VIFOR (INTERNATIONAL) AG et al v. MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD.
Plaintiff: AMERICAN REGENT, INC. and VIFOR (INTERNATIONAL) AG
Defendant: MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD.
Case Number: 3:2019cv13955
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, SARAH SIEDLAK, TUNG-ON KONG, WENDY L. DEVINE and DENNIS D. GREGORY, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jmh)
August 8, 2019 Filing 28 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Sarah A. Siedlak, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
August 8, 2019 Filing 27 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Dennis D. Gregory, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
August 8, 2019 Filing 26 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Wendy L. Devine, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
August 8, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Tung-On Kong, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
August 7, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #24 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMERICAN REGENT, INC., VIFOR (INTERNATIONAL) AG has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 08/30/2019. (jmh)
August 7, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Tung-On Kong, Esq., Wendy L. Devine, Esq., Dennis D. Greegory, Esq., Sarah A. Siedlak, Esq: $600, receipt number TRE104734. (jmh)
August 6, 2019 Filing 24 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant's Counterclaims.. (DENI, WILLIAM)
August 6, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, BARBARA R. RUDOLPH, ROBERT F. SCHAFFER, M. DAVID WEINGARTEN and CONSTANCE P. LEE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jmh)
August 6, 2019 Filing 23 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Constance P. Lee, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9872525.) (DENI, WILLIAM)
August 6, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice M. David Weingarten, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9872506.) (DENI, WILLIAM)
August 6, 2019 Filing 21 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Robert F. Schaffer, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9872489.) (DENI, WILLIAM)
August 6, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Barbara R. Rudolph, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9872467.) (DENI, WILLIAM)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 LETTER ORDER granting request for the Withdrawal of Emily R. Gabranski, Esq. as pro hac vice counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 08/05/2019. (jmh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 18 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. re: request for approval of withdrawal of Emily R. Gabranski, Esq. as pro hac vice counsel. (DENI, WILLIAM)
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD.. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
July 26, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint , Separate Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against AMERICAN REGENT, INC., VIFOR (INTERNATIONAL) AG by MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Tung-On Kong, Esq, Wendy L. Devine, Esq, Dennis D. Gregory Esq., and Sarah A. Siedlak, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 07/23/2019. (jmh)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Pro Hac Vice admission of Barbara R. Rudolph, Robert F. Schaffer, M. David Weingarten, Emily R. Gabranski, and Constance P. Lee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 07/23/2019. (jmh)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Tung-On Kong, Esq., Wendy L. Devine, Esq., Dennis D. Gregory, Esq. and Sarah A. Siedlak, Esq. for by MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tung-On Kong, Esq. In Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Declaration of Wendy L. Devine, Esq. In Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Declaration of Dennis D. Gregory, Esq. In Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #4 Declaration of Sarah A. Siedlak, Esq. In Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. re: application for pro hac vice admission of Barbara R. Rudolph, Robert F. Shaffer, M. David Weingarten, Emily R. Gabranski, and Constance P. Lee. (Attachments: #1 Certification of William P. Deni, Jr., #2 Certification of Barbara R. Rudolph, #3 Certification of Robert F. Shaffer, #4 Certification of M. David Weingarten, #5 Certification of Emily R. Gabranski, #6 Certification of Constance P. Lee, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(DENI, WILLIAM)
July 10, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #11 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 07/26/2019. (jmh)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiffs' Complaint.. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY S. SOOS on behalf of MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD. (SOOS, JEFFREY)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by GERI L. ALBIN on behalf of MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD. (ALBIN, GERI)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ARNOLD B. CALMANN on behalf of MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VIFOR (INTERNATIONAL) AG, AMERICAN REGENT, INC.. MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD. served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (DENI, WILLIAM)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 AO120 Patent Form filed. (jdb)
June 19, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jdb)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by J. BRUGH LOWER on behalf of AMERICAN REGENT, INC., VIFOR (INTERNATIONAL) AG (LOWER, J.)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN REGENT, INC.. (DENI, WILLIAM)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VIFOR (INTERNATIONAL) AG. (DENI, WILLIAM)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9752471), filed by VIFOR (INTERNATIONAL) AG, AMERICAN REGENT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 L. Civ. R. 11.2)(DENI, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VIFOR (INTERNATIONAL) AG et al v. MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN REGENT, INC.
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIFOR (INTERNATIONAL) AG
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD.
Represented By: JEFFREY S. SOOS
Represented By: GERI L. ALBIN
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?