SQUAREWELL v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE et al
Plaintiff: RUFUS SQUAREWELL
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, HERMAN BARON, ABC CORPORATION(S) 1-10 (FICTITIOUS DEFENDANTS), AMAZON SERVICES, LLC, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JOHN DOE EMPLOYERS/SUPERVISORS 1-10 (FICTITIOUS DEFENDANTS), AMAZON.COM,INC, AMAZON and AMAZON.COM, INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv12196
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1364
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 8/13/2019 at 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov(ce3)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against ABC CORPORATION(S) 1-10 (FICTITIOUS DEFENDANTS), HERMAN BARON, JOHN DOE EMPLOYERS/SUPERVISORS 1-10 (FICTITIOUS DEFENDANTS), RUFUS SQUAREWELL, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE by AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.(ROSSMAN, TODD)
June 5, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/19/2019. (mmh)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Amazon Defendants. Attorney TODD AVERY ROSSMAN for AMAZON,TODD AVERY ROSSMAN for AMAZON SERVICES, LLC,TODD AVERY ROSSMAN for AMAZON.COM, INC. added. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ROSSMAN, TODD)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMAZON, AMAZON SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC., HERMAN BARON, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kas, )
May 7, 2019 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (kas, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABC CORPORATION(S) 1-10 (FICTITIOUS DEFENDANTS), AMAZON, AMAZON SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM,INC, HERMAN BARON, JOHN DOE EMPLOYERS/SUPERVISORS 1-10 (FICTITIOUS DEFENDANTS), THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9644251) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RUFUS SQUAREWELL.(CORRIGAN, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SQUAREWELL v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERMAN BARON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION(S) 1-10 (FICTITIOUS DEFENDANTS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: TODD AVERY ROSSMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE EMPLOYERS/SUPERVISORS 1-10 (FICTITIOUS DEFENDANTS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM,INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON
Represented By: TODD AVERY ROSSMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM, INC.
Represented By: TODD AVERY ROSSMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUFUS SQUAREWELL
Represented By: DAVID P. CORRIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?