POLLINGER v. CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: HELEN R POLLINGER and WILLIAM POLLINGER
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC., CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY, IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC., JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1-50, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, REVLON, INC., REVLON CONSUMER PRODUCTS CORP. and PROCTER & GAMBLE
Case Number: 3:2019cv01041
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 15 Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Middlesex County Courthouse*56 Paterson StreetNew Brunswick, NJ 08903 State No: MID-L446-19AS. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (jem)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Plaintiffs Motion to Remand #10 . Revlon's Motion to Withdraw Notice of Removal #12 is granted. The Clerk of the Court shall remand this matter to the Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Middlesex County. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 2/15/2019. (jem)
February 8, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #12 Emergency MOTION to Withdraw #1 Notice of Removal, . Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
February 7, 2019 Filing 13 Exhibit to #12 Motion to Withdraw Notice of Removal by REVLON, INC.. (VIOLA, ROY)
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 Emergency MOTION to Withdraw #1 Notice of Removal, by REVLON, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(VIOLA, ROY)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER- The Initial rule 16 conference scheduled for March 12, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni is adjourned with no new date. Parties are to notify the Court upon decision of the pending motion to remand. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm)
January 31, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by HELEN R POLLINGER, WILLIAM POLLINGER. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certification Counsel Certification in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand to State Court, #4 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court, #5 Certification Certification of Filing and Service, #6 Certificate of Service, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit Exhibit C)(WILSON, NEIDRA)
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Shulton, Inc. on 01/30/2019, filed by HELEN R POLLINGER. (WILSON, NEIDRA)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Revlon, Inc. on 01/30/2019, filed by HELEN R POLLINGER. (WILSON, NEIDRA)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Revlon Consumer Products Corp on 01/30/2019, filed by HELEN R POLLINGER. (WILSON, NEIDRA)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Johnson & Johnson on 01/30/2019, filed by HELEN R POLLINGER. (WILSON, NEIDRA)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. on 01/30/2019, filed by HELEN R POLLINGER. (WILSON, NEIDRA)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY, IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC., REVLON CONSUMER PRODUCTS CORP., REVLON, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jem)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by HELEN R POLLINGER as to All Defendants. (WILSON, NEIDRA)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/12/2019 at 2:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1/25/2019. (jem)
January 24, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jmh)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by REVLON, INC. from Middlesex County Superior Court of New Jersey, case number MID-L-00446-19AS. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9332585), filed by REVLON, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Counsel Mailing List, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(VIOLA, ROY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POLLINGER v. CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELEN R POLLINGER
Represented By: NEIDRA SHENIKA WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM POLLINGER
Represented By: NEIDRA SHENIKA WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REVLON, INC.
Represented By: ROY VIOLA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REVLON CONSUMER PRODUCTS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROCTER & GAMBLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?