SCHER v. SHERMAN et al
Plaintiff: ZACHARY SCHER
Defendant: CHELSEA DENAE GILBERT, JOHN ANTHONY BENEMERITO, BEN LAMBERT, CARLY SOUTHER, JOHN BENJAMIN LAMBERT, ESQUIRE CHRISTOPHER RAY, JOHN ANTHONY, ESQUIRE JOHN MCCARTHY, MICHAEL J SHERMAN, CHELSEA DENAE GAINEY, ANDREA MARIE HOLZER, ADAM GREEN, ESQUIRE DAVID GOULD, THE OFFICE OF DASH AND ASSOCIATES LITIGATION DEPARTMENT, LETTERDASH and MICHAEL J. SHERMAN
Case Number: 3:2019cv16077
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of non service on Ben Lambert re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued, by ZACHARY SCHER. (MORRIS, ROBERT)
September 24, 2019 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of non service re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued, by ZACHARY SCHER. (MORRIS, ROBERT)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER of Dismissal as to Defendant Andrea Marie Holzer. **Andrea Marie Holzer terminated. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/18/2019. (jem)
September 13, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ZACHARY SCHER (MORRIS, ROBERT)
September 9, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's #15 Brief Sur Reply Memorandum of Law Contra Defendant Gilbert's Motion to Dismiss by CHELSEA DENAE GILBERT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Envelope)(jem)
September 9, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's #14 Brief Sur Reply Memorandum of Law Contra Defendant Sherman's Motion to Dismiss by MICHAEL J. SHERMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Envelope)(jem)
September 4, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Reply #9 on the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Order by MICHAEL J. SHERMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(jem)
September 4, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Reply #9 on the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Order by CHELSEA DENAE GILBERT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(jem)
September 4, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF Sur Reply Memorandum of Law Contra Defendant Gilbert's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MORRIS, ROBERT)
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF Sur Reply Memorandum of Law Contra Defendant Sherman's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MORRIS, ROBERT)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Plaintiff's Response #9 on the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Order by CHELSEA DENAE GILBERT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Envelope)(jem)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Plaintiff's Response #9 on the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Order by MICHAEL J. SHERMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Envelope)(jem)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 Pro se Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by CHELSEA DENAE GILBERT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jem)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 Pro se Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by MICHAEL J. SHERMAN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jem)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion filed by ZACHARY SCHER re #7 MOTION to Dismiss & Memorandum of Law Contra Defendant Gilbert's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Certificate of Service)(MORRIS, ROBERT)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion filed by ZACHARY SCHER re #6 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law Contra Defendant Sherman's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 proposed order, #2 Brief, #3 Certificate of Service)(MORRIS, ROBERT)
August 20, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 9/16/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
August 20, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 9/16/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by CHELSEA DENAE GILBERT. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)(jem)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by MICHAEL J. SHERMAN. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)(jem)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ZACHARY SCHER. MICHAEL J. SHERMAN served on 8/3/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (MORRIS, ROBERT)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ZACHARY SCHER. CHELSEA DENAE GILBERT served on 8/3/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (MORRIS, ROBERT)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Andrea M Holzer on 07/31/2019 by ZACHARY SCHER. Waiver of Service due by 9/30/2019. (MORRIS, ROBERT)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHN ANTHONY BENEMERITO, CHELSEA DENAE GILBERT, DAVID GOULD, ADAM GREEN, ANDREA MARIE HOLZER, BEN LAMBERT, JOHN MCCARTHY, CHRISTOPHER RAY, MICHAEL J. SHERMAN, CARLY SOUTHER. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
July 31, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (abr)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHELSEA DENAE GILBERT, CHRISTOPHER RAY, JOHN ANTHONY BENEMERITO, CARLY SOUTHER, ANDREA MARIE HOLZER, BEN LAMBERT, DAVID GOULD, JOHN MCCARTHY, ADAM GREEN ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9855985), filed by ZACHARY SCHER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MORRIS, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHER v. SHERMAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHELSEA DENAE GILBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN ANTHONY BENEMERITO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEN LAMBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLY SOUTHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN BENJAMIN LAMBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESQUIRE CHRISTOPHER RAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN ANTHONY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESQUIRE JOHN MCCARTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHELSEA DENAE GAINEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREA MARIE HOLZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESQUIRE DAVID GOULD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE OFFICE OF DASH AND ASSOCIATES LITIGATION DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LETTERDASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J. SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZACHARY SCHER
Represented By: ROBERT MITCHELL MORRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?