FMHUB, LLC v. MUNIPLATFORM, LLC et al
Plaintiff: FMHUB, LLC
Defendant: MUNIPLATFORM, LLC, KEVIN TOUHEY and JILL MERGEL
Case Number: 3:2019cv15595
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint on Behalf of Jill Mergel, COUNTERCLAIM of Jill Mergel against FMHUB, LLC by JILL MERGEL.(DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendant Jill Mergel's time to respond to Complaint through and including 9/06/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 08/22/2019. (jmh)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER J. DALTON on behalf of JILL MERGEL (DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extending Time to Respond by JILL MERGEL. (DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
August 16, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by KEVIN TOUHEY, MUNIPLATFORM, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 09/02/2019. (jmh)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney SAM MAYBRUCH,MATTHEW R. GOODE for MUNIPLATFORM, LLC,SAM MAYBRUCH,MATTHEW R. GOODE for KEVIN TOUHEY added. (GOODE, MATTHEW)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JILL MERGEL, MUNIPLATFORM, LLC, KEVIN TOUHEY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr, )
July 19, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - For future reference, an alias should be listed under the alias tab when inputting your party. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. (abr)
July 19, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FMHUB, LLC D/B/A MUNIHUB ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9828619) with JURY DEMAND, filed by FMHUB, LLC D/B/A MUNIHUB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to the Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to the Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to the Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(KLEIN, JUSTIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FMHUB, LLC v. MUNIPLATFORM, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FMHUB, LLC
Represented By: JUSTIN M. KLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUNIPLATFORM, LLC
Represented By: SAM MAYBRUCH
Represented By: MATTHEW R. GOODE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN TOUHEY
Represented By: SAM MAYBRUCH
Represented By: MATTHEW R. GOODE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JILL MERGEL
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. DALTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?