ALY et al v. VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al
Plaintiff: PHILIP GARLAND, TINA DAVIS, BAHAA ALY and ERINCH OZADA
Defendant: HOWARD B. SCHILLER, DEBORAH JORN, ARI S. KELLEN, TANYA CARRO, ROBERT L. ROSIELLO, J. MICHAEL PEARSON, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., n/k/a BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC. and VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Case Number: 3:2018cv17393
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that, by February 22, 2019, each party shall e-file correspondence, no longer than 3 pages addressing the party's consent or opposition to the appointment of a special master; the party's position on the items identified in Rule 53(b)(2); and the party's position on any other issues the party would like the Court to consider in relation to the appointment of a special master. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 2/15/2019. (gxh)
February 5, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, PAUL C. CURNIN, CRAIG S. WALDMAN, DANIEL J. STUJENSKE and DEAN MCGEE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (km)
February 5, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Dean McGee to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9382893.) (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
February 5, 2019 Filing 24 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Daniel J. Stujenske to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9382865.) (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
February 5, 2019 Filing 23 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Craig S. Waldman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9382807.) (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
February 5, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Paul C. Curnin to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9382763.) (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER that all Defendants will have until March 4, 2019, to respond to the Complaint; that Plaintiffs will have until April 1, 2019 to file opposition; and that Defendants will have until April 15, 2019, to file any replies. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 2/4/2019. **Note: This Stipulation and Order was originally filed in Civil Action No. 15-7658 (ECF No. 414 ).(gxh)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CONSENT ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Paul C. Curnin, Craig S. Waldman, Daniel J. Stujenske and Dean McGee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 2/1/2019. (km)
February 1, 2019 Filing 19 Letter from Richard Hernandez to the Hon. Michael A. Shipp, U.S.D.J., enclosing Stipulation and Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
January 31, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW JOSEPH PETROZZIELLO on behalf of J. MICHAEL PEARSON (PETROZZIELLO, MATTHEW)
January 31, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul C. Curnin, Craig S. Waldman, Daniel J. Stujenske and Dean McGee for by ARI S. KELLEN, ROBERT L. ROSIELLO, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard Hernandez in support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Declaration of Paul C. Curnin in support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Declaration of Craig S. Waldman in support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #4 Declaration of Daniel J. Stujenske in support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #5 Declaration of Dean McGee in support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
January 31, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
January 30, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by DEBORAH JORN. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Cara David, #2 Certification of Barry Bohrer, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(DAVID, CARA)
January 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by CARA JOY DAVID on behalf of DEBORAH JORN (DAVID, CARA)
January 29, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
January 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO on behalf of TANYA CARRO (BAREENTTO, OMAR)
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO on behalf of ARI S. KELLEN, ROBERT L. ROSIELLO, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. (BAREENTTO, OMAR)
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD HERNANDEZ on behalf of TANYA CARRO (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD HERNANDEZ on behalf of ARI S. KELLEN, ROBERT L. ROSIELLO, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PHILIP GARLAND, TINA DAVIS, BAHAA ALY, ERINCH OZADA. HOWARD B. SCHILLER waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (KIM, JOOYUN)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PHILIP GARLAND, TINA DAVIS, BAHAA ALY, ERINCH OZADA. VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. waiver sent on 12/31/2018, answer due 3/1/2019. (KIM, JOOYUN)
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PHILIP GARLAND, TINA DAVIS, BAHAA ALY, ERINCH OZADA. ROBERT L. ROSIELLO waiver sent on 12/31/2018, answer due 3/1/2019. (KIM, JOOYUN)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PHILIP GARLAND, TINA DAVIS, BAHAA ALY, ERINCH OZADA. ARI S. KELLEN waiver sent on 12/31/2018, answer due 3/1/2019. (KIM, JOOYUN)
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PHILIP GARLAND, TINA DAVIS, BAHAA ALY, ERINCH OZADA. TANYA CARRO waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (KIM, JOOYUN)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PHILIP GARLAND, TINA DAVIS, BAHAA ALY, ERINCH OZADA. DEBORAH JORN waiver sent on 12/31/2018, answer due 3/1/2019. (KIM, JOOYUN)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PHILIP GARLAND, TINA DAVIS, BAHAA ALY, ERINCH OZADA. J. MICHAEL PEARSON waiver sent on 12/31/2018, answer due 3/1/2019. (KIM, JOOYUN)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to TANYA CARRO, DEBORAH JORN, ARI S. KELLEN, J. MICHAEL PEARSON, ROBERT L. ROSIELLO, HOWARD B. SCHILLER, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
December 19, 2018 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jmh)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., n/k/a BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC., J. MICHAEL PEARSON, ROBERT L. ROSIELLO, DEBORAH JORN, ARI S. KELLEN, TANYA CARRO, HOWARD B. SCHILLER ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9255565) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ERINCH OZADA, BAHAA ALY, PHILIP GARLAND, TINA DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certification Certification of Relatedness)(KIM, JOOYUN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALY et al v. VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILIP GARLAND
Represented By: JOOYUN KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TINA DAVIS
Represented By: JOOYUN KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAHAA ALY
Represented By: JOOYUN KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERINCH OZADA
Represented By: JOOYUN KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWARD B. SCHILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBORAH JORN
Represented By: CARA JOY DAVID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARI S. KELLEN
Represented By: OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Represented By: RICHARD HERNANDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TANYA CARRO
Represented By: OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Represented By: RICHARD HERNANDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT L. ROSIELLO
Represented By: OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Represented By: RICHARD HERNANDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. MICHAEL PEARSON
Represented By: MATTHEW JOSEPH PETROZZIELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., n/k/a BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Represented By: RICHARD HERNANDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?