FITCHBURG MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.
Plaintiff: FITCHBURG MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.
Case Number: 3:2018cv17397
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 3/19/2019 10:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov(ce3)
January 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID R. KOTT on behalf of ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. (KOTT, DAVID)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. identifying Electrolux North America, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (CORONATO, WILFRED)
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC..(CORONATO, WILFRED)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FITCHBURG MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019. (NOONE, MATTHEW)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
December 21, 2018 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jjc, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FITCHBURG MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Norfolk & Dedham Pool as Corporate Parent.. (NOONE, MATTHEW)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9255736) with JURY DEMAND, filed by FITCHBURG MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(NOONE, MATTHEW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FITCHBURG MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: WILFRED P. CORONATO
Represented By: DAVID R. KOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FITCHBURG MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: MATTHEW F. NOONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?