HOLLIDAY et al v. AMERICAN AIRLINES et al
Plaintiff: BRUCE HOLLIDAY and DEBORAH HOLLIDAY
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOES A-Z MAINTENANCE PERSONNEL, JOHN/JANE DOES A-Z EMPLOYEES, JOHN DOES A-Z MANAGEMENT COMPANY, GRETCHEN FAULHABER and AMERICAN AIRLINES
Case Number: 3:2018cv16319
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by AMERICAN AIRLINES.(RAYMOND, KELLY)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/19/2019 11:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 12/6/2018. (mps)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN AIRLINES. (RAYMOND, KELLY)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 Notice to ANTHONY V. LOCASCIO re mandatory eFiling. (jem)
November 20, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (jem)
November 20, 2018 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jem)
November 20, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Removal-Other Court Information, was entered incorrectly. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (mmh)
November 20, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information, Fictitious Defendants were not added to the docket. When entering parties make sure to add ALL plaintiffs and defendants as found on the original state court complaint.. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (mmh)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMERICAN AIRLINES from Superior Court of New Jersey, case number MON-L-003785-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9184700), filed by AMERICAN AIRLINES.(RAYMOND, KELLY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOLLIDAY et al v. AMERICAN AIRLINES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOES A-Z MAINTENANCE PERSONNEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOES A-Z EMPLOYEES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES A-Z MANAGEMENT COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRETCHEN FAULHABER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN AIRLINES
Represented By: KELLY LYN RAYMOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE HOLLIDAY
Represented By: ANTHONY V. LOCASCIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH HOLLIDAY
Represented By: ANTHONY V. LOCASCIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?