AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY v. GREWAL et al
Plaintiff: AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY
Defendant: STEPHEN M. HOLDEN, ERIC H. JASO, MARGUERITE T. SIMON and GURBIR GREWAL
Case Number: 3:2019cv14228
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 29 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of AAG Stuart M. Feinblatt, #2 Certificate of Service)(FEINBLATT, STUART)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 LETTER ORDER granting the Defendants' request to file their brief in opposition to Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction #3 as 45 pages. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 8/19/2019. (jem)
August 19, 2019 Filing 27 Letter from AAG Stuart M. Feinblatt. (FEINBLATT, STUART)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JOINT ORDER that Defendants Response to the Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 5pm on 8/20/2019; Plaintiff's Reply in support of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 12pm on 8/30/2019. The Court will hold a hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction on 9/17/2019, at 10am in Trenton; Defendants shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than thirty (30) days following the entry of the Court's order deciding the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 8/07/2019. (jem)
August 6, 2019 Filing 25 Letter from John A. Boyle to the Honorable Brian R. Martinotti, U.S.D.J. re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 24 Order,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BOYLE, JOHN)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER: The parties have advised the Court that a briefing schedule has been agreed to by the parties and a joint proposed briefing schedule will be submitted within 5 days. The August 5, 2019 at 10:00AM teleconference is canceled. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 08/05/2019. (ek)
August 1, 2019 Filing 23 Letter from John A. Boyle re Set/Reset Hearings,. (BOYLE, JOHN)
August 1, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. BOYLE on behalf of AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY (BOYLE, JOHN)
August 1, 2019 Filing 21 Letter from AAG Stuart M. Feinblatt. (FEINBLATT, STUART)
August 1, 2019 Notice of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 8/5/2019 @10:00 AM before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Parties will dial (1-888-684-8852) and the access code (1852046#) to join in on the conference call. Please confirm receipt of court notice by e-filing letter not later than 8/1/2019 by 3:00 p.m. (DS)
July 31, 2019 Filing 20 Letter from AAG Stuart M. Feinblatt. (FEINBLATT, STUART)
July 26, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, DEREK L. SHAFFER, KEITH H. FORST and WILLIAM A. BURCK, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem)
July 26, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice William A. Burck to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9845632.) (BOYLE, JOHN)
July 26, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Keith H. Forst to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9845626.) (BOYLE, JOHN)
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Derek L. Shaffer to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9845606.) (BOYLE, JOHN)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: The parties are to meet and confer to discuss the entry of a consent order setting for a briefing schedule wherein all submissions are due by 10/09/19. Hearing on the application will be held on 10/18/19 at 10:00 am in Courtroom 1 of the Old Post Office, Newark, New Jersey pending determination by the Court. There will be no enforcement of the Statute pending a decision by the Court. The parties to report back no later than 07/31/19. SO ORDERED by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 07/26/2019. (lr,)
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian R. Martinotti: Status Conference held on 7/26/2019. (lr, )
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Derek L. Shaffer, Esq., William A. Burck, Esq. and Keith H. Forst, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/25/2019. (jem)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Lois H. Goodman, U.S.M.J. regarding application for admission pro hac vice re #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Derek L. Shaffer, Esq., William A. Burck, Esq. and Keith H. Forst, Esq. ). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARINO, KEVIN)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM BLAKE MASEF on behalf of All Defendants (MASEF, ADAM)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by STUART MARK FEINBLATT on behalf of All Defendants (FEINBLATT, STUART)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Brian R. Martinotti, U.S.D.J.. (MARINO, KEVIN)
July 8, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Derek L. Shaffer, Esq., William A. Burck, Esq. and Keith H. Forst, Esq. ). Motion set for 8/5/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Derek L. Shaffer, Esq., William A. Burck, Esq. and Keith H. Forst, Esq. ) by AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY. (Attachments: #1 Certification of John A. Boyle, #2 Certification of Derek L. Shaffer, #3 Certification of William A. Burck, #4 Certification of Keith H. Forst, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(MARINO, KEVIN)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY. GURBIR GREWAL served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (MARINO, KEVIN)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY. MARGUERITE T. SIMON served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (MARINO, KEVIN)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY. STEPHEN M. HOLDEN served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (MARINO, KEVIN)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY. ERIC H. JASO served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (MARINO, KEVIN)
June 26, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion set for 8/5/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GURBIR GREWAL, STEPHEN M. HOLDEN, ERIC H. JASO, MARGUERITE T. SIMON. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb)
June 26, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jdb)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Keith H. Forst, #3 Declaration of Nicholas Dunn, #4 Declaration of Emily Seidel, #5 Declaration of Erica Jedynak, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(MARINO, KEVIN)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY. (MARINO, KEVIN)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GURBIR GREWAL, STEPHEN M. HOLDEN, ERIC H. JASO, MARGUERITE T. SIMON ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9769630) with JURY DEMAND, filed by AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certification Local Rule 11.2 Certification, #3 Certification Local Rule 201.1(d) Certification)(MARINO, KEVIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY v. GREWAL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY
Represented By: KEVIN HARRY MARINO
Represented By: JOHN A. BOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN M. HOLDEN
Represented By: STUART MARK FEINBLATT
Represented By: ADAM BLAKE MASEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC H. JASO
Represented By: STUART MARK FEINBLATT
Represented By: ADAM BLAKE MASEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGUERITE T. SIMON
Represented By: STUART MARK FEINBLATT
Represented By: ADAM BLAKE MASEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GURBIR GREWAL
Represented By: STUART MARK FEINBLATT
Represented By: ADAM BLAKE MASEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?