MITSUBISHI TANABE PHARMA CORPORATION et al v. LUPIN LIMITED et al
Plaintiff: JANSSEN RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV, MITSUBISHI TANABE PHARMA CORPORATION, CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL and JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Defendant: LUPIN LIMITED and LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv07165
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Peter G Sheridan
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Counterclaim by CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, MITSUBISHI TANABE PHARMA CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LIZZA, CHARLES)
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (LURIA, AMY)
April 3, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Amy Luria on 4/3/2019 was submitted incorrectly as an attachment to the Answer. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Corporate Disclosure Statement USING Corporate Disclosure Statement found under Civil - Other Filings - Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mmh)
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, MITSUBISHI TANABE PHARMA CORPORATION by LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Statement Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(LURIA, AMY)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID LEIGH MOSES on behalf of CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, MITSUBISHI TANABE PHARMA CORPORATION (MOSES, DAVID)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, MITSUBISHI TANABE PHARMA CORPORATION (SULLIVAN, SARAH)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, MITSUBISHI TANABE PHARMA CORPORATION (BATON, WILLIAM)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 AO120 Patent Form filed. (jmh)
February 28, 2019 Judge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jmh)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, MITSUBISHI TANABE PHARMA CORPORATION. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9455863), filed by MITSUBISHI TANABE PHARMA CORPORATION, JANSSEN RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIZZA, CHARLES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MITSUBISHI TANABE PHARMA CORPORATION et al v. LUPIN LIMITED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANSSEN RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC
Represented By: CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Represented By: DAVID LEIGH MOSES
Represented By: WILLIAM C. BATON
Represented By: SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV
Represented By: CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Represented By: DAVID LEIGH MOSES
Represented By: WILLIAM C. BATON
Represented By: SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MITSUBISHI TANABE PHARMA CORPORATION
Represented By: CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Represented By: DAVID LEIGH MOSES
Represented By: WILLIAM C. BATON
Represented By: SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Represented By: DAVID LEIGH MOSES
Represented By: WILLIAM C. BATON
Represented By: SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Represented By: DAVID LEIGH MOSES
Represented By: WILLIAM C. BATON
Represented By: SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN LIMITED
Represented By: AMY DANIELLE LURIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: AMY DANIELLE LURIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?