GLOVER v. GILLIARD et al
Petitioner: MORRIS GLOVER
Claimant: RONALD MORRIS and MICHAEL GILLIARD
Case Number: 3:2018cv15791
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:0185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/19/2019 03:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1/2/2019. (km)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by MICHAEL GILLIARD, RONALD MORRIS. (Attachments: #1 Certification In Support of Proof of Claim)(CHIPKIN, JOEL)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of liability issued. (mmh)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Restraining Suits, Approving Petitioner's Security, Directing Issue of Notice and the Filing of Claims. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/10/2018. (mmh)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER re #3 Order, #4 Notice (Other). The Order dated November 16, 2018 and the Notice issued on the same date are hereby VACATED. A new order and notice shall issue. So Ordered by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/10/2018. (Fang, W)
December 10, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #5 Letter Request filed by Joseph R. Federici, Esq. on 12/07/2018 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE document USING the event Other Filings - Other Documents - Letter. For future reference, when using the event motion, you must file a Notice of Motion along with the other documents required by the rules of this Court. The Clerks office has terminated the calendar event created by this filing. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jem)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by MORRIS GLOVER. (FEDERICI, JOSEPH)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 VACATED NOTICE of Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of liability issued. (km, deputy clerk) Modified on 12/10/2018 (mmh).
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 VACATED ORDER Restraining Suits, Approving Petitioner's Security, Directing Issue of Notice and the Filing of Claims. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 11/16/2018. (km) Modified on 12/10/2018 (mmh).
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 Letter from Joseph R. Federici, Esq.. (FEDERICI, JOSEPH)
November 8, 2018 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jmh)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICHAEL GILLIARD, RONALD MORRIS ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9156095), filed by MORRIS GLOVER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Vessel Appraisal, #2 Exhibit B Ad Interim Security, #3 Exhibit C Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit D Proposed Notice, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(FEDERICI, JOSEPH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GLOVER v. GILLIARD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: RONALD MORRIS
Represented By: JOEL M. CHIPKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: MICHAEL GILLIARD
Represented By: JOEL M. CHIPKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MORRIS GLOVER
Represented By: JOSEPH ROBERT FEDERICI, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?