BP AUTO GROUP LLC et al v. THE REYNOLDS AND REYNOLDS COMPANY

Plaintiff: PICON AUTO GROUP, LLC, PICON AUTO, LLC and BP AUTO GROUP, LLC
Defendant: THE REYNOLDS AND REYNOLDS COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2018cv12510
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Warren
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Anne E Thompson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER ORDER advising counsel that a motion filed any time between 9/22 and 10/12/2018 is set for the same motion day unless the Court orders otherwise. Opposition to the Motion to Compel Arbitration is due 10/22/2018. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 10/4/2018. (mmh)
October 3, 2018 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #7 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration (COHEN, LAWRENCE)
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 Letter from Counsel for Defendant to Judge Bongiovanni re #8 Letter. (ROGOVE, ADRIENNE)
October 2, 2018 Filing 8 Letter from Lawrence P. Cohen re #7 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration. (COHEN, LAWRENCE)
September 26, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration. Motion set for 11/5/2018 before Judge Anne E. Thompson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by THE REYNOLDS AND REYNOLDS COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Affidavit of John Allen, #3 Affidavit of Sheri Robinson, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(ROGOVE, ADRIENNE)
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE REYNOLDS AND REYNOLDS COMPANY. (ROGOVE, ADRIENNE)
September 11, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by THE REYNOLDS AND REYNOLDS COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/25/2018. (jem)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant The Reynolds and Reynolds Company.. (KORN, JONATHAN)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN M. KORN on behalf of THE REYNOLDS AND REYNOLDS COMPANY (KORN, JONATHAN)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP AUTO GROUP, LLC, PICON AUTO GROUP, LLC, PICON AUTO, LLC identifying Plaintiffs as Corporate Parent.. (COHEN, LAWRENCE)
August 7, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (jem)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to THE REYNOLDS AND REYNOLDS COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jem)
August 7, 2018 Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jem)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE REYNOLDS AND REYNOLDS COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8937809) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BP AUTO GROUP LLC, PICON AUTO LLC, PICON AUTO GROUP LLC.(COHEN, LAWRENCE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BP AUTO GROUP LLC et al v. THE REYNOLDS AND REYNOLDS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE REYNOLDS AND REYNOLDS COMPANY
Represented By: ADRIENNE C. ROGOVE
Represented By: JONATHAN M. KORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PICON AUTO GROUP, LLC
Represented By: LAWRENCE P. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PICON AUTO, LLC
Represented By: LAWRENCE P. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BP AUTO GROUP, LLC
Represented By: LAWRENCE P. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?