HEALTH FOR LIFE, INC. et al v. THE KIND GROUP, LLC
Plaintiff: Greenmart of Nevada NLV, LLC, Rosebud Organics, Inc. and Health For Life, Inc.
Defendant: The Kind Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv04442
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (km)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Monmouth County Courthouse71 Monument ParkFreehold, NJ 07728-1266 State No: MON-L-5-19. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (km)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT ORDER Granting Defendant's Application to Vacate the Removal from State Court. This matter is hereby remanded back to Monmouth County Superior Court. It is Further Ordered that all scheduling Orders entered in this matter are vacated. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 2/11/2019. (km)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 VACATED - TEXT ORDER Please be advised that due to a court conflict, the initial rule 16 conference currently scheduled to take place on April 1, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. shall now take place on the same day, but at 2:30 p.m. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm) Modified on 2/11/2019 (km).
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 VACATED - ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/1/2019 02:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 2/5/2019. (km) Modified on 2/11/2019 (km).
February 5, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #2 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by THE KIND GROUP, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/22/2019. (mmh)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Extension of Time to Answer Complaint.. (D'ARTIGLIO, ANTHONY)
February 4, 2019 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jmh)
February 4, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS. This complaint has previously been opened as 3:19-cv-4438. In the event an error is made during the case opening process please call (609)989-2065 for assistance. DO NOT create a new case. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 VACATED - NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Kind Group, LLC from Monmouth County Superior Court of New Jersey, case number MON-L-000005-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9370748), filed by The Kind Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Service)(D'ARTIGLIO, ANTHONY) Modified on 2/11/2019 (km).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HEALTH FOR LIFE, INC. et al v. THE KIND GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kind Group, LLC
Represented By: JOSHUA S. BAUCHNER
Represented By: ANTHONY JOSEPH D'ARTIGLIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greenmart of Nevada NLV, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL J. SULLIVAN
Represented By: GEORGE R HIRSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosebud Organics, Inc.
Represented By: MICHAEL J. SULLIVAN
Represented By: GEORGE R HIRSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health For Life, Inc.
Represented By: MICHAEL J. SULLIVAN
Represented By: GEORGE R HIRSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?