CATALANO v. CITY OF TRENTON et al

Plaintiff: DANIEL CATALANO
Defendant: OFFICER MICHAEL P., PARKING OFFICER OLIVER, TRENTON POLICE OFFICER DOE(S), DISPATCHER DOE, MUNICIPAL PROSECUTOR DOE(S), MARC MCKITHEN, CITY OF TRENTON, TRENTON CITY EMPLOYEES DOE(S), EUNICE LEWIS, SGT. HARRIS, OFFICER MICHAEL PALINCZAR, DISPATCHER JACKSON, MUNICIPAL PROSECUTOR WILSON and OFFICER CRUZ
Case Number: 3:2018cv11646
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
0 Judge: Douglas E Arpert
1 Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2018 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CITY OF TRENTON, MARC MCKITHEN, MUNICIPAL PROSECUTOR DOE(S), OLIVER, MICHAEL PALINCZAR, TRENTON CITY EMPLOYEES DOE(S), TRENTON POLICE OFFICER DOE(S), WILSON, JACKSON, CRUZ, EUNICE LEWIS, HARRIS, filed by DANIEL CATALANO.(mmh)
September 10, 2018 11 Featured Case LETTER ORDER that Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint by 9/12/2018 and Defendants The City of Trenton and any other Defendants represented by the Garty Law Firm shall file their responsive pleadings 30 days from the filing of the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/10/2018. (mmh)
September 7, 2018 10 Letter from Defendant, City of Trenton. (GARTY, MARY)
September 6, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by MARY LOU GARTY on behalf of CITY OF TRENTON (GARTY, MARY)
August 14, 2018 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS. CITY OF TRENTON served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018; MARC MCKITHEN served on 8/13/2018, answer due 9/3/2018. (mmh)
August 10, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS. OLIVER served on 8/9/2018, answer due 8/30/2018; MICHAEL P. served on 8/9/2018, answer due 8/30/2018.(mmh)
August 7, 2018 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CITY OF TRENTON, MARC MCKITHEN, OLIVER, MICHAEL P. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Forwarded to USMS. (mmh)
August 7, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE of USMS. USM285 forms returned. (mmh)
July 17, 2018 4 CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (mmh)
July 17, 2018 COMPLAINT filed. See docket entry #1 for Complaint.(mmh)
July 17, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is granted; that the Clerk shall file the Complaint and issue summons to be served by the US Marshal. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/17/2018. (mmh)
July 16, 2018 2 Pro se Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by DANIEL CATALANO. (jem)
July 16, 2018 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(jem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CATALANO v. CITY OF TRENTON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER MICHAEL P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKING OFFICER OLIVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRENTON POLICE OFFICER DOE(S)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISPATCHER DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUNICIPAL PROSECUTOR DOE(S)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARC MCKITHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF TRENTON
Represented By: MARY LOU GARTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRENTON CITY EMPLOYEES DOE(S)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EUNICE LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT. HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER MICHAEL PALINCZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISPATCHER JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUNICIPAL PROSECUTOR WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER CRUZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL CATALANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?