KYTHERA BIOPHARMACEUTICALS, INC. v. SLAYBACK PHARMA LLC
Plaintiff: KYTHERA BIOPHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Defendant: SLAYBACK PHARMA LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv16012
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
2 Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/2019 03:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1/2/2019. (km)
January 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by AMIT SINGHAI on behalf of SLAYBACK PHARMA LLC (SINGHAI, AMIT)
January 2, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SLAYBACK PHARMA LLC re #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #11 Corporate Disclosure Statement (MILLER, ANDREW)
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SLAYBACK PHARMA LLC. (MILLER, ANDREW)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint , Additional Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against KYTHERA BIOPHARMACEUTICALS, INC. by SLAYBACK PHARMA LLC.(MILLER, ANDREW)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW J. MILLER on behalf of SLAYBACK PHARMA LLC (MILLER, ANDREW)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER ORDER that the time for Defendant to Answer or Respond to the Complaint is extended to 1/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/3/2018. (km)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti for all further proceedings. Judge Freda L. Wolfson no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 11/13/2018. (jjc)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ELEONORE OFOSU-ANTWI on behalf of KYTHERA BIOPHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (OFOSU-ANTWI, ELEONORE)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KYTHERA BIOPHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. SLAYBACK PHARMA LLC served on 11/12/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (WALSH, LIZA)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to SLAYBACK PHARMA LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 AO120 Patent Form filed. (jmh)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KYTHERA BIOPHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (WALSH, LIZA)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SLAYBACK PHARMA LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9163578) with JURY DEMAND, filed by KYTHERA BIOPHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 AO120 Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(WALSH, LIZA)
November 9, 2018 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mem, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KYTHERA BIOPHARMACEUTICALS, INC. v. SLAYBACK PHARMA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLAYBACK PHARMA LLC
Represented By: ANDREW J. MILLER
Represented By: AMIT SINGHAI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KYTHERA BIOPHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: ELEONORE OFOSU-ANTWI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?