KAZMI TRADING CORP v. LUKOIL NORTH AMERICA LLC
Plaintiff: KAZMI TRADING CORP
Defendant: LUKOIL NORTH AMERICA LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv15634
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15:2801
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Settlement Conference held on 9/3/2019. (jmm, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by GERD W. STABBERT on behalf of KAZMI TRADING CORP (STABBERT, GERD)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ANN MARIE EFFINGHAM on behalf of KAZMI TRADING CORP (EFFINGHAM, ANN)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH TEMPORARY RESTRAINTS. Show Cause Hearing set for 9/3/2019 02:00 PM before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson.. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 08/20/2019. (jmh)
August 20, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Telephone Conference held on 8/20/2019. (Court Reporter/Recorder Vincent Russoniello.) (jmm, )
August 19, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion set for 9/16/2019 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by KAZMI TRADING CORP. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Application for Temporary and Preliminary Restraints, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Syed Kazmi, #3 Exhibit Ex. A, #4 Exhibit Ex. B, #5 Exhibit Ex. C, #6 Exhibit Ex. D, #7 Exhibit Ex. E, #8 Certificate of Service)(CAMPIONE, RONALD)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Verified Complaint served on Scott Kuntz on 08/01/2019, filed by KAZMI TRADING CORP. (CAMPIONE, RONALD)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to LUKOIL NORTH AMERICA LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr, )
July 22, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (abr)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KAZMI TRADING CORP ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9830005) with JURY DEMAND, filed by KAZMI TRADING CORP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - REDACTED FRANCHISE AGREEMENT, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(CAMPIONE, RONALD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KAZMI TRADING CORP v. LUKOIL NORTH AMERICA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAZMI TRADING CORP
Represented By: RONALD J. CAMPIONE
Represented By: ANN MARIE EFFINGHAM
Represented By: GERD W. STABBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUKOIL NORTH AMERICA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?