UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ONE 2015 JEEP WRANGLER, VIN 1C4HJWEG5FL589336 et al

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: ONE 2015 JEEP WRANGLER, VIN 1C4HJWEG5FL589336, ONE 2017 POLARIS SLINGSHOT SL, VIN 57XAAPFA3H8124858, $20,316.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY, ONE 2014 JEEP GRAND CHEROKEE OVERLAND, VIN 1C4RJFCT4EC211415 and ONE 2015 HARLEY DAVIDSON FLHXSE CVO STREET GLIDE, VIN 1HD1PXN1XFB958701
Case Number: 3:2019cv12715
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 8/27/2019 at 10:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The Joint Discovery Plan is due no later than three weeks prior to the conference (see L.Civ.R. 26.1(b); the joint discovery plan should NOT be electronically filed, but may be submitted to Chambers via regular mail, facsimile [(609) 989-0451], or e-mail [dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov];(ce3)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Verified Claim ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(BERTUCIO, EDWARD)
June 30, 2019 Filing 4 Verified Claim ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(SCHAFER, DAVID)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA of Complaint for Forfeiture (ANGER, JORDAN)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to $20,316.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY, ONE 2014 JEEP GRAND CHEROKEE OVERLAND, VIN 1C4RJFCT4EC211415, ONE 2015 HARLEY DAVIDSON FLHXSE CVO STREET GLIDE, VIN 1HD1PXN1XFB958701, ONE 2015 JEEP WRANGLER, VIN 1C4HJWEG5FL589336, ONE 2017 POLARIS SLINGSHOT SL, VIN 57XAAPFA3H8124858. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
May 20, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jmh)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $20,316.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY, ONE 2014 JEEP GRAND CHEROKEE OVERLAND, VIN 1C4RJFCT4EC211415, ONE 2015 HARLEY DAVIDSON FLHXSE CVO STREET GLIDE, VIN 1HD1PXN1XFB958701, ONE 2015 JEEP WRANGLER, VIN 1C4HJWEG5FL589336, ONE 2017 POLARIS SLINGSHOT SL, VIN 57XAAPFA3H8124858, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Arrest Warrant In Rem, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ANGER, JORDAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ONE 2015 JEEP WRANGLER, VIN 1C4HJWEG5FL589336 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE 2015 JEEP WRANGLER, VIN 1C4HJWEG5FL589336
Represented By: DAVID E. SCHAFER
Represented By: EDWARD C. BERTUCIO, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE 2017 POLARIS SLINGSHOT SL, VIN 57XAAPFA3H8124858
Represented By: DAVID E. SCHAFER
Represented By: EDWARD C. BERTUCIO, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $20,316.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Represented By: DAVID E. SCHAFER
Represented By: EDWARD C. BERTUCIO, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE 2014 JEEP GRAND CHEROKEE OVERLAND, VIN 1C4RJFCT4EC211415
Represented By: DAVID E. SCHAFER
Represented By: EDWARD C. BERTUCIO, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE 2015 HARLEY DAVIDSON FLHXSE CVO STREET GLIDE, VIN 1HD1PXN1XFB958701
Represented By: DAVID E. SCHAFER
Represented By: EDWARD C. BERTUCIO, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: JORDAN MILOWE ANGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?