VENIS et al v. FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: DOROTHY VENIS and DENNIS VENIS
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER, INC., UNION CARBIDE CORP., CSR AMERICAS, INC., HOLLINGSWORTH & VOSE COMPANY, OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORP., JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 51 THROUGH 100, WARREN PUMPS LLC, GOULDS PUMPS LLC., ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC., HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY, ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, AURORA PUMP COMPANY, YORK INTERNATIONAL CORP., CARRIER CORP., ALFA LAVAL INC., CEMEX MATERIALS, LLC, NORCA CORPORATION, CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, BECON AG, INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY, BELL ASBESTOS MINES, LTD., INGERSOLL-RAND CO., MITSUI & CO. INC., METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION, JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1 THROUGH 50, ANOVA HOLDING AG, IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., CBS CORPORATION and CSR, LTD.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01197
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2019 03:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 3/22/2019. (mps)
March 20, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT IAN ELLIS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (ELLIS, ROBERT)
March 19, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE by GARDNER DENVER, INC. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (PATEL, POOJA)
March 19, 2019 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BELL ASBESTOS MINES, LTD. identifying MAZARIN, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (JEREMIAH, MADHURIKA)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with prejudice as to Defendant HOLLINGSWORTH & VOSE COMPANY only. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 3/19/2019. (mps)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE. Order Administratively terminating action filed in error #30 Defendants Hollingsworth & Vos Company ONLY are terminated. So Ordered by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 3/19/2019. (jmm, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 34 STIPULATION of Dismissal by HOLLINGSWORTH & VOSE COMPANY. (GIACUMBO, NANCY)
March 12, 2019 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD. identifying MAZARIN, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (JEREMIAH, MADHURIKA)
March 12, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by MADHURIKA JEREMIAH on behalf of BELL ASBESTOS MINES, LTD. (JEREMIAH, MADHURIKA)
March 12, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by MADHURIKA JEREMIAH on behalf of ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD. (JEREMIAH, MADHURIKA)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 5/6/2019. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 3/6/2019. (jmm, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by NANCY GIACUMBO on behalf of HOLLINGSWORTH & VOSE COMPANY (GIACUMBO, NANCY)
March 5, 2019 Filing 28 Letter. (GIACUMBO, NANCY)
February 28, 2019 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GARDNER DENVER, INC.. (PATEL, POOJA)
February 28, 2019 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC. identifying Weir Valves and Controls USA, Inc. as Corporate Parents. (PATEL, POOJA) Modified on 2/28/2019 (jem).
February 22, 2019 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. identifying Colfax Corporation, Colfax Fluid Handling LLC and Imo Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (FONTAK, JOSEPH)
February 22, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH IRA FONTAK on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (FONTAK, JOSEPH)
February 21, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INGERSOLL-RAND CO. identifying INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY as Corporate Parent.. (PASCARELLA, LISA)
February 21, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #22 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Lisa Pascarella on 2/20/2019 was submitted incorrectly under the event Notice (Other). PLEASE RESUBMIT USING the event Corporate Disclosure Statement found under Other Filings, Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mps)
February 20, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by INGERSOLL-RAND CO. Rule 7.1 (PASCARELLA, LISA)
February 20, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by INGERSOLL-RAND CO. Rule 26 Disclosure (PASCARELLA, LISA)
February 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by LISA PASCARELLA on behalf of INGERSOLL-RAND CO. (PASCARELLA, LISA)
February 20, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS CORPORATION identifying CBS Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (BLOW, DAVID)
February 20, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against ALFA LAVAL INC., ANOVA HOLDING AG, ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD., ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC., AURORA PUMP COMPANY, BECON AG, BELL ASBESTOS MINES, LTD., CARRIER CORP., CEMEX MATERIALS, LLC, CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, CSR AMERICAS, INC., CSR, LTD., ELLIOTT COMPANY, GARDNER DENVER, INC., GOULDS PUMPS LLC., HOLLINGSWORTH & VOSE COMPANY, HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, INC., IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., INGERSOLL-RAND CO., INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY, JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1 THROUGH 50, JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 51 THROUGH 100, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, MITSUI & CO. INC., NORCA CORPORATION, OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORP., UNION CARBIDE CORP., WARREN PUMPS LLC, YORK INTERNATIONAL CORP. by CBS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(BLOW, DAVID)
February 15, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS ALBANO, III on behalf of UNION CARBIDE CORP. (ALBANO, NICHOLAS)
February 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS ALBANO, III on behalf of CERTAINTEED CORPORATION (ALBANO, NICHOLAS)
February 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by POOJA R. PATEL on behalf of ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC. (PATEL, POOJA)
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by POOJA R. PATEL on behalf of GARDNER DENVER, INC. (PATEL, POOJA)
February 15, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNION CARBIDE CORP. identifying Dow as Corporate Parent.. (PICINI, RICHARD)
February 15, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CERTAINTEED CORPORATION. (PICINI, RICHARD)
February 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI on behalf of CERTAINTEED CORPORATION (PICINI, RICHARD)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI on behalf of UNION CARBIDE CORP. (PICINI, RICHARD)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS CORPORATION identifying CBS Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (FADAHUNSI, AFIGO)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by CBS CORPORATION re #1 Notice of Removal,, CBS Corporation's Notice of Joinder in FW and GE Removal (FADAHUNSI, AFIGO)
January 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID SCHUYLER BLOW on behalf of FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (BLOW, DAVID)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CARRIER CORP.. (TURNER, LINTON)
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by LINTON W. TURNER, JR on behalf of CARRIER CORP. (TURNER, LINTON)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (jmh)
January 29, 2019 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jmh)
January 29, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY identifying General Electric Company as Corporate Parent.. (FADAHUNSI, AFIGO)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION identifying Foster Wheeler LLC as Corporate Parent.. (FADAHUNSI, AFIGO)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION from Superior Court of New Jersey, Middlesex County, case number MID-L-6818-17AS. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9340168), filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Ex A_Summons and Complaint, #2 Ex B_Schroppe affidavit Dec 18, 2009, #3 Ex C_Hobson October 6 2004, #4 Ex D_Betts Affidavit Feb 9, 2005, #5 Ex E_Betts Affidavit Sept 27 2006, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 List of Known Defendants, #8 Notice of Notice of Removal to Middlesex County, #9 Notice of Notice of Removal to Adverse Party, #10 Cert of Service)(FADAHUNSI, AFIGO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VENIS et al v. FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER, INC.
Represented By: POOJA R. PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORP.
Represented By: RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI
Represented By: NICHOLAS ALBANO, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSR AMERICAS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLLINGSWORTH & VOSE COMPANY
Represented By: NANCY GIACUMBO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 51 THROUGH 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC.
Represented By: POOJA R. PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELLIOTT COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD.
Represented By: MADHURIKA JEREMIAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: AFIGO IFEOMA FADAHUNSI
Represented By: DAVID SCHUYLER BLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA PUMP COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YORK INTERNATIONAL CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIER CORP.
Represented By: LINTON W. TURNER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALFA LAVAL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEMEX MATERIALS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORCA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAINTEED CORPORATION
Represented By: RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI
Represented By: NICHOLAS ALBANO, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BECON AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELL ASBESTOS MINES, LTD.
Represented By: MADHURIKA JEREMIAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND CO.
Represented By: LISA PASCARELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MITSUI & CO. INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION
Represented By: AFIGO IFEOMA FADAHUNSI
Represented By: DAVID SCHUYLER BLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1 THROUGH 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANOVA HOLDING AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH IRA FONTAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: DAVID SCHUYLER BLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSR, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOROTHY VENIS
Represented By: ROBERT IAN ELLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS VENIS
Represented By: ROBERT IAN ELLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?