KENDALE v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Plaintiff: LEINAHTAN KENDALE
Defendant: IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC ("IMERYS TALC"), JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. F/K/A JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON and JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.
In Re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 3:2019cv00313
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK K. SILVER on behalf of IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC ("IMERYS TALC") (SILVER, MARK)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (JAMES, SCOTT)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (TERSIGNI, JULIE)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
January 11, 2019 Member Case Direct File on 01/11/2019, for MDL 2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (jmh)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC ("IMERYS TALC"), JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
January 10, 2019 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jmh)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC ("IMERYS TALC"), JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. F/K/A JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9295585) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LEINAHTAN KENDALE(ON BEHALF OF LYNORA SIMMONS-KENDALE), LEINAHTAN KENDALE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SHAH, TAYJES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KENDALE v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEINAHTAN KENDALE
Represented By: TAYJES MATTHEW SHAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC ("IMERYS TALC")
Represented By: MARK K. SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. F/K/A JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Represented By: KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Represented By: SUSAN M. SHARKO
Represented By: JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Represented By: KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Represented By: SUSAN M. SHARKO
Represented By: JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?