UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HOVNANIAN et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: SHANT S. HOVNANIAN, MTAG Services, LLC, ULYSSES ASSET SUB II, LLC, ADELPHIA WATER COMPANY, INC., PETER HOVNANIAN, NINA HOVNANIAN and TOWNSHIP OF HOWELL
Case Number: 3:2018cv15099
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Anne E Thompson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by MTAG SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FOSSI, LINDA)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/19/2019 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 12/6/2018. (mps)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 Contested ANSWER to Complaint by TOWNSHIP OF HOWELL.(GATTONI, WILLIAM)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. GATTONI, JR on behalf of TOWNSHIP OF HOWELL (GATTONI, WILLIAM)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM N. AUMENTA on behalf of ULYSSES ASSET SUB II, LLC (AUMENTA, WILLIAM)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by ULYSSES ASSET SUB II, LLC. (AUMENTA, WILLIAM)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ADELPHIA WATER COMPANY, INC., NINA HOVNANIAN, PETER HOVNANIAN, SHANT S. HOVNANIAN, MTAG Services, LLC, TOWNSHIP OF HOWELL, ULYSSES ASSET SUB II, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
October 19, 2018 Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jmh)
October 19, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN FAITH DARDEN on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (DARDEN, ERIN)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Shant Hovnanian, #3 Summons Peter Hovnanian, #4 Summons Nina Hovnanian, #5 Summons MTAG Services, LLC, #6 Summons Ulysses Asset Sub II, LLC, #7 Summons Township of Howell)(KUNOFSKY, ARI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HOVNANIAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANT S. HOVNANIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTAG Services, LLC
Represented By: LINDA S. FOSSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ULYSSES ASSET SUB II, LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM N. AUMENTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADELPHIA WATER COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER HOVNANIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NINA HOVNANIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWNSHIP OF HOWELL
Represented By: WILLIAM C. GATTONI, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: ARI DAVID KUNOFSKY
Represented By: ERIN FAITH DARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?