KOVACS et al v. STATE OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF LABOR & WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT et al
Plaintiff: DIAMOND CONSTRUCTION, STATEWIDE CONSTRUCTION PERSONNEL INC. and JOHN KOVACS
Defendant: STATE OF NEW JERSEY OFFICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE LAW, JOHN DOE 1-10, JOHN DOE AGENCIES and STATE OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF LABOR & WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT
Case Number: 3:2018cv17583
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT ORDER that that the defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint by 2/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1/22/2019. (km)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN KOVACS, STATEWIDE CONSTRUCTION PERSONNEL INC., DIAMOND CONSTRUCTION. STATE OF NEW JERSEY OFFICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE LAW served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. (TOBIA, RONALD)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN KOVACS, STATEWIDE CONSTRUCTION PERSONNEL INC., DIAMOND CONSTRUCTION. STATE OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF LABOR & WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. (TOBIA, RONALD)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by OTHIAMBA NKOSI LOVELACE on behalf of DIAMOND CONSTRUCTION, JOHN KOVACS, STATEWIDE CONSTRUCTION PERSONNEL INC. (LOVELACE, OTHIAMBA)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to STATE OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF LABOR & WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT, STATE OF NEW JERSEY OFFICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE LAW. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
December 27, 2018 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jmh)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE 1-10, JOHN DOE AGENCIES, STATE OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF LABOR & WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT, STATE OF NEW JERSEY OFFICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE LAW ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9266620), filed by JOHN KOVACS. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(TOBIA, RONALD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KOVACS et al v. STATE OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF LABOR & WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NEW JERSEY OFFICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE AGENCIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF LABOR & WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIAMOND CONSTRUCTION
Represented By: OTHIAMBA NKOSI LOVELACE
Represented By: RONALD L. TOBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATEWIDE CONSTRUCTION PERSONNEL INC.
Represented By: OTHIAMBA NKOSI LOVELACE
Represented By: RONALD L. TOBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN KOVACS
Represented By: RONALD L. TOBIA
Represented By: OTHIAMBA NKOSI LOVELACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?