ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP et al v. ALKEM LABORATORIES LTD.
Plaintiff: ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED and ASTRAZENECA AB
Defendant: ALKEM LABORATORIES LTD.
Case Number: 3:2018cv16399
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED, ASTRAZENECA AB. ALKEM LABORATORIES LTD. waiver sent on 12/17/2018, answer due 3/18/2019. (FLAHERTY, JOHN)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALKEM LABORATORIES LTD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 AO120 Patent Form filed. (jmh)
November 26, 2018 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jmh)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by RAVIN R. PATEL on behalf of ASTRAZENECA AB, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED (PATEL, RAVIN)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASTRAZENECA AB, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED identifying AstraZeneca PLC as Corporate Parent.. (FLAHERTY, JOHN)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALKEM LABORATORIES LTD. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9190396), filed by ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED, ASTRAZENECA AB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(FLAHERTY, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP et al v. ALKEM LABORATORIES LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALKEM LABORATORIES LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP
Represented By: RAVIN R. PATEL
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED
Represented By: RAVIN R. PATEL
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASTRAZENECA AB
Represented By: RAVIN R. PATEL
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?