KLINGER v. CULBERT, D.C. et al
Plaintiff: EDWARD KLINGER
Defendant: SCHOOLEY'S MOUNTAIN CHIROPRACTIC CENTER INC. and JEFFREY CULBERT, D.C.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01007
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES EDWARD HOCKENBERRY on behalf of EDWARD KLINGER (HOCKENBERRY, JAMES)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/30/2019 09:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 3/13/2019. (mps)
March 12, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 4/15/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JEFFREY CULBERT, D.C.. (BURNS, KAREN)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JEFFREY CULBERT, D.C.. (BURNS, KAREN)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by JEFFREY CULBERT, D.C..(BURNS, KAREN)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EDWARD KLINGER. JEFFREY CULBERT, D.C. waiver sent on 1/25/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (AUSSPRUNG, H.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EDWARD KLINGER. (AUSSPRUNG, H.)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JEFFREY CULBERT, D.C., SCHOOLEY'S MOUNTAIN CHIROPRACTIC CENTER INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
January 24, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint submitted by H. Leon Aussprung on 01/24/2019 appears to have address information as to Plaintiff's attorney H. Leon Aussprung that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (jmh)
January 24, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jmh)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JEFFREY CULBERT, D.C., SCHOOLEY'S MOUNTAIN CHIROPRACTIC CENTER INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9330937) with JURY DEMAND, filed by EDWARD KLINGER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(AUSSPRUNG, H.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KLINGER v. CULBERT, D.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHOOLEY'S MOUNTAIN CHIROPRACTIC CENTER INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY CULBERT, D.C.
Represented By: KAREN SARACO BURNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD KLINGER
Represented By: H. LEON AUSSPRUNG, III
Represented By: JAMES EDWARD HOCKENBERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?