IMOKAYE HOLDINGS LLC v. MARINE CONSULTING, INC., d/b/a RICK OBEY & ASSOCIATES et al
Plaintiff: IMOKAYE HOLDINGS LLC
Defendant: M/Y IMOKAYE, Hull No. XSK06539G516, her engines, tackle, equipment, furniture, auxiliary vessels, appurtenances, and necessaries, and MARINE CONSULTING, INC.
Interested Party: NATIONAL LIQUIDATORS
Intervenor Plaintiff: MURCIELAGO, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv14526
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL that this action is Dismissed with Prejudice and without costs and that the Defendant vessel- the M/Y IMOKAYE, Hull No. X5K06539G516, her engines, tackle, equipment, furniture, auxiliary vessels, appurtenances, and necessaries be released from arrest in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. Supp. E(5)(c). Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 07/25/2019. (jmh) Modified on 7/31/2019 (eaj, ).
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal and for Release of Vessel by IMOKAYE HOLDINGS LLC. (WOOSTER, DANIEL)
July 14, 2019 Filing 14 CLAIM Claim of Interest in Res by MARINE CONSULTING, INC.. (LEIBY, KENNETH)
July 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by KENNETH L. LEIBY, JR on behalf of M/Y IMOKAYE, Hull No. XSK06539G516, her engines, tackle, equipment, furniture, auxiliary vessels, appurtenances, and necessaries,, MARINE CONSULTING, INC. (LEIBY, KENNETH)
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL T. HOFMANN on behalf of MURCIELAGO, LLC (HOFMANN, PAUL)
July 11, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Intervene . Motion set for 8/5/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Intervene by MURCIELAGO, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SCHWEITZER, TIMOTHY)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by IMOKAYE HOLDINGS LLC re #6 Order on Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem, #7 Warrant Issued, #1 Complaint, #8 Order on Motion to Appoint Custodian (WOOSTER, DANIEL)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Motion Hearing held on 7/1/2019 re #3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem filed by IMOKAYE HOLDINGS LLC, #4 MOTION to Appoint Custodian filed by IMOKAYE HOLDINGS LLC. Court Ordered Motions are Granted. Order to be filed; Warrant to be issued. (jmm, )
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appoint Custodian NATIONAL LIQUIDATORS appointed custodian. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/1/2019. (eaj)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 WARRANT for Arrest in REM issued. (Certified copies given to Attorney at counter) (eaj)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Directing the Clerk to issue the Warrant. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/1/2019. (eaj)
July 1, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Appoint Custodian . Motion set for 8/5/2019 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
July 1, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem . Motion set for 8/5/2019 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to M/Y IMOKAYE, Hull No. XSK06539G516, her engines, tackle, equipment, furniture, auxiliary vessels, appurtenances, and necessaries,, MARINE CONSULTING, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb)
July 1, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - For future reference, an alias should be listed under the alias tab when inputting your party. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. (jdb)
July 1, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Appoint Custodian . Motion set for 8/5/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
July 1, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (eaj)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Custodian by IMOKAYE HOLDINGS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Consent and Indemnification Agreement)(WOOSTER, DANIEL)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by IMOKAYE HOLDINGS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Warrant)(WOOSTER, DANIEL)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMOKAYE HOLDINGS LLC identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (WOOSTER, DANIEL)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M/Y IMOKAYE, Hull No. XSK06539G516, her engines, tackle, equipment, furniture, auxiliary vessels, appurtenances, and necessaries,, MARINE CONSULTING, INC., d/b/a RICK OBEY & ASSOCIATES ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9782592), filed by IMOKAYE HOLDINGS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(WOOSTER, DANIEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IMOKAYE HOLDINGS LLC v. MARINE CONSULTING, INC., d/b/a RICK OBEY & ASSOCIATES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/Y IMOKAYE, Hull No. XSK06539G516, her engines, tackle, equipment, furniture, auxiliary vessels, appurtenances, and necessaries,
Represented By: KENNETH L. LEIBY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARINE CONSULTING, INC.
Represented By: KENNETH L. LEIBY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IMOKAYE HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By: DANIEL HAROLD WOOSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL LIQUIDATORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: MURCIELAGO, LLC
Represented By: TIMOTHY F. SCHWEITZER
Represented By: PAUL T. HOFMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?