VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC et al v. APOTEX INC. et al
Plaintiff: KAKEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., DOW PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC and VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LTD.
Defendant: APOTEX CORP. and APOTEX INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv05939
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Peter G Sheridan
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/21/2019 via Conference Call. (if, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC, KAKEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., DOW PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LTD.. APOTEX CORP. waiver sent on 2/28/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (DENI, WILLIAM)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC, KAKEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., DOW PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LTD.. APOTEX INC. waiver sent on 2/28/2019, answer due 5/29/2019. (DENI, WILLIAM)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/21/2019 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 3/5/2019. (mps)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by J. BRUGH LOWER on behalf of DOW PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, INC., KAKEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LTD., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC (LOWER, J.)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to APOTEX CORP., APOTEX INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 AO120 Patent Form filed. (jmh)
February 19, 2019 Judge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jmh)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KAKEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.. (DENI, WILLIAM)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DOW PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LTD., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC identifying Bausch Health Companies Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (DENI, WILLIAM)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against APOTEX CORP., APOTEX INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9423384), filed by VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC, KAKEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., DOW PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 L. Civ. R. 11.2 Certification)(DENI, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC et al v. APOTEX INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAKEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOW PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LTD.
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?