HERNANDEZ et al v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.
Plaintiff: MARGARET CRINER, TERRI ELSE, GLENN PARKER, MAURA TUSO, GREG HOFER, EDUARDO HERNANDEZ, ROBERT URANTIA and THOMAS BUTLER
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC and JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv15679
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Adam A. Edwards, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 09/12/2019. (jmh)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mark E. Silvey, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 09/12/2019. (jmh)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Gregory F. Coleman, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 09/12/2019. (jmh)
August 28, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, MARK A. NEUBAUER and STEVEN B. WEISBURD, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem)
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Steven B. Weisburd, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CESTA, KENNETH)
August 28, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Mark A. Neubauer, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CESTA, KENNETH)
August 27, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee of $300 received as to Mark A. Neubauer, Esq. and Steven B. Weisburd, Esq., receipt number TRE105335. (jem)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CONSENT ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to Steven B. Weisburd, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 8/27/2019. (jem)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CONSENT ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to Mark A. Neubauer, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 8/27/2019. (jem)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Thien An V. Truong, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 8/22/2019. (jem)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eric S. Johnson, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 8/22/2019. (jem)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the time which defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. may answer, move or otherwise reply to the Complaint for an additional 45 days, or through and including 9/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 8/14/2019. (jem)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.. (CESTA, KENNETH)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time To Answer, Move, etc.)(CESTA, KENNETH)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by KENNETH J. CESTA on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (CESTA, KENNETH)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THOMAS BUTLER, MARGARET CRINER, GLENN PARKER, GREG HOFER, MAURA TUSO, EDUARDO HERNANDEZ, ROBERT URANTIA, TERRI ELSE. JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (BREIT, MITCHELL)
July 30, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gregory F. Coleman, #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adam A. Edwards. Motions set for 9/3/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adam A. Edwards by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BREIT, MITCHELL)
July 30, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mark E. Silvey. Motion set for 9/3/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mark E. Silvey by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BREIT, MITCHELL)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gregory F. Coleman by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BREIT, MITCHELL)
July 25, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice THIEN AN V. TRUONG. Motion set for 8/19/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice THIEN AN V. TRUONG by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BREIT, MITCHELL)
July 25, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Eric S. Johnson. Motion set for 8/19/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Eric S. Johnson by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BREIT, MITCHELL)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb)
July 23, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jdb)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9833400) with JURY DEMAND, filed by THOMAS BUTLER, MARGARET CRINER, GLENN PARKER, GREG HOFER, MAURA TUSO, EDUARDO HERNANDEZ, ROBERT URANTIA, TERRI ELSE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(BREIT, MITCHELL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HERNANDEZ et al v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET CRINER
Represented By: MITCHELL MARK BREIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRI ELSE
Represented By: MITCHELL MARK BREIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLENN PARKER
Represented By: MITCHELL MARK BREIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAURA TUSO
Represented By: MITCHELL MARK BREIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREG HOFER
Represented By: MITCHELL MARK BREIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDUARDO HERNANDEZ
Represented By: MITCHELL MARK BREIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT URANTIA
Represented By: MITCHELL MARK BREIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS BUTLER
Represented By: MITCHELL MARK BREIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.
Represented By: KENNETH J. CESTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?