DEFENSE DISTRIBUTED et al v. GREWAL
Plaintiff: SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC., FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC., CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION OF FEDERAL FIREARMS LICENSEES, INC., FIREARMS POLICY FOUNDATION, THE CALGUNS FOUNDATION, DEFENSE DISTRIBUTED and BRANDON COMBS
Defendant: GURBIR S GREWAL
Case Number: 3:2019cv04753
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Anne E Thompson
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #31 MOTION to Stay FOR INJUNCTION PENDING APPEAL. Motion set for 5/6/2019 before Judge Anne E. Thompson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
April 4, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Stay FOR INJUNCTION PENDING APPEAL by CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION OF FEDERAL FIREARMS LICENSEES, INC., BRANDON COMBS, DEFENSE DISTRIBUTED, FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC., FIREARMS POLICY FOUNDATION, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC., THE CALGUNS FOUNDATION. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
April 4, 2019 Filing 30 USCA Case Number 19-1729 for #28 Notice of Appeal (USCA),, filed by BRANDON COMBS, FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC., SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC., CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION OF FEDERAL FIREARMS LICENSEES, INC., DEFENSE DISTRIBUTED, FIREARMS POLICY FOUNDATION, THE CALGUNS FOUNDATION. USCA Case Manager Pamela (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3pdb, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 29 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION OF FEDERAL FIREARMS LICENSEES, INC., BRANDON COMBS, DEFENSE DISTRIBUTED, FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC., FIREARMS POLICY FOUNDATION, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC., THE CALGUNS FOUNDATION for proceedings held on March 7, 2019 before Judge Anne E. Thompson, (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
April 1, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #26 Order Staying Case by CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION OF FEDERAL FIREARMS LICENSEES, INC., BRANDON COMBS, DEFENSE DISTRIBUTED, FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC., FIREARMS POLICY FOUNDATION, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC., THE CALGUNS FOUNDATION. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0312-9545088. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
March 13, 2019 Filing 27 Transcript of STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/7/2019, before Judge Anne E. Thompson. Transcriber -J&J Court Transcribers, Inc. (609-586-2311). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 4/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2019. (kas)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Staying Case until the action in the Western District of Texas is resolved. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 3/7/2019. (km)
March 7, 2019 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anne E. Thompson: Status Conference held on 3/7/2019. Case stayed. Order to follow. (ESR: K.STILLMAN.) (adi, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 LETTER ORDER that Defendant's response is due 3/8/2019, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 3/5/2019. (km)
March 5, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE re #22 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service by ECF)(SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
March 5, 2019 Filing 22 Letter from Defendant Grewal. (MORAMARCO, GLENN)
March 5, 2019 Pursuant to #19 Order, Exhibits 56 and 57 associated with #18 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction received over the counter in paper format and forwarded to Chambers. (mmh)
March 5, 2019 Status Conference set for 3/7/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Anne E. Thompson in Courtroom 4W. Charles Flores, Esq. will appear via telephone - please note call in number is 609-989-2123. (adi, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE re #20 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service by ECF)(SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
March 3, 2019 Filing 20 Letter from Defendant Attorney General Grewal. (MORAMARCO, GLENN)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Permission to File and Serve Paper Materials excluded from the ECF system. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 2/26/2019. (km)
February 20, 2019 Filing 18 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION OF FEDERAL FIREARMS LICENSEES, INC., BRANDON COMBS, DEFENSE DISTRIBUTED, FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC., FIREARMS POLICY FOUNDATION, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC., THE CALGUNS FOUNDATION. (Attachments: #1 Brief (Amended Brief), #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration Amended Declaration of Brandon Combs, #4 Declaration Amended Declaration of Daniel Hammond, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit 18, #23 Exhibit 19, #24 Exhibit 20, #25 Exhibit 21, #26 Exhibit 22, #27 Exhibit 23, #28 Exhibit 24, #29 Exhibit 25, #30 Exhibit 26, #31 Exhibit 27 (part 1 of 2), #32 Exhibit 27 (part 2 of 2), #33 Exhibit 28, #34 Exhibit 29, #35 Exhibit 30, #36 Exhibit 31, #37 Exhibit 32, #38 Exhibit 33, #39 Exhibit 34, #40 Exhibit 35, #41 Exhibit 36, #42 Exhibit 37, #43 Exhibit 38, #44 Exhibit 39, #45 Exhibit 40, #46 Exhibit 41, #47 Exhibit 42, #48 Exhibit 43, #49 Exhibit 44, #50 Exhibit 45, #51 Exhibit 46, #52 Exhibit 47 (part 1 of 2), #53 Exhibit 47 (part 2 of 2), #54 Exhibit 48, #55 Exhibit 49, #56 Exhibit 50, #57 Exhibit 51, #58 Exhibit 52, #59 Exhibit 53, #60 Exhibit 54, #61 Exhibit 55, #62 Certificate of Service)(SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
February 20, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against GURBIR S GREWAL, filed by CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION OF FEDERAL FIREARMS LICENSEES, INC., FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC., BRANDON COMBS, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC., DEFENSE DISTRIBUTED, FIREARMS POLICY FOUNDATION, THE CALGUNS FOUNDATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
February 19, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Hannah Roblyer to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
February 19, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Daniel Hammond to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
February 19, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Charles Flores to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
February 19, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, CHARLES FLORES, DANIEL HAMMOND and HANNAH ROBLYER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (km)
February 15, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee of $450 received as to Charles Flores, Esq., Daniel Hammond, Esq., and Hannah Roblyer, Esq. receipt number TRE099846 (mps)
February 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC JACOB BODEN on behalf of All Defendants (BODEN, ERIC)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining shall be amended by 2/20/2019. That the Defendant shall submit any opposition to by 3/6/2019; Plaintiffs' Reply due 3/11/2019. The Court shall schedule a hearing on the Motion 3/20/2019 at 10:00AM. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 2/14/2019. (km)
February 13, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anne E. Thompson: Telephone Conference held on 2/13/2019. Preliminary Injunction hearing set for March 20, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Order to follow.(Court Recorder Kim Stillman.) (kas, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA LEE MEDOWAY on behalf of GURBIR S GREWAL (MEDOWAY, MELISSA)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Defendant Gurbir Grewal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kevin Madore)(MORAMARCO, GLENN)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE ANNE GREGORY on behalf of GURBIR S GREWAL (GREGORY, KATHERINE)
February 11, 2019 Telephone Conference re: scheduling set for 2/13/2019 08:30 AM before Judge Anne E. Thompson. The Court will provide call in information to the parties. (adi, )
February 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by GLENN J. MORAMARCO on behalf of All Defendants (MORAMARCO, GLENN)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION OF FEDERAL FIREARMS LICENSEES, INC., FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC., BRANDON COMBS, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC., DEFENSE DISTRIBUTED, FIREARMS POLICY FOUNDATION, THE CALGUNS FOUNDATION. GURBIR S GREWAL served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anne E. Thompson: Telephone Conference held on 2/7/2019. Parties to propose briefing schedule to the Court. (Court Recorder Kim Stillman.) (kas, )
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT ORDER granting leave to appear Pro Hac Vice as to Charles Flores, Daniel Hammond, and Hannah Roblyer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 2/6/2019. (km)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GURBIR S GREWAL. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
February 6, 2019 Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jmh)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION OF FEDERAL FIREARMS LICENSEES, INC., DEFENSE DISTRIBUTED, FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC., FIREARMS POLICY FOUNDATION, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC., THE CALGUNS FOUNDATION. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GURBIR S GREWAL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9385696), filed by CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION OF FEDERAL FIREARMS LICENSEES, INC., FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC., BRANDON COMBS, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC., DEFENSE DISTRIBUTED, FIREARMS POLICY FOUNDATION, THE CALGUNS FOUNDATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A to Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Complaint, #4 Exhibit C to Complaint, #5 Exhibit D to Complaint, #6 Exhibit E to Complaint, #7 Exhibit F to Complaint, #8 Brief in Support of Order to Show Cause for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, #9 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraining Order, #10 Text of Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction, #11 Declaration of Brandon Combs, #12 Declaration of Daniel Hammond, #13 Exhibit 1 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #14 Exhibit 2 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #15 Exhibit 3 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #16 Exhibit 4(1) in Support of Order to Show Cause, #17 Exhibit 4(2) in Support of Order to Show Cause, #18 Exhibit 5 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #19 Exhibit 6 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #20 Exhibit 7 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #21 Exhibit 8 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #22 Exhibit 9 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #23 Exhibit 10 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #24 Exhibit 11 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #25 Exhibit 12(1) in Support of Order to Show Cause, #26 Exhibit 12(2) in Support of Order to Show Cause, #27 Exhibit 13 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #28 Exhibit 14 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #29 Exhibit 15 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #30 Exhibit 16 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #31 Exhibit 17 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #32 Exhibit 18 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #33 Exhibit 19 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #34 Exhibit 20 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #35 Exhibit 21 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #36 Exhibit 22 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #37 Exhibit 23 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #38 Exhibit 24 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #39 Exhibit 25 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #40 Exhibit 26 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #41 Exhibit 27(1) in Support of Order to Show Cause, #42 Exhibit 27(2) in Support of Order to Show Cause, #43 Exhibit 28 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #44 Exhibit 29 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #45 Exhibit 30 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #46 Exhibit 31 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #47 Exhibit 32 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #48 Exhibit 33 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #49 Exhibit 34 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #50 Exhibit 35 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #51 Exhibit 36(1) in Support of Order to Show Cause, #52 Exhibit 36 (2) in Support of Order to Show Cause, #53 Exhibit 36(3) in Support of Order to Show Cause, #54 Exhibit 37 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #55 Exhibit 38 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #56 Exhibit 39 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #57 Exhibit 40 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #58 Exhibit 41 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #59 Exhibit 42 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #60 Exhibit 43 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #61 Exhibit 44 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #62 Exhibit 45 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #63 Exhibit 46 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #64 Exhibit 47(1) in Support of Order to Show Cause, #65 Exhibit 47(2) in Support of Order to Show Cause, #66 Exhibit 48 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #67 Exhibit 49 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #68 Exhibit 50 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #69 Exhibit 51 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #70 Exhibit 52 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #71 Exhibit 53 in Support of Order to Show Cause, #72 Certificate of Service)(SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEFENSE DISTRIBUTED et al v. GREWAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC.
Represented By: DANIEL L. SCHMUTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC.
Represented By: DANIEL L. SCHMUTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION OF FEDERAL FIREARMS LICENSEES, INC.
Represented By: DANIEL L. SCHMUTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIREARMS POLICY FOUNDATION
Represented By: DANIEL L. SCHMUTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE CALGUNS FOUNDATION
Represented By: DANIEL L. SCHMUTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEFENSE DISTRIBUTED
Represented By: DANIEL L. SCHMUTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON COMBS
Represented By: DANIEL L. SCHMUTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GURBIR S GREWAL
Represented By: KATHERINE ANNE GREGORY
Represented By: MELISSA LEE MEDOWAY
Represented By: GLENN J. MORAMARCO
Represented By: ERIC JACOB BODEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?