CMA CGM S.A. v. PRIME SHIPPING INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Plaintiff: CMA CGM S.A.
Defendant: PRIME SHIPPING INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv13374
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:741
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CMA CGM S.A.. PRIME SHIPPING INTERNATIONAL, INC. served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (STEINBERG, RICK)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PRIME SHIPPING INTERNATIONAL, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
June 28, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Request for Summons to be Issued submitted by Rick Steinberg on 06/28/2019 was submitted improperly. When submitting a Request for Summons to be Issued, it should be in Letter Format. The Clerk's Office will issue the official court summons. This message is for informational purposes only. (jmh)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Summons to be Issued by CMA CGM S.A. as to PRIME SHIPPING INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (STEINBERG, RICK)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PRIME SHIPPING INTERNATIONAL, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
June 4, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jmh)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by CMA CGM S.A. as to PRIME SHIPPING INTERNATIONAL, INC. D/B/A PRIME AGENCY. (STEINBERG, RICK)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CMA CGM S.A.. (STEINBERG, RICK)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PRIME SHIPPING INTERNATIONAL, INC. D/B/A PRIME AGENCY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9715245), filed by CMA CGM S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Account, #2 Exhibit Statement of Account supplement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(STEINBERG, RICK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CMA CGM S.A. v. PRIME SHIPPING INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIME SHIPPING INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CMA CGM S.A.
Represented By: RICK A. STEINBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?