SMITH v. BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: BILLIE N. SMITH
Defendant: CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AMERICAN TALC COMPANY, METROPOLITAN TALC COMPANY, INC., CHARLES MATHIEU, INC., RESOURCE PROCESSORS, INC. AND WINDSOR MINERALS, JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1-50, BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES INC., JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 51-100, WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AMERICAN TALC COMPANY, METROPOLITAN TALC COMPANY, INC., CHARLES MATHIEU, INC., AND RESOURCE PROCESSORS, INC., CYPRUS MINES CORPORATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AMERICAN TALC COMPANY, METROPOLITAN TALC COMPANY, INC., CHARLES MATHIEU, INC., RESOURCE PROCESSORS, INC. AND WINDSOR MINERALS, IN, BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, INC., AS SUCCESOR-IN-INTEREST TO MINERAL PIGMENT SOLUTIONS, INC., AS SUCCESOR-IN-INTEREST TO WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS, INC., CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY, WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS, INC., CYPRUS MINES CORPORATION and BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv12231
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Middlesex County Courthouse*56 Paterson StreetNew Brunswick, NJ 08903 State No: MID-L03548-19. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (mmh)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Consent Order that Plaintiff's Complaint be remanded to the Superior Court of New Jersey, Middlesex County. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 6/6/2019. (mmh)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Robert E. Lytle with Proposed Remand Consent Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LYTLE, ROBERT)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from John C. Garde Withdrawing Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (GARDE, JOHN)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by POOJA R. PATEL on behalf of WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS, INC. (PATEL, POOJA)
May 16, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of New Jersey. Motion set for 6/17/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of New Jersey by BILLIE N. SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief Supporting Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit Doc. 1, #4 Exhibit Doc. 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B, #7 Certificate of Service)(LYTLE, ROBERT)
May 14, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jmh)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES INC. from Superior Court of NJ, Law Div., Cty. Middlesex, case number MID-L-03548-19AS. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9646686), filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice to Clerk of Superior Court of Filing of Notice For Removal, #4 Statement of FIling and Service of Removal, #5 Certificate of Service)(GARDE, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AMERICAN TALC COMPANY, METROPOLITAN TALC COMPANY, INC., CHARLES MATHIEU, INC., RESOURCE PROCESSORS, INC. AND WINDSOR MINERALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: JOHN C. GARDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES INC.
Represented By: JOHN C. GARDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 51-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AMERICAN TALC COMPANY, METROPOLITAN TALC COMPANY, INC., CHARLES MATHIEU, INC., AND RESOURCE PROCESSORS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYPRUS MINES CORPORATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AMERICAN TALC COMPANY, METROPOLITAN TALC COMPANY, INC., CHARLES MATHIEU, INC., RESOURCE PROCESSORS, INC. AND WINDSOR MINERALS, IN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, INC., AS SUCCESOR-IN-INTEREST TO MINERAL PIGMENT SOLUTIONS, INC., AS SUCCESOR-IN-INTEREST TO WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS, INC.
Represented By: POOJA R. PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYPRUS MINES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLIE N. SMITH
Represented By: ROBERT E. LYTLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?