UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DRISCOLL et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: JEANANE DRISCOLL, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, DIVISION OF TAXATION, CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY, WILLIAM CHRISTOPHER VOCKROTH, 1ST CONSTITUTION BANK, PNC BANK and THOMAS DRISCOLL
Case Number: 3:2018cv11762
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Monmouth
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY served on 8/27/2018, answer due 9/17/2018. (COPPLER, CATRIONA)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER that if the United States prevails on its foreclosure count, any sale of the Real Property in this action will be made free and clear of 1st Constitution Bank's lien. If the Real Property is sold by Plaintiff at any sale conducted by, or on behalf of Plaintiff, to collect the federal tax liabilities of Thomas Driscoll and Jeanane Driscoll, the Mortgage shall be paid from the proceeds of the sale in accordance with the priority ofinterests. The Mortgage shall be satisfied from the proceeds of any such sale prior to the liens or judgments. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 8/22/2018. (km)
August 21, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION between the United States and Defendant 1st Constitution Bank by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (COPPLER, CATRIONA)
August 14, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. PNC BANK served on 7/24/2018, answer due 8/14/2018. (COPPLER, CATRIONA)
August 6, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. STATE OF NEW JERSEY, DIVISION OF TAXATION served on 7/24/2018, answer due 8/14/2018. (COPPLER, CATRIONA)
August 6, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. 1ST CONSTITUTION BANK served on 7/24/2018, answer due 8/14/2018. (COPPLER, CATRIONA)
August 6, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. WILLIAM CHRISTOPHER VOCKROTH served on 7/29/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (COPPLER, CATRIONA)
August 6, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. JEANANE DRISCOLL served on 7/29/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (COPPLER, CATRIONA)
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. THOMAS DRISCOLL served on 7/29/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (COPPLER, CATRIONA)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 1ST CONSTITUTION BANK, CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY, JEANANE DRISCOLL, THOMAS DRISCOLL, PNC BANK, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, DIVISION OF TAXATION, WILLIAM CHRISTOPHER VOCKROTH Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiff's attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Moller* (jem)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 1ST CONSTITUTION BANK, CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY, JEANANE DRISCOLL, THOMAS DRISCOLL, PNC BANK, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, DIVISION OF TAXATION, WILLIAM CHRISTOPHER VOCKROTH, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COPPLER, CATRIONA)
July 18, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select theALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
July 18, 2018 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DRISCOLL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEANANE DRISCOLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NEW JERSEY, DIVISION OF TAXATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM CHRISTOPHER VOCKROTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1ST CONSTITUTION BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS DRISCOLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: CATRIONA MADALYN COPPLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?