LEEDER v. FEINSTEIN et al
Plaintiff: YISROEL MEIR LEEDER
Defendant: IADVANCEU LLC, AM DISPLAY DIST. INC, JOHN DOES 1-30, AYN OD MILVADO LLC, KOSHER DELIGHT LLC, AMBER CAPITAL, CARLOS & GABBYS MIAMI, UHCS, INC, ARON WASSERLAUF, CHAVIVA FEINSTEIN, MOSHE FEINSTEIN, CAPRI RISTORANTE LLC, KASTNER'S MARKET, DOUBLE DECKER DELI LLC, SAPPHIRE FUNDING LLC, 726 41ST LLC, GROUP EIGHTEEN, INC, LIAM DOE, NISSIM OHAYON and SHLOMO YEHUDA FEINSTEIN
Case Number: 3:2018cv12384
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Ocean
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
2 Judge: Anne E Thompson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #20 MOTION for Default Judgment. Motion set for 10/15/2018 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that the time for Defendants Aron Wasserlauf A/K/A Mr. Wasser, Kastner's Market; Kosher Delight, LLC! Double Decker Deli, LLC; Capri Ristorante LLC; 72641 st LLC; Group Eighteen, Inc.; AM Display Dist. Inc.; UHCS, Inc;; Carlos& Gabby's Miami to respond to the Complaint is extended to 10/4/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/20/2018. (mmh)
September 19, 2018 Filing 25 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by 726 41ST LLC, CAPRI RISTORANTE LLC, CARLOS & GABBYS MIAMI, DOUBLE DECKER DELI LLC, GROUP EIGHTEEN, INC, KASTNER'S MARKET, KOSHER DELIGHT LLC, SAPPHIRE FUNDING LLC, UHCS, INC, ARON WASSERLAUF re #23 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Nicholas R. Doria (DORIA, NICHOLAS)
September 19, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #24 Supplemental Certification filed by Nicholas Doria on 9/19/2018 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Supplemental Certification USING Certification in Support of Motion found under Civil - Motions and Related Filings - Responses and Replies. The deadlines created by this filing have been terminated. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mmh)
September 19, 2018 Filing 24 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney NIcholas R. Doria by 726 41ST LLC, AMBER CAPITAL, CAPRI RISTORANTE LLC, CARLOS & GABBYS MIAMI, DOUBLE DECKER DELI LLC, KASTNER'S MARKET, KOSHER DELIGHT LLC, SAPPHIRE FUNDING LLC, UHCS, INC, ARON WASSERLAUF. (DORIA, NICHOLAS)
September 19, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #23 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Nicholas R. Doria. Motion set for 10/15/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
September 18, 2018 Filing 23 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Nicholas R. Doria by 726 41ST LLC, AM DISPLAY DIST. INC, CAPRI RISTORANTE LLC, CARLOS & GABBYS MIAMI, DOUBLE DECKER DELI LLC, GROUP EIGHTEEN, INC, KASTNER'S MARKET, KOSHER DELIGHT LLC, UHCS, INC, ARON WASSERLAUF. (DORIA, NICHOLAS)
September 18, 2018 Filing 22 APPLICATION/PETITION for Consent Order Extending time to respond to Complaint for by 726 41ST LLC, AM DISPLAY DIST. INC, CAPRI RISTORANTE LLC, CARLOS & GABBYS MIAMI, DOUBLE DECKER DELI LLC, GROUP EIGHTEEN, INC, KASTNER'S MARKET, KOSHER DELIGHT LLC, UHCS, INC, ARON WASSERLAUF. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order)(SRAGOW, ALLEN)
September 18, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by ALLEN PHILIP SRAGOW on behalf of 726 41ST LLC, AM DISPLAY DIST. INC, CAPRI RISTORANTE LLC, CARLOS & GABBYS MIAMI, DOUBLE DECKER DELI LLC, GROUP EIGHTEEN, INC, KASTNER'S MARKET, KOSHER DELIGHT LLC, UHCS, INC, ARON WASSERLAUF (SRAGOW, ALLEN)
September 18, 2018 Filing 20 Motion for Default Judgment by All Plaintiffs against Moshe Feinstein; Chaviva Feinstein, Amber Capital, and IAdvanceU, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - listing of advances, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - MOE SCRA, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Chaviva SCRA)(FRISCH, AVRAM) Modified per Chambers on 9/21/2018 (mmh).
September 18, 2018 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Moshe Feinstein, Chaviva Feinstein, Amber Capital, and IAdvanceU, LLC for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (mmh)
September 17, 2018 Filing 19 Request for Default by YISROEL MEIR LEEDER against Moshe Feinstein; Chaviva Feinstein, Amber Capital, and IAdvanceU, LLC. (FRISCH, AVRAM)
September 17, 2018 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on IAdvanceU LLC on August 23, 2018, filed by YISROEL MEIR LEEDER. (FRISCH, AVRAM)
September 17, 2018 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Amber Capital on August 23, 2018, filed by YISROEL MEIR LEEDER. (FRISCH, AVRAM)
September 17, 2018 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Chaviva Feinstein on August 23, 2018, filed by YISROEL MEIR LEEDER. (FRISCH, AVRAM)
September 17, 2018 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Moshe Feinstein a/k/a/ Moe Feinstein on August 23, 2018, filed by YISROEL MEIR LEEDER. (FRISCH, AVRAM)
September 17, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #14 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by 726 41ST LLC, KASTNER'S MARKET, AM DISPLAY DIST. INC, DOUBLE DECKER DELI LLC, GROUP EIGHTEEN, INC, CARLOS & GABBYS MIAMI, UHCS, INC, KOSHER DELIGHT LLC, CAPRI RISTORANTE LLC, ARON WASSERLAUF has been DENIED as being out of time pursuant to FRCP 4 which allows a party 21 days to file an answer and time expired on 9/11/2018. This application will be forwarded to Chambers for review. (mmh)
September 14, 2018 Filing 14 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to 726 41ST LLC, AM DISPLAY DIST. INC, CAPRI RISTORANTE LLC, CARLOS & GABBYS MIAMI, DOUBLE DECKER DELI LLC, GROUP EIGHTEEN, INC, KASTNER'S MARKET, KOSHER DELIGHT LLC, UHCS, INC, ARON WASSERLAUF.. (DORIA, NICHOLAS)
September 14, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS ROBERT DORIA on behalf of 726 41ST LLC, AM DISPLAY DIST. INC, CAPRI RISTORANTE LLC, CARLOS & GABBYS MIAMI, DOUBLE DECKER DELI LLC, GROUP EIGHTEEN, INC, KASTNER'S MARKET, KOSHER DELIGHT LLC, UHCS, INC, ARON WASSERLAUF (DORIA, NICHOLAS)
August 15, 2018 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian R. Martinotti: Motion Hearing held via telephone on 8/15/2018 re: #3 Ex Parte MOTIONS for Temporary Restraining Order, for Preliminary Injunction, and for Writ of attachment filed by YISROEL MEIR LEEDER. Ordered motion denied.Order filed. (Court Reporter: MCKAY-SOULE.) (eh, )
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #3 Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 8/15/2018. (km)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Letter request. Counsel for Plaintiff may appear by phone for hearing on 8/15/2018 at 11:00am. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 8/14/2018. (eh, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 9 Letter from Avram E. Frisch re 8 Order,. (FRISCH, AVRAM)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CORRECTED TEXT ORDER scheduling a hearing for 8/15/18 at 11:00am before Judge Brian R. Martiontti in Trenton - Courtroom 1 re: #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, for Preliminary Injunction, and for Writ of attachment by YISROEL MEIR LEEDER. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 8/14/2018. (eh, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by YISROEL MEIR LEEDER. Amendment to #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Ex Parte MOTION for Writ of attachment Corrected OTSC. (FRISCH, AVRAM)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER scheduling a hearing re: #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, for Preliminary Injunction, and for Writ of attachment by YISROEL MEIR LEEDER. Plaintiff is directed to submit a new proposed order to show cause with a corrected caption. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 8/14/2018. (eh, )
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti for all further proceedings. Judge Freda L. Wolfson no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 8/14/18. (mem, )
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Freda L. Wolfson for all further proceedings. Judge Anne E. Thompson no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 8/14/2018. (jjc)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , Ex Parte MOTION for Writ of attachment by YISROEL MEIR LEEDER. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Brief)(FRISCH, AVRAM)
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 726 41ST LLC, AM DISPLAY DIST. INC, AMBER CAPITAL, AYN OD MILVADO LLC, CAPRI RISTORANTE LLC, CARLOS & GABBYS MIAMI, LIAM DOE, DOUBLE DECKER DELI LLC, CHAVIVA FEINSTEIN, MOSHE FEINSTEIN, SHLOMO YEHUDA FEINSTEIN, GROUP EIGHTEEN, INC, IADVANCEU LLC, KASTNER'S MARKET, KOSHER DELIGHT LLC, NISSIM OHAYON, SAPPHIRE FUNDING LLC, UHCS, INC, ARON WASSERLAUF. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jem)
August 2, 2018 Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jem)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 726 41ST LLC, AM DISPLAY DIST. INC, AMBER CAPITAL, AYN OD MILVADO LLC, CAPRI RISTORANTE LLC, CARLOS & GABBYS MIAMI, LIAM DOE, DOUBLE DECKER DELI LLC, CHAVIVA FEINSTEIN, MOSHE FEINSTEIN, SHLOMO YEHUDA FEINSTEIN, GROUP EIGHTEEN, INC, IADVANCEU LLC, JOHN DOES 1-30, KASTNER'S MARKET, KOSHER DELIGHT LLC, NISSIM OHAYON, SAPPHIRE FUNDING LLC, UHCS, INC, ARON WASSERLAUF ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8927708) with JURY DEMAND, filed by YISROEL MEIR LEEDER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(FRISCH, AVRAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEEDER v. FEINSTEIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IADVANCEU LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AM DISPLAY DIST. INC
Represented By: NICHOLAS ROBERT DORIA
Represented By: ALLEN PHILIP SRAGOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AYN OD MILVADO LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOSHER DELIGHT LLC
Represented By: NICHOLAS ROBERT DORIA
Represented By: ALLEN PHILIP SRAGOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMBER CAPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLOS & GABBYS MIAMI
Represented By: NICHOLAS ROBERT DORIA
Represented By: ALLEN PHILIP SRAGOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UHCS, INC
Represented By: NICHOLAS ROBERT DORIA
Represented By: ALLEN PHILIP SRAGOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARON WASSERLAUF
Represented By: NICHOLAS ROBERT DORIA
Represented By: ALLEN PHILIP SRAGOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAVIVA FEINSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOSHE FEINSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPRI RISTORANTE LLC
Represented By: NICHOLAS ROBERT DORIA
Represented By: ALLEN PHILIP SRAGOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KASTNER'S MARKET
Represented By: NICHOLAS ROBERT DORIA
Represented By: ALLEN PHILIP SRAGOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUBLE DECKER DELI LLC
Represented By: NICHOLAS ROBERT DORIA
Represented By: ALLEN PHILIP SRAGOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAPPHIRE FUNDING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 726 41ST LLC
Represented By: NICHOLAS ROBERT DORIA
Represented By: ALLEN PHILIP SRAGOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GROUP EIGHTEEN, INC
Represented By: NICHOLAS ROBERT DORIA
Represented By: ALLEN PHILIP SRAGOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIAM DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NISSIM OHAYON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHLOMO YEHUDA FEINSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YISROEL MEIR LEEDER
Represented By: AVRAM E. FRISCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?