JASONES et al v. NASSAU MARINA HOLDINGS, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: GLENN JASONES and PAMELA JASONES
Defendant: NASSAU MARINA HOLDINGS, L.L.C. and MICHAEL'S MARINE INSPECTIONS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2018cv13575
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint in Admiralty, CROSSCLAIM against NASSAU MARINA HOLDINGS, L.L.C. by MICHAEL'S MARINE INSPECTIONS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(INTOCCIA, GARY)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES WILLIAM JOHNSON on behalf of NASSAU MARINA HOLDINGS, L.L.C. (JOHNSON, JAMES)
October 17, 2018 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to NASSAU MARINA HOLDINGS, L.L.C. for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (mmh)
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 Request for Default by GLENN JASONES, PAMELA JASONES against Defendant NASSAU MARINA HOLDINGS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Certification In Support of Plaintiffs' Request For Entry of Default Against Defendant Nassau Marina Holdings, L.L.C.)(BARROW, TIMOTHY)
October 5, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by MICHAEL'S MARINE INSPECTIONS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/26/2018. (mmh)
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Michael's Marine Inspections Limited Liability Company. Attorney GARY J. INTOCCIA for MICHAEL'S MARINE INSPECTIONS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY added. (INTOCCIA, GARY)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PAMELA JASONES, GLENN JASONES. MICHAEL'S MARINE INSPECTIONS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (BARROW, TIMOTHY)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PAMELA JASONES, GLENN JASONES. NASSAU MARINA HOLDINGS, L.L.C. served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (BARROW, TIMOTHY)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MICHAEL'S MARINE INSPECTIONS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, NASSAU MARINA HOLDINGS, L.L.C.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mmh)
September 7, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jmh)
September 7, 2018 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jmh)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICHAEL'S MARINE INSPECTIONS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, NASSAU MARINA HOLDINGS, L.L.C. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9003088), filed by PAMELA JASONES, GLENN JASONES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BARROW, TIMOTHY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JASONES et al v. NASSAU MARINA HOLDINGS, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLENN JASONES
Represented By: TIMOTHY DONALD BARROW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA JASONES
Represented By: TIMOTHY DONALD BARROW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NASSAU MARINA HOLDINGS, L.L.C.
Represented By: JAMES WILLIAM JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL'S MARINE INSPECTIONS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
Represented By: GARY J. INTOCCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?