GDC TECHNOLOGY LIMITED v. KRIAN MEDIA LLC et al

Plaintiff: GDC TECHNOLOGY LIMITED
Defendant: KRIAN MEDIA LLC, CINE GRAND, INC. and RANJEET THANKUR
Case Number: 3:2019cv13408
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman to Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise advised by Judge Quraishi's chambers, all conferences set by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman shall be conducted by Judge Quraishi on the previously scheduled date and time. (jjc, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GDC TECHNOLOGY LIMITED. KRIAN MEDIA LLC served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (SEKEL, ANNE)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GDC TECHNOLOGY LIMITED. CINE GRAND, INC. served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (SEKEL, ANNE)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 Exhibit to #1 Complaint,, Civil Cover Sheet with Related Case Information by GDC TECHNOLOGY LIMITED. (SEKEL, ANNE)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GDC TECHNOLOGY LIMITED identifying Huayi Brothers Media Corporation as a Corporate Parent. (SEKEL, ANNE).
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CINE GRAND, INC., KRIAN MEDIA LLC, RANJEET THANKUR. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
June 5, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jmh)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GDC TECHNOLOGY LIMITED ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9718245), filed by GDC TECHNOLOGY LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N)(SEKEL, ANNE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GDC TECHNOLOGY LIMITED v. KRIAN MEDIA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRIAN MEDIA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CINE GRAND, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANJEET THANKUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GDC TECHNOLOGY LIMITED
Represented By: ANNE B. SEKEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?