VIFOR (INTERNATIONAL) AG et al v. SANDOZ INC.
Plaintiff: AMERICAN REGENT, INC. and VIFOR (INTERNATIONAL) AG
Defendant: SANDOZ INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv16305
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Counterclaim by AMERICAN REGENT, INC., VIFOR (INTERNATIONAL) AG. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM)
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SANDOZ INC. identifying Novartis AG as Corporate Parent.. (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant, Sandoz ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against AMERICAN REGENT, INC., VIFOR (INTERNATIONAL) AG by SANDOZ INC..(ABRAHAM, ERIC)
August 28, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the #10 Order filed by the Clerk's office on 08/28/2019 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (jmh)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 10/23/2019 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 08/27/2019. (jmh)
August 28, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SANDOZ INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 09/11/2019. (jmh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint.. (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC I. ABRAHAM on behalf of All Defendants (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VIFOR (INTERNATIONAL) AG. SANDOZ INC. served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (DENI, WILLIAM)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to SANDOZ INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 AO120 Patent Form filed. (abr)
August 5, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN REGENT, INC.. (DENI, WILLIAM)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VIFOR (INTERNATIONAL) AG. (DENI, WILLIAM)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by J. BRUGH LOWER on behalf of AMERICAN REGENT, INC., VIFOR (INTERNATIONAL) AG (LOWER, J.)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SANDOZ INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9866490), filed by VIFOR (INTERNATIONAL) AG, AMERICAN REGENT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 L. Civ. R. 11.2 Certification)(DENI, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VIFOR (INTERNATIONAL) AG et al v. SANDOZ INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ INC.
Represented By: ERIC I. ABRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN REGENT, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIFOR (INTERNATIONAL) AG
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?