AMERICAN ADDICTION CENTERS, INC. et al v. GREENAGEL II et al
Plaintiff: AMERICAN ADDICTION CENTERS, INC. and RECOVERY BRANDS, LLC
Defendant: GREENAGEL COUNSELING SERVICES, LLC, ANDREW WALSH and FRANK L. GREENAGEL II
Case Number: 3:2018cv17428
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Anne E Thompson
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER Dismissing Case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 6/28/2019. (km)
June 26, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION of Dismissal (AND ORDER) WITH PREJUDICE by AMERICAN ADDICTION CENTERS, INC.. (KOTT, DAVID)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER canceling the Telephone Conference scheduled for 6/10/19 with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Counsel is directed to report on the status of settlement by 6/28/19. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 6/10/19. (if, )
June 4, 2019 ATTENTION COUNSEL: Telephone Conference Call set for 6/10/19 at 3:00 p.m. with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call at that time. (if, )
May 28, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Telephone Conference held on 5/28/2019. (gxh)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER setting a Telephone Conference Call for 5/28/19 at 4:00 p.m. with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Mr. Kott to initiate the call at that time. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 5/16/19. (if, )
May 15, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/15/2019. (if, )
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/15/2019 09:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 3/13/2019. (mps)
March 12, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JOHN A. CRAWFORD, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mps)
March 11, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice John A. Crawford, Jr., Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (KOTT, DAVID)
March 11, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to John A. Crawford, Jr., Esq. Receipt number TRE100568 (in-jdb, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to John A. Crawford, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 3/5/2019. (mps)
March 1, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GREENAGEL COUNSELING SERVICES, LLC. (CHIPKO, MICHAEL)
March 1, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by GREENAGEL COUNSELING SERVICES, LLC, FRANK L. GREENAGEL II. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CHIPKO, MICHAEL)
February 28, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ANDREW WALSH. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CIMINO, ALYSSA)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL P. CHIPKO on behalf of GREENAGEL COUNSELING SERVICES, LLC, FRANK L. GREENAGEL II (CHIPKO, MICHAEL)
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Defts with Stipulation & proposed Order Extending Time for Defts to Answer Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipuation & Order Extending Time To Answer)(CIMINO, ALYSSA)
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AMERICAN ADDICTION CENTERS, INC., RECOVERY BRANDS, LLC. FRANK L. GREENAGEL II waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (KOTT, DAVID)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AMERICAN ADDICTION CENTERS, INC., RECOVERY BRANDS, LLC. GREENAGEL COUNSELING SERVICES, LLC waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (KOTT, DAVID)
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICAN ADDICTION CENTERS, INC., RECOVERY BRANDS, LLC. ANDREW WALSH served on 12/23/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (KOTT, DAVID)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GREENAGEL COUNSELING SERVICES, LLC, FRANK L. GREENAGEL II, ANDREW WALSH. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 AO120 Trademark Form filed. re: #1 Complaint (jmh)
December 21, 2018 Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jjc, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN ADDICTION CENTERS, INC., RECOVERY BRANDS, LLC identifying AAC Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (KOTT, DAVID)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Summons to be Issued by AMERICAN ADDICTION CENTERS, INC., RECOVERY BRANDS, LLC as to ANDREW WALSH. (KOTT, DAVID)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by AMERICAN ADDICTION CENTERS, INC., RECOVERY BRANDS, LLC as to GREENAGEL COUNSELING SERVICES, LLC. (KOTT, DAVID)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by AMERICAN ADDICTION CENTERS, INC., RECOVERY BRANDS, LLC as to FRANK L. GREENAGEL II. (KOTT, DAVID)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GREENAGEL COUNSELING SERVICES, LLC, FRANK L. GREENAGEL II, ANDREW WALSH ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9257419) with JURY DEMAND, filed by AMERICAN ADDICTION CENTERS, INC., RECOVERY BRANDS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(KOTT, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN ADDICTION CENTERS, INC. et al v. GREENAGEL II et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENAGEL COUNSELING SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL P. CHIPKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW WALSH
Represented By: ALYSSA A. CIMINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK L. GREENAGEL II
Represented By: MICHAEL P. CHIPKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN ADDICTION CENTERS, INC.
Represented By: DAVID R. KOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RECOVERY BRANDS, LLC
Represented By: DAVID R. KOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?