LINDSAY v. 02 CONCEPTS, LLC et al

Plaintiff: WILLIAM LINDSAY
Defendant: NEIL M MILLER and 02 CONCEPTS, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv13865
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: New Jersey District Court
0 Judge: Douglas E Arpert
1 Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2018 10 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by 02 CONCEPTS, LLC, NEIL M MILLER.(WARREN, ABBY)
October 9, 2018 9 Featured Case CONSENT ORDER that the deadline to plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 11/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/9/2018. (mmh)
October 5, 2018 8 Featured Case CONSENT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline to plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 11/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/4/2018. (mmh)
October 5, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint . Motion set for 11/5/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
October 4, 2018 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by 02 CONCEPTS, LLC, NEIL M MILLER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(WARREN, ABBY)
October 4, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ABBY WARREN on behalf of NEIL M MILLER (WARREN, ABBY)
October 4, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ABBY WARREN on behalf of 02 CONCEPTS, LLC (WARREN, ABBY)
September 27, 2018 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILLIAM LINDSAY. 02 CONCEPTS, LLC served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (DION, SAMUEL)
September 25, 2018 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILLIAM LINDSAY. NEIL M MILLER served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (DION, SAMUEL)
September 14, 2018 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 02 CONCEPTS, LLC, NEIL M MILLER. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
September 14, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jmh)
September 14, 2018 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jem)
September 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against 02 CONCEPTS, LLC, NEIL M MILLER ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9022090) with JURY DEMAND, filed by WILLIAM LINDSAY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DION, SAMUEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LINDSAY v. 02 CONCEPTS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEIL M MILLER
Represented By: ABBY WARREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 02 CONCEPTS, LLC
Represented By: ABBY WARREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM LINDSAY
Represented By: SAMUEL A. DION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?