MARTIN v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Plaintiff: TERESA MARTIN
Defendant: ETHICON, INC. and JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Case Number: 3:2019cv00447
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Middlesex County Courthouse*56 Paterson StreetNew Brunswick, NJ 08903 State No: MID-L367-19. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (mps)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT ORDER that the Notice of Removal filed on 1/14/2019 is withdrawn. This matter is remanded back to the Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Middlesex County. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 1/28/2019. (mps)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID R. KOTT on behalf of ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON (KOTT, DAVID)
January 14, 2019 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jmh)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (CRAWFORD, KELLY)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON from Superior Court of Middlesex County, NJ, case number MID-L-367-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9303475), filed by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(CRAWFORD, KELLY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARTIN v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETHICON, INC.
Represented By: KELLY S. CRAWFORD
Represented By: DAVID R. KOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: KELLY S. CRAWFORD
Represented By: DAVID R. KOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA MARTIN
Represented By: MARC DAVID GROSSMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?