TOLVIN v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: ROBIN C TOLVIN
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., BANKS 1-10, JOSEPH J. DOUGHERTY, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, LUCAS MIGNONE, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10 and LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANIES 1-10
Case Number: 3:2019cv15292
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 LETTER ORDER granting the request that the deadlines in the current Pretrial Scheduling Order #19 be stayed through 10/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 9/03/2019. (jem)
August 30, 2019 Filing 20 Letter from the Parties Requesting Stay in Favor of Private Mediation. (MORGAN, MARK)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 10/1/2019 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Plaintiff to initiate the call. Any Motion to Amend the Pleadings and/or Join New Parties due by 10/31/2019. Fact Discovery due by 12/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 8/16/2019. (km)
August 16, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi: Scheduling Conference held on 8/16/2019. (kas)
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 Letter re #12 Order. (CAMPION, GEORGE)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing case against WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. with prejduice. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/8/2019. (km)
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (BETTINO, DIANE)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CONSENT ORDER Extending Dougherty's time to respond to the Complaint; deadline set for 9/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 8/7/2019. (km)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 Letter from Mark Salah Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extending time to Respond to Complaint)(MORGAN, MARK)
August 6, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Proposed Consent Order to Extend Time, d.e. #13 , submitted by Mark Morgan on 8/6/2019 must be executed by a Judicial Officer before filing. Please forward to the appropriate Judicial Officer in accordance with his/her preferred practice as found on our website. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (km)
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by JOSEPH J. DOUGHERTY. (MORGAN, MARK)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER ORDER Adjourning the 7/31/2019 Settlement Conference, converted to a Rule 16 Conference, until 8/16/2019 at 1:00PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 7/30/2019. (km)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER ORDER Converting the 7/31/2019 Settlement Conference to a Rule 16 Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 7/30/2019. (km)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from George G. Campion, Esq. re Order on Oral Motion,. (CAMPION, GEORGE)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Mark Salah Morgan. (MORGAN, MARK)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Discovery Plan by ROBIN C TOLVIN.(CAMPION, GEORGE)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER that the parties shall have until 7/26/2019 to submit a schedule for discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 7/23/2019. (km)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Mark Salah Morgan (joint). (MORGAN, MARK)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANE A. BETTINO on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (BETTINO, DIANE)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - Settlement Conference is hereby scheduled for July 31, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Trenton - Courtroom 7W before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Parties with full settlement authority are required to be present at the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 7/18/2019. (kas)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. The Court requires the parties to engage in expedited discovery. Proposed Joint Discovery Order to be submitted by 7/22/2019, if there is no agreement the parties must submit separate proposed scheduling orders. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/16/2019. (km)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER: In light of the fact the Notice of Removal includes an Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraints, the Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2019 is hereby adjourned to a date to be determined. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 7/15/2019. (kas)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/28/2019 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7W before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 7/15/2019. (km)
July 12, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (jdb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOSEPH J. DOUGHERTY from Monmouth County Superior Court, case number MON-C-79-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9810836), filed by JOSEPH J. DOUGHERTY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service)(MORGAN, MARK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOLVIN v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By: DIANE A. BETTINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANKS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH J. DOUGHERTY
Represented By: MARK S. MORGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUCAS MIGNONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANIES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBIN C TOLVIN
Represented By: GEORGE GERARD CAMPION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?