants' motions #46 , #47 , #49 , and #50 are DENIED; the Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 10/31/2019. (jem)
October 25, 2019 Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Motion Hearing held on 10/25/2019 re #47 MOTION to Seal Document filed by ANDREW K. BONNER, JR.,(Denied) #50 MOTION to Seal Document #49 MOTION for Demand for Jury Trial Under Rule 38 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by ANDREW K. BONNER, JR.,(Denied) #46 MOTION Relief from a Judgment or Order filed by ANDREW K. BONNER, JR.,(Denied) #49 MOTION for Demand for Jury Trial Under Rule 38 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by ANDREW K. BONNER, JR. (Denied). Order to be filed. (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (dh, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 52 Letter from Ryan Michaleski re #47 MOTION to Seal Document, #50 MOTION to Seal Document #49 MOTION for Demand for Jury Trial Under Rule 38 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, #46 MOTION Relief from a Judgment or Order, #49 MOTION for Demand for Jury Trial Under Rule 38 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (MICHALESKI, RYAN)
October 24, 2019 ORAL ARGUMENT REQUIRED BY TELEPHONE for the #47 MOTION to Seal Document, #50 MOTION to Seal Document #49 MOTION for Demand for Jury Trial Under Rule 38 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, #49 MOTION for Demand for Jury Trial Under Rule 38 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, #46 MOTION Relief from a Judgment or Order. Motion set for 10/25/2019 at 11:15 AM before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (Ryan Francis Michaleski, Esq will place the conference call into chambers). (dh, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by EUGENE VOLOKH re #47 MOTION to Seal Document. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eugene Volokh)(jem)
October 21, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION to Seal Document #49 MOTION for Demand for Jury Trial Under Rule 38 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by ANDREW K. BONNER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(jem)
October 21, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for Demand for Jury Trial Under Rule 38 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by ANDREW K. BONNER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Envelope)(jem)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 LETTER ORDER that the Court considers this Affidavit #46 and #47 as a motion. The motion will be heard on 12/02/2019 at 3:30pm by telephone. Any responding papers should be filed in accordance with time frame for said date. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 9/30/2019. (jem)
September 30, 2019 Set Deadlines as to the #47 MOTION to Seal the Judgment Order and all of the documents of the Motion for Relief from Judgment Or Order. Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
September 30, 2019 Set Deadlines as to the #46 MOTION Relief from a Judgment or Order. Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
September 27, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION to Seal the Judgment Order and all of the documents of the Motion for Relief from Judgment Or Order. by ANDREW K. BONNER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)(jem)
September 27, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Relief from a Judgment or Order by ANDREW K. BONNER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Affidavit, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service, #8 Envelope, #9 Exhibit)(jem)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the motion for leave to appear pro se and to intervene #33 filed by Eugene Volokh is granted; the application to seal the Appellate Division's Opinion filed by Plaintiff #26 is denied; the motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Justia #24 is granted with prejudice; the clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 8/19/2019. (jem)
July 31, 2019 Filing 44 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Motion Hearing held on 7/31/2019 re: #33 motion to intervene by Eugene Volokh, and #24 motion to dismiss by JUSTIA. Ordered #33 motion to intervene is granted. Order to be filed. Ordered #24 motion to dismiss is taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: GABLE.) (eh, )
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 LETTER ORDER that the Motion is adjourned to 7/31/2019; and will be heard with the Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's issues with Prof. Volokh may be addressed at the hearing. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 5/2/2019. (mps)
May 2, 2019 Filing 42 Letter from Justia, Inc. in Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Adjourn Oral Argument. (MICHALESKI, RYAN)
May 1, 2019 ORAL ARGUMENT REQUIRED for the #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Motion set for 7/31/2019 at 2:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (dh, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 41 Letter submission from ANDREW K. BONNER, JR. containing Motion to Seal and Dismiss the Requests of Intervenor Eugene Volokh (mps)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 LETTER ORDER that all the parties to this suit shall participate by telephone, using the number within this Order. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 4/24/2019. (mps)
April 16, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by JUSTIA INCORPORATED re #33 MOTION to Intervene and Response In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Seal #18 (MICHALESKI, RYAN)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER that the Court shall consider Professor Volokh's #33 Brief. Subsequent submissions filed by any party (or non-party) must be double spaced in compliance with Local Civil Rule 7.2(d). Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 4/11/2019. (mps)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 LETTER ORDER that the Clerk is directed to file this letter brief. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 4/11/2019. (mps)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 LETTER ORDER denying Professor Volokh's #34 request for an adjournment. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 4/9/2019. (mps)
April 9, 2019 Filing 35 Letter from Ryan Michaleski, Esquire re #34 Letter. (MICHALESKI, RYAN)
April 5, 2019 Filing 34 Letter from EUGENE VOLOKH requesting adjournment. (mps)
April 5, 2019 Set Deadlines as to the #33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Se; MOTION for Leave to Intervene. Motion set for 5/6/2019 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
April 5, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Se; MOTION for Leave to Intervene; and Proposed Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Seal by EUGENE VOLOKH. (mps)
April 5, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the #32 Memorandum Opinion filed by the Clerk's office on 4/5/2019 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (mps)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 4/5/2019. (mps)
April 3, 2019 Filing 30 Exhibit (Additional Attachment) to #29 Response in Opposition to Motion by ANDREW K. BONNER, JR. (mps)
April 3, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by ANDREW K. BONNER, JR re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Attachments (Part 1), #2 Attachments (Part 2))(mps)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING ORDER that Plaintiff's emergent request to seal the documents and Professor Volokh's request to appear pro se are to be filed as motions and the Court shall consider same on an expedited basis. Professor Volokh shall file his brief on both issues by 4/9/2019. Mr. Bonner and Justia may file an opposition brief on both issues by 4/16/2019. The court shall hold argument on the motion by telephone on 5/6/2019, at 2:00 PM. Professor Volokh is responsible for initiating the conference call with all parties into chambers. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 4/2/2019. (mps)
April 1, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE re #26 Order. (MICHALESKI, RYAN)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 LETTER ORDER that in order for Mr. Volokh's letter to be considered he must be represented by Counsel or be retained as an expert by a party to the action. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 3/20/2019. (mmh)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 LETTER ORDER that Defendant may respond to this letter by 4/1/2019. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 3/11/2019. (mps)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE. So Ordered by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 1/28/2019. (dh, )
January 16, 2019 Set Deadlines as to the #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Motion set for 2/19/2019 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
January 15, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by JUSTIA INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit Exhibits A-C)(MICHALESKI, RYAN)
December 26, 2018 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JUSTIA INCORPORATED, filed by ANDREW K. BONNER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP)(mps) Modified on 12/26/2018 to correct Defendant's name (mps).
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that Defendant Justia's #11 Motion to Dismiss is granted; Plaintiff's complaint against Justia is dismissed without prejudice. The #14 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Huber and the Appellate Division Clerk's Office is granted; Plaintiff's complaint against the Appellate Division Clerk's Office is dismissed with prejudice and Plaintiff's complaint against Huber is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff has thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to file an Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 11/26/2018. (mps)
November 20, 2018 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Motion Hearing held on 11/20/2018 re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by JUSTIA.COM. (Granted) Order filed. (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (dh, )
October 9, 2018 ORAL ARGUMENT REQUIRED for the #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #14 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with prejudice. Motions reset for 11/20/2018 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (mps)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LETTER ORDER adjourning the #11 and #14 Motions to Dismiss to 11/20/2018. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 10/9/2018. (mps)
October 4, 2018 Filing 19 Letter from ANDREW K. BONNER, JR.. (km)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Plaintiff is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
September 24, 2018 Set Deadlines as to the #18 MOTION for an Order to Seal Case. Motion set for 11/5/2018 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
September 24, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for an Order to Seal Case by ANDREW K. BONNER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Attachment in Support)(mps)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
September 11, 2018 ORAL ARGUMENT REQUIRED for the #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #14 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with prejudice. Motion set for 10/15/2018 at 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (dh, )
September 6, 2018 Filing 17 Letter from ANDREW K. BONNER, JR. regarding Brett J. Haroldson. (mps)
August 30, 2018 NO ORAL ARGUMENT for the #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #14 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with prejudice. Motion set for 9/4/2018 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dh, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by ANDREW K. BONNER, JR re #14 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with prejudice (mps)
August 16, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by ANDREW K. BONNER, JR re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (mps)
August 9, 2018 ORAL ARGUMENT REQUIRED for the #14 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with prejudice. Motion set for 9/4/2018 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (mps)
August 8, 2018 Filing 14 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with prejudice by MARISSA HUBER, NJ COURT OF APPEALS CLERKS OFFICE. Responses due by 8/21/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(HAROLDSON, BRETT)
August 1, 2018 Filing 13 Submission by Andrew Bonner. (kas, )
July 31, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JUSTIA.COM identifying n/a as Corporate Parent.. (BRONSTEIN, ERIC)
July 31, 2018 ORAL ARGUMENT REQUIRED for the #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 9/4/2018 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (mmh)
July 30, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by JUSTIA.COM. Responses due by 8/21/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BRONSTEIN, ERIC)
July 20, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by the USMS. MARISSA HUBER served on 7/20/2018, answer due 8/10/2018; NJ COURT OF APPEALS CLERKS OFFICE served on 7/20/2018, answer due 8/10/2018. (mps)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the deadline for Justia, Inc. to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be extended by twenty-one (21) days. The new deadline for Justia, Inc. to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint is 7/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/6/2018. (mps)
July 3, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC J. BRONSTEIN on behalf of JUSTIA.COM (BRONSTEIN, ERIC)
July 3, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN FRANCIS MICHALESKI on behalf of JUSTIA.COM (MICHALESKI, RYAN)
June 25, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by the USMS. JUSTIA.COM served on 6/18/2018, answer due 7/9/2018. (mps)
June 7, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MARISSA M. HUBER, JUSTIA.COM, NJ COURT OF APPEALS CLERKS OFFICE Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Karen McGonigle* (km)
June 7, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of USMS (km)
May 31, 2018 Filing 3 CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (mps)
May 30, 2018 COMPLAINT against MARISSA M. HUBER, JUSTIA.COM, NJ COURT OF APPEALS CLERKS OFFICE, filed by ANDREW K. BONNER, JR.(mps)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting Application to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to file the Complaint. The Clerk is to issue Summons and the U.S. Marshal serve a copy of the Complaint, Summons and this Order upon the Defendant(s). Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 5/30/2018. (mps)
May 14, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Application IFP)(ces) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2018: #4 Text of Proposed Order) (jem).
May 14, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Application IFP)(ces) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2018: # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (jem).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BONNER v. HUBER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARISSA M. HUBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUSTIA.COM
Represented By: ERIC J. BRONSTEIN
Represented By: RYAN FRANCIS MICHALESKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NJ COURT OF APPEALS CLERKS OFFICE
Represented By: BRETT JOSEPH HAROLDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUSTIA INCORPORATED
Represented By: RYAN FRANCIS MICHALESKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARISSA HUBER
Represented By: BRETT JOSEPH HAROLDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW K. BONNER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: EUGENE VOLOKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?