ESTEVEZ-FIGUEREDO v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: SAURO D. ESTEVEZ-FIGUEREDO
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2018cv16430
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Peter G Sheridan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that the Respondent shall file an Answer which responds to the allegations of the motion by each paragraph and subparagraph within sixty (60) days of the entry of this Order; the Answer shall be accompanied by certified copies of all indictments and/or charges, transcripts, trial briefs, appendices, opinions, and any and all related documents in the proceedings; Petitioner may submit a response to the Answer within 30 days of receiving the Answer; in lieu of an Answer, the Respondent may file and serve an appropriate motion addressing the 2255 motion. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 1/22/2019. (jem)
November 28, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #2 Substitution of Attorney filed by Meredith J. Williams on 11/27/2018 was submitted incorrectly as a Notice of Appearance. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE document USING the event Other Filings - Other Documents - Substitution of Attorney. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jem)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by MEREDITH J. WILLIAMS on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (WILLIAMS, MEREDITH)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 17-186, filed by SAURO D. ESTEVEZ-FIGUEREDO. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(jmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ESTEVEZ-FIGUEREDO v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: FABIANA PIERRE-LOUIS
Represented By: MEREDITH J. WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SAURO D. ESTEVEZ-FIGUEREDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?