VIRTUA HEALTH INC. v. JNESO DISTRICT COUNCIL 1, IUOE, AFL-CIO
Petitioner: VIRTUA HEALTH INC.
Respondent: JNESO DISTRICT COUNCIL 1, IUOE
Case Number: 3:2019cv01090
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Reset Hearing: Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2019 @11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Please confirm receipt of new date and time not later than 3/26/2019. (DS)
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian R. Martinotti: Case Management Conference held on 3/14/2019. Conference continued to 4/4/2019 @9:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. (Court Reporter: Not on the record.) (DS)
March 11, 2019 Reset Hearing: Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2019 @11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Also, clients and representatives with full settlement authority must be present. (DS)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 Letter. (KEYSER, DENISE)
March 8, 2019 Notice of Hearing: Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2019 @11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Also, clients and representatives with full settlement authority must be present. Please confirm receipt of court notice by e-filing letter not later than 3/11/2019 by 4pm. (DS)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by VIRTUA HEALTH INC. re #3 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration award (KEYSER, DENISE)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF in Opposition filed by JNESO DISTRICT COUNCIL 1, IUOE re #3 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration award (HEINEMAN, RAYMOND)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by RAYMOND G. HEINEMAN, JR on behalf of JNESO DISTRICT COUNCIL 1, IUOE (HEINEMAN, RAYMOND)
January 31, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VIRTUA HEALTH INC.. JNESO DISTRICT COUNCIL 1, IUOE waiver sent on 1/25/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (KEYSER, DENISE)
January 28, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration award . Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DS)
January 28, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration award . Motion set for 2/19/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
January 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration award by VIRTUA HEALTH INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief in support of petition to vacate, #3 Certification of Denise M. Keyser, Esq., #4 Certificate of Service)(KEYSER, DENISE)
January 25, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Text of Proposed Order, Brief in support of Petition to Vacate, and Certification of Service filed by Denise Keyser on 01/25/2019 were submitted as attachments to the Petition. PLEASE RESUBMIT the above documents, as well as a Notice of Motion USING the event Confirm or Vacate Arbitration found under Motion and Related Filings, Motions. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jmh)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VIRTUA HEALTH INC.. (KEYSER, DENISE)
January 25, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Denise Keyser on 01/25/2019 was submitted as an attachment to the Petition. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Corporate Disclosure Statement USING the event CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT found under other filings, other documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jmh)
January 25, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jmh)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Vacate Arbitration Award ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9334577.), filed by VIRTUA HEALTH INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Denise M. Keyser, Esq., #2 Supplement Notice of Petition to Vacate, #3 Brief in support of Petition to Vacate, #4 Summons, #5 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(KEYSER, DENISE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VIRTUA HEALTH INC. v. JNESO DISTRICT COUNCIL 1, IUOE, AFL-CIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JNESO DISTRICT COUNCIL 1, IUOE
Represented By: RAYMOND G. HEINEMAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: VIRTUA HEALTH INC.
Represented By: DENISE MADDALONI KEYSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?