Hittler et al v. Johnson & Johnson, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dana Root, Hector Calvario, Juana Guerrero, Patricia Ann Brown, CRYSTAL MORGAN, Velta Jones, Cheryl Fowler, Eileen Wilhelm, Matthew Roe, JAMES DONOHUE, Kristi Marie Shepherd, Nikita Adams, Lothar Meyer, Pamela Y Williams, Audria Bell, Carol Shepherd, Kimberly Abney, Brent Wallingsford, Warnick Allen, Jr,, Dalene Jensen, Theresa Allen, Sandra Stotts, Merrie White, Edna Whitehead, Laura Tyler, Susan Beenken, Paula Schuetz, Joyce Knutson, Robin Jennings, Kuikiew Devore, Carrie Blackford, Elizabeth Cross, Cynthia Isaguirre, Willisha Ruff, Geraldine H Hecker, Kelly Christine Webb, Marcia Farthing, JESSICA GUTIERREZ, Marie Morgan, Timothy F Prince, Bruce Armes, Roderick Hill, Charine Sherry, Kellie Rollins, Dollie Mae Vanhoy, Joyce Burgess, Cecilia Dimatulac, Ricky Lynn Williams, Barbara Pugh, Maria G Lopez, Glenda Steger, Lavita Gilpin, Gary Doiel, Sharon Raley, Elda Brand, Marcia T Hess, HOWARD JACKSON, James Crumlish, Michelle Underell, Lisa Hittler, Randel Thompson, Rosemarie Novosel, David Peter Johnson and Yolanda Latrice Brown
Defendant: PTI Union, LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC., IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC, PTI Royston, LLC and JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.
In Re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 3:2018cv17106
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #98 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of Imerys' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #97 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of Imerys' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Motions set for 3/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
February 7, 2019 Filing 98 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of Imerys' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Imerys' Motion to Seal Certain Portions of Imerys' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Certification of Mark K. Silver, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(SILVER, MARK)
February 7, 2019 Filing 97 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of Imerys' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Imerys' Motion to Seal Certain Portions of Imerys' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Certification of Mark K. Silver, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(SILVER, MARK)
February 7, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #90 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
February 6, 2019 Filing 96 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by PTI Union, LLC re #74 MOTION to Sever Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Sever Claims : Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Reply in Support of its Renewed Motion to Sever Claims (TINSLEY, CAROLINE)
February 6, 2019 Filing 95 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by PTI Union, LLC re #73 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition for Failure to State a Claim : Reply in Support of Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (TINSLEY, CAROLINE)
February 6, 2019 Filing 94 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by PTI Royston, LLC re #70 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim : Reply in Support of Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (TINSLEY, CAROLINE)
February 6, 2019 Filing 93 Letter from Caroline M. Tinsley to Hon. Freda L. Wolfson re Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC and Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Joinder in Opposing Remand re #92 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,. (TINSLEY, CAROLINE)
February 6, 2019 Filing 92 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC. re #66 MOTION to Remand to the Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
February 6, 2019 Filing 91 Exhibit to #90 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, by IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit J, #5 Exhibit K, #6 Exhibit L, #7 Exhibit M, #8 Exhibit N)(SILVER, MARK)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 6, 2019 Filing 90 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Certification of Mark K. Silver, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit I, #8 Exhibit O, #9 Exhibit P, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(SILVER, MARK)
February 6, 2019 Filing 89 Exhibit to #88 Response to Motion, by IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC. (SILVER, MARK)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 6, 2019 Filing 88 RESPONSE to Motion filed by IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC re #66 MOTION to Remand to the Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri (Attachments: #1 Certification of Mark K. Silver, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit F)(SILVER, MARK)
February 1, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #87 MOTION to Seal in Support of Imerys' Motion to Seal Certain Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #86 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
February 1, 2019 Filing 87 MOTION to Seal in Support of Imerys' Motion to Seal Certain Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Imerys' Motion to Seal Certain Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #2 Certification of Mark K. Silver, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(SILVER, MARK)
February 1, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Imerys' Motion to Seal Certain Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #2 Certification of Mark K. Silver, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(SILVER, MARK)
January 24, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #65 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand in Excess of 45 Pages. Motion set for 2/19/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court.(if, )
January 24, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #65 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand in Excess of 45 Pages. Motion set for 2/4/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (if, )
January 24, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #83 , #84 and #85 MOTIONS to Seal. Motion set for 2/19/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
January 23, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION to Seal Exhibits to PTI Royston, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Imerys' Motion to Seal Certain Portions of PTI Royston, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #2 Certification of Mark K. Silver, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(SILVER, MARK)
January 23, 2019 Filing 84 MOTION to Seal Document #82 Exhibit (to Document),,,, Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to PTI Union's Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (BLAIR, WILLIAM)
January 23, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION to Seal Document #79 Exhibit (to Document),,,, Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to PTI Royston's Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (BLAIR, WILLIAM)
January 23, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #77 MOTION for Leave to File Response Brief to PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to Dismiss in Excess of 45 Pages. Motion set for 2/19/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
January 22, 2019 Filing 82 Exhibit to #81 Response in Opposition to Motion, PTI Union, LLC's Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit 14, #11 Exhibit 15, #12 Exhibit 16, #13 Exhibit 19, #14 Exhibit 20, #15 Exhibit 21, #16 Exhibit 22, #17 Exhibit 23, #18 Exhibit 24, #19 Exhibit 25, #20 Exhibit 26, #21 Exhibit 27, #22 Exhibit 28, #23 Exhibit 29, #24 Exhibit 30, #25 Exhibit 31, #26 Exhibit 34, #27 Exhibit 35, #28 Exhibit 36, #29 Exhibit 37, #30 Exhibit 38, #31 Exhibit 39)(BLAIR, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 22, 2019 Filing 81 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #73 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 13, #5 Exhibit 17, #6 Exhibit 18, #7 Exhibit 32, #8 Exhibit 33, #9 Exhibit 40, #10 Exhibit 41, #11 Exhibit 42)(BLAIR, WILLIAM)
January 22, 2019 Filing 80 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #74 MOTION to Sever Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Sever Claims (BLAIR, WILLIAM)
January 22, 2019 Filing 79 Exhibit to #78 Response in Opposition to Motion,, PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit 14, #11 Exhibit 15, #12 Exhibit 16, #13 Exhibit 19, #14 Exhibit 20, #15 Exhibit 21, #16 Exhibit 22, #17 Exhibit 23, #18 Exhibit 24, #19 Exhibit 25, #20 Exhibit 26, #21 Exhibit 27, #22 Exhibit 28, #23 Exhibit 29, #24 Exhibit 30, #25 Exhibit 33, #26 Exhibit 34, #27 Exhibit 35, #28 Exhibit 36, #29 Exhibit 37, #30 Exhibit 38, #31 Exhibit 39, #32 Exhibit 45)(BLAIR, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 22, 2019 Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #70 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 13, #5 Exhibit 17, #6 Exhibit 18, #7 Exhibit 31, #8 Exhibit 32, #9 Exhibit 40, #10 Exhibit 41, #11 Exhibit 42, #12 Exhibit 43, #13 Exhibit 44, #14 Exhibit 46, #15 Exhibit 47, #16 Exhibit 48)(BLAIR, WILLIAM)
January 22, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION for Leave to File Response Brief to PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to Dismiss in Excess of 45 Pages by All Plaintiffs. (BLAIR, WILLIAM)
January 22, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #76 MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Motion set for 2/19/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
January 18, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Certain Portions of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Certification of Mark K. Silver, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(SILVER, MARK)
January 16, 2019 Filing 75 Letter from Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc. regarding Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand submitted under seal re #67 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, #69 MOTION to Seal Certain Accompanying Exhibits, #66 MOTION to Remand to the Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri, #68 Exhibit (to Document),,,,,. (SILVER, MARK)
January 14, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #74 MOTION to Sever Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Sever Claims. Motion set for 2/4/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
January 14, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #73 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition for Failure to State a Claim. Motion set for 2/4/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
January 14, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #72 MOTION to Seal Document #71 Exhibit (to Document), Motion to Seal Exhibit E, Submitted in Support of Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Cla. Motion set for 2/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
January 14, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #70 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Motion set for 2/4/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
January 11, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION to Sever Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Sever Claims by PTI Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Sever Claims, #2 Certification of Caroline M. Tinsley, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(TINSLEY, CAROLINE)
January 11, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition for Failure to State a Claim by PTI Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition for Failure to State a Claim, #2 Certification of Caroline M. Tinsley, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(TINSLEY, CAROLINE)
January 11, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION to Seal Document #71 Exhibit (to Document),, Motion to Seal Exhibit E, Submitted in Support of Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by PTI Royston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TINSLEY, CAROLINE)
January 11, 2019 Filing 71 Exhibit to #70 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Exhibit E by PTI Royston, LLC. (TINSLEY, CAROLINE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 11, 2019 Filing 70 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by PTI Royston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #2 Certification of Caroline M. Tinsley, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(TINSLEY, CAROLINE)
January 7, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #69 MOTION to Seal Certain Accompanying Exhibits. Motion set for 2/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
January 7, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #66 MOTION to Remand to the Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri. Motion set for 2/4/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
January 7, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #65 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand in Excess of 45 Pages. Motion set for 2/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
January 7, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION to Seal Certain Accompanying Exhibits by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(BLAIR, WILLIAM)
January 7, 2019 Filing 68 Exhibit to #67 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit 14, #11 Exhibit 15, #12 Exhibit 16, #13 Exhibit 19, #14 Exhibit 21, #15 Exhibit 22, #16 Exhibit 23, #17 Exhibit 24, #18 Exhibit 25, #19 Exhibit 26, #20 Exhibit 27, #21 Exhibit 28, #22 Exhibit 29, #23 Exhibit 30, #24 Exhibit 33, #25 Exhibit 34, #26 Exhibit 35, #27 Exhibit 36, #28 Exhibit 37, #29 Exhibit 39, #30 Exhibit 40, #31 Exhibit 44, #32 Exhibit 45, #33 Exhibit 46, #34 Exhibit 47, #35 Exhibit 48, #36 Exhibit 49, #37 Exhibit 50, #38 Exhibit 51, #39 Exhibit 52, #40 Exhibit 53, #41 Exhibit 54)(BLAIR, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 7, 2019 Filing 67 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #66 MOTION to Remand to the Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Index 4, #4 Exhibit 13, #5 Exhibit 17, #6 Exhibit 18, #7 Exhibit 31, #8 Exhibit 32, #9 Exhibit 38, #10 Exhibit 41, #11 Exhibit 42, #12 Exhibit 43, #13 Exhibit 55, #14 Exhibit 56, #15 Exhibit 57, #16 Exhibit 58, #17 Exhibit 59, #18 Exhibit 60, #19 Exhibit 61, #20 Exhibit 62, #21 Exhibit 63, #22 Exhibit 64)(BLAIR, WILLIAM)
January 7, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION to Remand to the Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri by All Plaintiffs. (BLAIR, WILLIAM)
January 7, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand in Excess of 45 Pages by All Plaintiffs. (BLAIR, WILLIAM)
December 19, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by JANET LYNN POLETTO on behalf of PTI Royston, LLC (POLETTO, JANET)
December 19, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by JANET LYNN POLETTO on behalf of PTI Union, LLC (POLETTO, JANET)
December 17, 2018 Filing 62 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (dm )
December 13, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK K. SILVER on behalf of IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC (SILVER, MARK)
December 13, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN)
December 13, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC. (JAMES, SCOTT)
December 12, 2018 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jmh)
December 12, 2018 Filing 58 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:18-cv-01474. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: District of New Jersey. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB)
December 6, 2018 Filing 56 TRANSFER ORDER w/Schedule A attached regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel (DLB)
November 15, 2018 Filing 55 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr for all further proceedings (KXS)
November 14, 2018 *** A case note. EMAILED PARTIES REGARDING FILING MAGISTRATE CONSENT. (KEK)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Stay All Proceedings filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Doc. #7 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Motion for Joinder in Motion to Stay All Proceedings (Doc. #20 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion for Joinder in Motion to Stay All Proceedings (Doc. #27 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc.'s Motion for Joinder in Motion to Stay All Proceedings (Doc. #37 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that this case is STAYED pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on whether to transfer this case to the MDL No. 2738 in the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. (Case stayed.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 9/11/2018. (NEP)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #39 MOTION for Leave to File Their Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Remand in Excess of the Page Limitation by Plaintiffs filed by Ricky Lynn Williams, Edna Whitehead, Gary Doiel, Theresa Allen, James Donohue, Eileen Wilhelm, David Peter Johnson, Warnick Allen, Jr,, Marie Morgan, Dana Root, Kimberly Abney, Joyce Knutson, Crystal Morgan, Carrie Blackford, Kellie Rollins, Audria Bell, Lothar Meyer, Sharon Raley, Dalene Jensen, Cheryl Fowler, Kristi Marie Shepherd, Pamela Y Williams, Glenda Steger, Paula Schuetz, Barbara Pugh, Elizabeth Cross, Marcia T Hess, Sandra Stotts, Susan Beenken, Laura Tyler, Velta Jones, Michelle Underell, Roderick Hill, Howard Jackson, Nikita Adams, Carol Shepherd, Marcia Farthing, Cynthia Isaguirre, Merrie White, Joyce Burgess, Bruce Armes, Dollie Mae Vanhoy, Matthew Roe, Cecilia Dimatulac, Rosemarie Novosel, Kelly Christine Webb, Elda Brand, Robin Jennings, Lavita Gilpin, Lisa Hittler, Brent Wallingsford, Jessica Gutierrez, Kuikiew Devore, Geraldine H Hecker, Patricia Ann Brown, Juana Guerrero, Charine Sherry, Yolanda Latrice Brown, Hector Calvario, Timothy F Prince, Randel Thompson, James Crumlish, Willisha Ruff, Maria G Lopez ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 9/10/2018. (NEP)
September 7, 2018 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Abney, Nikita Adams, Theresa Allen, Warnick Allen, Jr,, Bruce Armes, Susan Beenken, Audria Bell, Carrie Blackford, Elda Brand, Patricia Ann Brown, Yolanda Latrice Brown, Joyce Burgess, Hector Calvario, Elizabeth Cross, James Crumlish, Kuikiew Devore, Cecilia Dimatulac, Gary Doiel, James Donohue, Marcia Farthing, Cheryl Fowler, Lavita Gilpin, Juana Guerrero, Jessica Gutierrez, Geraldine H Hecker, Marcia T Hess, Roderick Hill, Lisa Hittler, Cynthia Isaguirre, Howard Jackson, Robin Jennings, Dalene Jensen, David Peter Johnson, Velta Jones, Joyce Knutson, Maria G Lopez, Lothar Meyer, Crystal Morgan, Marie Morgan, Rosemarie Novosel, Timothy F Prince, Barbara Pugh, Sharon Raley, Matthew Roe, Kellie Rollins, Dana Root, Willisha Ruff, Paula Schuetz, Carol Shepherd, Kristi Marie Shepherd, Charine Sherry, Glenda Steger, Sandra Stotts, Randel Thompson, Laura Tyler, Michelle Underell, Dollie Mae Vanhoy, Brent Wallingsford, Kelly Christine Webb, Merrie White, Edna Whitehead, Eileen Wilhelm, Pamela Y Williams, Ricky Lynn Williams. (Blair, William)
September 7, 2018 Filing 51 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Plaintiffs Kimberly Abney, Nikita Adams, Theresa Allen, Warnick Allen, Jr,, Bruce Armes, Susan Beenken, Audria Bell, Carrie Blackford, Elda Brand, Patricia Ann Brown, Yolanda Latrice Brown, Joyce Burgess, Hector Calvario, Elizabeth Cross, James Crumlish, Kuikiew Devore, Cecilia Dimatulac, Gary Doiel, James Donohue, Marcia Farthing, Cheryl Fowler, Lavita Gilpin, Juana Guerrero, Jessica Gutierrez, Geraldine H Hecker, Marcia T Hess, Roderick Hill, Lisa Hittler, Cynthia Isaguirre, Howard Jackson, Robin Jennings, Dalene Jensen, David Peter Johnson, Velta Jones, Joyce Knutson, Maria G Lopez, Lothar Meyer, Crystal Morgan, Marie Morgan, Rosemarie Novosel, Timothy F Prince, Barbara Pugh, Sharon Raley, Matthew Roe, Kellie Rollins, Dana Root, Willisha Ruff, Paula Schuetz, Carol Shepherd, Kristi Marie Shepherd, Charine Sherry, Glenda Steger, Sandra Stotts, Randel Thompson, Laura Tyler, Michelle Underell, Dollie Mae Vanhoy, Brent Wallingsford, Kelly Christine Webb, Merrie White, Edna Whitehead, Eileen Wilhelm, Pamela Y Williams, Ricky Lynn Williams. (Blair, William)
September 7, 2018 Filing 50 MOTION for Hearing re #40 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri by Plaintiffs Kimberly Abney, Nikita Adams, Theresa Allen, Warnick Allen, Jr,, Bruce Armes, Susan Beenken, Audria Bell, Carrie Blackford, Elda Brand, Patricia Ann Brown, Yolanda Latrice Brown, Joyce Burgess, Hector Calvario, Elizabeth Cross, James Crumlish, Kuikiew Devore, Cecilia Dimatulac, Gary Doiel, James Donohue, Marcia Farthing, Cheryl Fowler, Lavita Gilpin, Juana Guerrero, Jessica Gutierrez, Geraldine H Hecker, Marcia T Hess, Roderick Hill, Lisa Hittler, Cynthia Isaguirre, Howard Jackson, Robin Jennings, Dalene Jensen, David Peter Johnson, Velta Jones, Joyce Knutson, Maria G Lopez, Lothar Meyer, Crystal Morgan, Marie Morgan, Rosemarie Novosel, Timothy F Prince, Barbara Pugh, Sharon Raley, Matthew Roe, Kellie Rollins, Dana Root, Willisha Ruff, Paula Schuetz, Carol Shepherd, Kristi Marie Shepherd, Charine Sherry, Glenda Steger, Sandra Stotts, Randel Thompson, Laura Tyler, Michelle Underell, Dollie Mae Vanhoy, Brent Wallingsford, Kelly Christine Webb, Merrie White, Edna Whitehead, Eileen Wilhelm, Pamela Y Williams, Ricky Lynn Williams. (Blair, William)
September 7, 2018 Filing 49 MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Motion to Remand by Plaintiffs Kimberly Abney, Nikita Adams, Theresa Allen, Warnick Allen, Jr,, Bruce Armes, Susan Beenken, Audria Bell, Carrie Blackford, Elda Brand, Patricia Ann Brown, Yolanda Latrice Brown, Joyce Burgess, Hector Calvario, Elizabeth Cross, James Crumlish, Kuikiew Devore, Cecilia Dimatulac, Gary Doiel, James Donohue, Marcia Farthing, Cheryl Fowler, Lavita Gilpin, Juana Guerrero, Jessica Gutierrez, Geraldine H Hecker, Marcia T Hess, Roderick Hill, Lisa Hittler, Cynthia Isaguirre, Howard Jackson, Robin Jennings, Dalene Jensen, David Peter Johnson, Velta Jones, Joyce Knutson, Maria G Lopez, Lothar Meyer, Crystal Morgan, Marie Morgan, Rosemarie Novosel, Timothy F Prince, Barbara Pugh, Sharon Raley, Matthew Roe, Kellie Rollins, Dana Root, Willisha Ruff, Paula Schuetz, Carol Shepherd, Kristi Marie Shepherd, Charine Sherry, Glenda Steger, Sandra Stotts, Randel Thompson, Laura Tyler, Michelle Underell, Dollie Mae Vanhoy, Brent Wallingsford, Kelly Christine Webb, Merrie White, Edna Whitehead, Eileen Wilhelm, Pamela Y Williams, Ricky Lynn Williams. (Blair, William)
September 7, 2018 Filing 48 SEALED DOCUMENT re #42 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Kimberly Abney, Nikita Adams, Theresa Allen, Warnick Allen, Jr,, Bruce Armes, Susan Beenken, Audria Bell, Carrie Blackford, Elda Brand, Patricia Ann Brown, Yolanda Latrice Brown, Joyce Burgess, Hector Calvario, Elizabeth Cross, James Crumlish, Kuikiew Devore, Cecilia Dimatulac, Gary Doiel, James Donohue, Marcia Farthing, Cheryl Fowler, Lavita Gilpin, Juana Guerrero, Jessica Gutierrez, Geraldine H Hecker, Marcia T Hess, Roderick Hill, Lisa Hittler, Cynthia Isaguirre, Howard Jackson, Robin Jennings, Dalene Jensen, David Peter Johnson, Velta Jones, Joyce Knutson, Maria G Lopez, Lothar Meyer, Crystal Morgan, Marie Morgan, Rosemarie Novosel, Timothy F Prince, Barbara Pugh, Sharon Raley, Matthew Roe, Kellie Rollins, Dana Root, Willisha Ruff, Paula Schuetz, Carol Shepherd, Kristi Marie Shepherd, Charine Sherry, Glenda Steger, Sandra Stotts, Randel Thompson, Laura Tyler, Michelle Underell, Dollie Mae Vanhoy, Brent Wallingsford, Kelly Christine Webb, Merrie White, Edna Whitehead, Eileen Wilhelm, Pamela Y Williams, Ricky Lynn Williams. (Blair, William)
September 7, 2018 Filing 47 SEALED DOCUMENT re #42 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Kimberly Abney, Nikita Adams, Theresa Allen, Warnick Allen, Jr,, Bruce Armes, Susan Beenken, Audria Bell, Carrie Blackford, Elda Brand, Patricia Ann Brown, Yolanda Latrice Brown, Joyce Burgess, Hector Calvario, Elizabeth Cross, James Crumlish, Kuikiew Devore, Cecilia Dimatulac, Gary Doiel, James Donohue, Marcia Farthing, Cheryl Fowler, Lavita Gilpin, Juana Guerrero, Jessica Gutierrez, Geraldine H Hecker, Marcia T Hess, Roderick Hill, Lisa Hittler, Cynthia Isaguirre, Howard Jackson, Robin Jennings, Dalene Jensen, David Peter Johnson, Velta Jones, Joyce Knutson, Maria G Lopez, Lothar Meyer, Crystal Morgan, Marie Morgan, Rosemarie Novosel, Timothy F Prince, Barbara Pugh, Sharon Raley, Matthew Roe, Kellie Rollins, Dana Root, Willisha Ruff, Paula Schuetz, Carol Shepherd, Kristi Marie Shepherd, Charine Sherry, Glenda Steger, Sandra Stotts, Randel Thompson, Laura Tyler, Michelle Underell, Dollie Mae Vanhoy, Brent Wallingsford, Kelly Christine Webb, Merrie White, Edna Whitehead, Eileen Wilhelm, Pamela Y Williams, Ricky Lynn Williams. (Blair, William)
September 7, 2018 Filing 46 SEALED DOCUMENT re #42 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Kimberly Abney, Nikita Adams, Theresa Allen, Warnick Allen, Jr,, Bruce Armes, Susan Beenken, Audria Bell, Carrie Blackford, Elda Brand, Patricia Ann Brown, Yolanda Latrice Brown, Joyce Burgess, Hector Calvario, Elizabeth Cross, James Crumlish, Kuikiew Devore, Cecilia Dimatulac, Gary Doiel, James Donohue, Marcia Farthing, Cheryl Fowler, Lavita Gilpin, Juana Guerrero, Jessica Gutierrez, Geraldine H Hecker, Marcia T Hess, Roderick Hill, Lisa Hittler, Cynthia Isaguirre, Howard Jackson, Robin Jennings, Dalene Jensen, David Peter Johnson, Velta Jones, Joyce Knutson, Maria G Lopez, Lothar Meyer, Crystal Morgan, Marie Morgan, Rosemarie Novosel, Timothy F Prince, Barbara Pugh, Sharon Raley, Matthew Roe, Kellie Rollins, Dana Root, Willisha Ruff, Paula Schuetz, Carol Shepherd, Kristi Marie Shepherd, Charine Sherry, Glenda Steger, Sandra Stotts, Randel Thompson, Laura Tyler, Michelle Underell, Dollie Mae Vanhoy, Brent Wallingsford, Kelly Christine Webb, Merrie White, Edna Whitehead, Eileen Wilhelm, Pamela Y Williams, Ricky Lynn Williams. (Blair, William)
September 7, 2018 Filing 45 SEALED DOCUMENT re #42 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Kimberly Abney, Nikita Adams, Theresa Allen, Warnick Allen, Jr,, Bruce Armes, Susan Beenken, Audria Bell, Carrie Blackford, Elda Brand, Patricia Ann Brown, Yolanda Latrice Brown, Joyce Burgess, Hector Calvario, Elizabeth Cross, James Crumlish, Kuikiew Devore, Cecilia Dimatulac, Gary Doiel, James Donohue, Marcia Farthing, Cheryl Fowler, Lavita Gilpin, Juana Guerrero, Jessica Gutierrez, Geraldine H Hecker, Marcia T Hess, Roderick Hill, Lisa Hittler, Cynthia Isaguirre, Howard Jackson, Robin Jennings, Dalene Jensen, David Peter Johnson, Velta Jones, Joyce Knutson, Maria G Lopez, Lothar Meyer, Crystal Morgan, Marie Morgan, Rosemarie Novosel, Timothy F Prince, Barbara Pugh, Sharon Raley, Matthew Roe, Kellie Rollins, Dana Root, Willisha Ruff, Paula Schuetz, Carol Shepherd, Kristi Marie Shepherd, Charine Sherry, Glenda Steger, Sandra Stotts, Randel Thompson, Laura Tyler, Michelle Underell, Dollie Mae Vanhoy, Brent Wallingsford, Kelly Christine Webb, Merrie White, Edna Whitehead, Eileen Wilhelm, Pamela Y Williams, Ricky Lynn Williams. (Blair, William)
September 7, 2018 Filing 44 SEALED DOCUMENT re #42 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Kimberly Abney, Nikita Adams, Theresa Allen, Warnick Allen, Jr,, Bruce Armes, Susan Beenken, Audria Bell, Carrie Blackford, Elda Brand, Patricia Ann Brown, Yolanda Latrice Brown, Joyce Burgess, Hector Calvario, Elizabeth Cross, James Crumlish, Kuikiew Devore, Cecilia Dimatulac, Gary Doiel, James Donohue, Marcia Farthing, Cheryl Fowler, Lavita Gilpin, Juana Guerrero, Jessica Gutierrez, Geraldine H Hecker, Marcia T Hess, Roderick Hill, Lisa Hittler, Cynthia Isaguirre, Howard Jackson, Robin Jennings, Dalene Jensen, David Peter Johnson, Velta Jones, Joyce Knutson, Maria G Lopez, Lothar Meyer, Crystal Morgan, Marie Morgan, Rosemarie Novosel, Timothy F Prince, Barbara Pugh, Sharon Raley, Matthew Roe, Kellie Rollins, Dana Root, Willisha Ruff, Paula Schuetz, Carol Shepherd, Kristi Marie Shepherd, Charine Sherry, Glenda Steger, Sandra Stotts, Randel Thompson, Laura Tyler, Michelle Underell, Dollie Mae Vanhoy, Brent Wallingsford, Kelly Christine Webb, Merrie White, Edna Whitehead, Eileen Wilhelm, Pamela Y Williams, Ricky Lynn Williams. (Blair, William)
September 7, 2018 Filing 43 SEALED DOCUMENT re #42 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Kimberly Abney, Nikita Adams, Theresa Allen, Warnick Allen, Jr,, Bruce Armes, Susan Beenken, Audria Bell, Carrie Blackford, Elda Brand, Patricia Ann Brown, Yolanda Latrice Brown, Joyce Burgess, Hector Calvario, Elizabeth Cross, James Crumlish, Kuikiew Devore, Cecilia Dimatulac, Gary Doiel, James Donohue, Marcia Farthing, Cheryl Fowler, Lavita Gilpin, Juana Guerrero, Jessica Gutierrez, Geraldine H Hecker, Marcia T Hess, Roderick Hill, Lisa Hittler, Cynthia Isaguirre, Howard Jackson, Robin Jennings, Dalene Jensen, David Peter Johnson, Velta Jones, Joyce Knutson, Maria G Lopez, Lothar Meyer, Crystal Morgan, Marie Morgan, Rosemarie Novosel, Timothy F Prince, Barbara Pugh, Sharon Raley, Matthew Roe, Kellie Rollins, Dana Root, Willisha Ruff, Paula Schuetz, Carol Shepherd, Kristi Marie Shepherd, Charine Sherry, Glenda Steger, Sandra Stotts, Randel Thompson, Laura Tyler, Michelle Underell, Dollie Mae Vanhoy, Brent Wallingsford, Kelly Christine Webb, Merrie White, Edna Whitehead, Eileen Wilhelm, Pamela Y Williams, Ricky Lynn Williams. (Blair, William)
September 7, 2018 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #40 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri filed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Abney, Nikita Adams, Theresa Allen, Warnick Allen, Jr,, Bruce Armes, Susan Beenken, Audria Bell, Carrie Blackford, Elda Brand, Patricia Ann Brown, Yolanda Latrice Brown, Joyce Burgess, Hector Calvario, Elizabeth Cross, James Crumlish, Kuikiew Devore, Cecilia Dimatulac, Gary Doiel, James Donohue, Marcia Farthing, Cheryl Fowler, Lavita Gilpin, Juana Guerrero, Jessica Gutierrez, Geraldine H Hecker, Marcia T Hess, Roderick Hill, Lisa Hittler, Cynthia Isaguirre, Howard Jackson, Robin Jennings, Dalene Jensen, David Peter Johnson, Velta Jones, Joyce Knutson, Maria G Lopez, Lothar Meyer, Crystal Morgan, Marie Morgan, Rosemarie Novosel, Timothy F Prince, Barbara Pugh, Sharon Raley, Matthew Roe, Kellie Rollins, Dana Root, Willisha Ruff, Paula Schuetz, Carol Shepherd, Kristi Marie Shepherd, Charine Sherry, Glenda Steger, Sandra Stotts, Randel Thompson, Laura Tyler, Michelle Underell, Dollie Mae Vanhoy, Brent Wallingsford, Kelly Christine Webb, Merrie White, Edna Whitehead, Eileen Wilhelm, Pamela Y Williams, Ricky Lynn Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S)(Blair, William)
September 7, 2018 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Exhibits A-D, F and H To Their Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Plaintiffs Kimberly Abney, Nikita Adams, Theresa Allen, Warnick Allen, Jr,, Bruce Armes, Susan Beenken, Audria Bell, Carrie Blackford, Elda Brand, Patricia Ann Brown, Yolanda Latrice Brown, Joyce Burgess, Hector Calvario, Elizabeth Cross, James Crumlish, Kuikiew Devore, Cecilia Dimatulac, Gary Doiel, James Donohue, Marcia Farthing, Cheryl Fowler, Lavita Gilpin, Juana Guerrero, Jessica Gutierrez, Geraldine H Hecker, Marcia T Hess, Roderick Hill, Lisa Hittler, Cynthia Isaguirre, Howard Jackson, Robin Jennings, Dalene Jensen, David Peter Johnson, Velta Jones, Joyce Knutson, Maria G Lopez, Lothar Meyer, Crystal Morgan, Marie Morgan, Rosemarie Novosel, Timothy F Prince, Barbara Pugh, Sharon Raley, Matthew Roe, Kellie Rollins, Dana Root, Willisha Ruff, Paula Schuetz, Carol Shepherd, Kristi Marie Shepherd, Charine Sherry, Glenda Steger, Sandra Stotts, Randel Thompson, Laura Tyler, Michelle Underell, Dollie Mae Vanhoy, Brent Wallingsford, Kelly Christine Webb, Merrie White, Edna Whitehead, Eileen Wilhelm, Pamela Y Williams, Ricky Lynn Williams. (Blair, William)
September 7, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri by Plaintiffs Kimberly Abney, Nikita Adams, Theresa Allen, Warnick Allen, Jr,, Bruce Armes, Susan Beenken, Audria Bell, Carrie Blackford, Elda Brand, Patricia Ann Brown, Yolanda Latrice Brown, Joyce Burgess, Hector Calvario, Elizabeth Cross, James Crumlish, Kuikiew Devore, Cecilia Dimatulac, Gary Doiel, James Donohue, Marcia Farthing, Cheryl Fowler, Lavita Gilpin, Juana Guerrero, Jessica Gutierrez, Geraldine H Hecker, Marcia T Hess, Roderick Hill, Lisa Hittler, Cynthia Isaguirre, Howard Jackson, Robin Jennings, Dalene Jensen, David Peter Johnson, Velta Jones, Joyce Knutson, Maria G Lopez, Lothar Meyer, Crystal Morgan, Marie Morgan, Rosemarie Novosel, Timothy F Prince, Barbara Pugh, Sharon Raley, Matthew Roe, Kellie Rollins, Dana Root, Willisha Ruff, Paula Schuetz, Carol Shepherd, Kristi Marie Shepherd, Charine Sherry, Glenda Steger, Sandra Stotts, Randel Thompson, Laura Tyler, Michelle Underell, Dollie Mae Vanhoy, Brent Wallingsford, Kelly Christine Webb, Merrie White, Edna Whitehead, Eileen Wilhelm, Pamela Y Williams, Ricky Lynn Williams. (Blair, William)
September 7, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to File Their Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Remand in Excess of the Page Limitation by Plaintiffs Kimberly Abney, Nikita Adams, Theresa Allen, Warnick Allen, Jr,, Bruce Armes, Susan Beenken, Audria Bell, Carrie Blackford, Elda Brand, Patricia Ann Brown, Yolanda Latrice Brown, Joyce Burgess, Hector Calvario, Elizabeth Cross, James Crumlish, Kuikiew Devore, Cecilia Dimatulac, Gary Doiel, James Donohue, Marcia Farthing, Cheryl Fowler, Lavita Gilpin, Juana Guerrero, Jessica Gutierrez, Geraldine H Hecker, Marcia T Hess, Roderick Hill, Lisa Hittler, Cynthia Isaguirre, Howard Jackson, Robin Jennings, Dalene Jensen, David Peter Johnson, Velta Jones, Joyce Knutson, Maria G Lopez, Lothar Meyer, Crystal Morgan, Marie Morgan, Rosemarie Novosel, Timothy F Prince, Barbara Pugh, Sharon Raley, Matthew Roe, Kellie Rollins, Dana Root, Willisha Ruff, Paula Schuetz, Carol Shepherd, Kristi Marie Shepherd, Charine Sherry, Glenda Steger, Sandra Stotts, Randel Thompson, Laura Tyler, Michelle Underell, Dollie Mae Vanhoy, Brent Wallingsford, Kelly Christine Webb, Merrie White, Edna Whitehead, Eileen Wilhelm, Pamela Y Williams, Ricky Lynn Williams. (Blair, William)
September 7, 2018 Filing 38 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc.. Parent companies: Imerys Minerals Holding Limited (f/k/a Imerys Talc Holding Limited); Imerys S.A.; Imerys USA, Inc., Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Mellow, Mary Anne)
September 7, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION for Joinder Defendants Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Mellow, Mary Anne)
September 7, 2018 Filing 36 SEALED DOCUMENT re #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - FILED UNDER SEAL, #2 Exhibit E - FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit F - FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit G - FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit I - FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit J - FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit K - FILED UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit L - FILED UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit M - FILED UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit O - FILED UNDER SEAL)(Mellow, Mary Anne)
September 7, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E - TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit F - TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit G - TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I - TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit J - TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL, #11 Exhibit K - TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL, #12 Exhibit L - TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL, #13 Exhibit M -TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O - TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL)(Mellow, Mary Anne)
September 7, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mellow, Mary Anne)
September 7, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to File a Combined Motion and Memorandum of Law to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction in Excess of the Page Limitation by Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Mellow, Mary Anne)
September 7, 2018 Filing 32 ENTRY of Appearance by Mary Anne Mellow for Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Mellow, Mary Anne)
September 7, 2018 Filing 31 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark A. Prost for Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Prost, Mark)
September 7, 2018 Filing 30 ENTRY of Appearance by Steven Thomas Walsh for Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Walsh, Steven)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #25 MOTION to Seal Document Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to File Exhibit D to its Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim under Seal by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline) filed by PTI Royston, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 9/7/2018. (NEP)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #24 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion for Leave to File its Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim in Excess of the Page Limitation by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted, # 2 Exhibit A - Noland Jr. Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit B - Crume Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit C - Noland Sr. Affidavit, # 5 Exhibit D - to be submitted under seal, # 6 Exhibit E - 3-26-2008 Am. Art. of Incorporation (Name Change), # 7 Exhibit F - 12-31-2012 Request for Termination (dissolution))(Tinsley, Caroline) filed by PTI Royston, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 9/7/2018. (NEP)
September 6, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION for Joinder Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
September 6, 2018 Filing 26 SEALED DOCUMENT re #25 MOTION to Seal Document Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to File Exhibit D to its Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim under Seal by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tinsley, Caroline)
September 6, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Seal Document Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to File Exhibit D to its Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim under Seal by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
September 6, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion for Leave to File its Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim in Excess of the Page Limitation by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted, #2 Exhibit A - Noland Jr. Affidavit, #3 Exhibit B - Crume Affidavit, #4 Exhibit C - Noland Sr. Affidavit, #5 Exhibit D - to be submitted under seal, #6 Exhibit E - 3-26-2008 Am. Art. of Incorporation (Name Change), #7 Exhibit F - 12-31-2012 Request for Termination (dissolution))(Tinsley, Caroline)
September 6, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
September 6, 2018 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC.. (Tinsley, Caroline)
September 6, 2018 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Caroline M. Tinsley for Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
September 6, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Joinder Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
September 6, 2018 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #18 MOTION to Sever Claims filed by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Preliminary Writ of Prohibition)(Tinsley, Caroline)
September 6, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Sever Claims by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
September 6, 2018 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Crume Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Noland Jr Affidavit)(Tinsley, Caroline)
September 6, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
September 6, 2018 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant PTI Union, LLC.. (Tinsley, Caroline)
September 6, 2018 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Caroline M. Tinsley for Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
September 4, 2018 Filing 13 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
September 4, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (JWD)
August 31, 2018 Filing 12 First Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Jefferson County Circuit Court, filed by David Peter Johnson, Robin Jennings, Ricky Lynn Williams, Marcia Farthing, Susan Beenken, Geraldine H Hecker, Cecilia Dimatulac, James Crumlish, Kellie Rollins, Michelle Underell, Marcia T Hess, Dollie Mae Vanhoy, Eileen Wilhelm, James Donohue, Elda Brand, Dalene Jensen, Joyce Knutson, Patricia Ann Brown, Carol Shepherd, Cynthia Isaguirre, Charine Sherry, Rosemarie Novosel, Lothar Meyer, Kelly Christine Webb, Barbara Pugh, Yolanda Latrice Brown, Elizabeth Cross, Sandra Stotts, Edna Whitehead, Brent Wallingsford, Dana Root, Gary Doiel, Pamela Y Williams, Laura Tyler, Kimberly Abney, Kuikiew Devore, Lisa Hittler, Howard Jackson, Jessica Gutierrez, Roderick Hill, Timothy F Prince, Hector Calvario, Merrie White, Kristi Marie Shepherd, Juana Guerrero, Randel Thompson, Cheryl Fowler, Sharon Raley, Willisha Ruff, Lavita Gilpin, Joyce Burgess, Bruce Armes, Nikita Adams, Maria G Lopez, Carrie Blackford, Glenda Steger, Paula Schuetz, Audria Bell, Marie Morgan, Theresa Allen, Velta Jones, Crystal Morgan, Matthew Roe, Warnick Allen, Jr,.(JWD)
August 31, 2018 Filing 11 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Jefferson County Circuit Court, filed by David Peter Johnson, Robin Jennings, Ricky Lynn Williams, Marcia Farthing, Susan Beenken, Geraldine H Hecker, Cecilia Dimatulac, James Crumlish, Kellie Rollins, Michelle Underell, Marcia T Hess, Dollie Mae Vanhoy, Eileen Wilhelm, James Donohue, Elda Brand, Dalene Jensen, Joyce Knutson, Patricia Ann Brown, Carol Shepherd, Cynthia Isaguirre, Charine Sherry, Rosemarie Novosel, Lothar Meyer, Kelly Christine Webb, Barbara Pugh, Yolanda Latrice Brown, Elizabeth Cross, Sandra Stotts, Edna Whitehead, Brent Wallingsford, Dana Root, Gary Doiel, Pamela Y Williams, Laura Tyler, Kimberly Abney, Kuikiew Devore, Lisa Hittler, Howard Jackson, Jessica Gutierrez, Roderick Hill, Timothy F Prince, Hector Calvario, Merrie White, Kristi Marie Shepherd, Juana Guerrero, Randel Thompson, Cheryl Fowler, Sharon Raley, Willisha Ruff, Lavita Gilpin, Joyce Burgess, Bruce Armes, Nikita Adams, Maria G Lopez, Carrie Blackford, Glenda Steger, Paula Schuetz, Audria Bell, Marie Morgan, Theresa Allen, Velta Jones, Crystal Morgan, Matthew Roe, Warnick Allen, Jr,.(JWD)
August 31, 2018 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc... (Bauer, Beth)
August 31, 2018 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Johnson & Johnson, Inc... (Bauer, Beth)
August 31, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Stay filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Rea Order, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Phillips Order)(Bauer, Beth)
August 31, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Bauer, Beth)
August 31, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc..(Bauer, Beth)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Elberg Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Son Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - List of Plaintiffs)(Bauer, Beth)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Bauer, Beth)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Their Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Bauer, Beth)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Bauer, Beth)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 18JE-CC00448, with receipt number 0865-6728635, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - First Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Decl of Noland, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Decl of Tarrasch, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Decker Affidavit, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - State Court File, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Imery's Consent, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - PTI Consent, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Bauer, Beth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hittler et al v. Johnson & Johnson, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Root
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Calvario
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Guerrero
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Ann Brown
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL MORGAN
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Velta Jones
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Fowler
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Wilhelm
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Roe
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES DONOHUE
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristi Marie Shepherd
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikita Adams
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lothar Meyer
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Y Williams
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audria Bell
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Shepherd
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Abney
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Wallingsford
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warnick Allen, Jr,
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dalene Jensen
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Allen
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Stotts
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merrie White
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Whitehead
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Tyler
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Beenken
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Schuetz
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Knutson
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Jennings
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kuikiew Devore
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Blackford
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Cross
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Isaguirre
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willisha Ruff
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine H Hecker
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Christine Webb
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Farthing
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA GUTIERREZ
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Morgan
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy F Prince
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Armes
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Hill
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charine Sherry
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie Rollins
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dollie Mae Vanhoy
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Burgess
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Dimatulac
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Lynn Williams
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Pugh
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria G Lopez
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Steger
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavita Gilpin
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Doiel
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Raley
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elda Brand
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia T Hess
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOWARD JACKSON
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Crumlish
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Underell
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Hittler
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randel Thompson
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemarie Novosel
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Peter Johnson
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Latrice Brown
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTI Union, LLC
Represented By: CAROLINE M. TINSLEY
Represented By: JANET LYNN POLETTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC.
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Represented By: KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC
Represented By: Steven Thomas Walsh
Represented By: MARY ANNE MELLOW
Represented By: MARK A. PROST
Represented By: MARK K. SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTI Royston, LLC
Represented By: CAROLINE M. TINSLEY
Represented By: JANET LYNN POLETTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Represented By: KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?