CANSLER et al v. KONDAUR CAPITAL CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL CANSLER, CALVON SIMMONS, TRACEY M. CANSLER and PRINCE SIMMONS
Defendant: WARREN JONES ESQ., HON. KATIE A. GUMMER, ROGELIO SORIA, SPECIALIZED SERVICING, KONDAUR CAPITAL CORPORATION, PROBER & RAPHAEL, A LAW CORP., MCCABE WEISBERG AND CONWAY, SETERUS, OCWEN LOAN SERVICING and SETERUS LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv16540
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying #5 Motion to Appoint Pro Bono for TRACEY M. CANSLER; the Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the Procedural Guide for Pro Se Litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/26/2019. (km)
September 3, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono by TRACEY M. CANSLER. (jdb)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against KATIE A. GUMMER, KONDAUR CAPITAL CORPORATION, MCCABE WEISBERG AND CONWAY, OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, PROBER & RAPHAEL, A LAW CORP., SETERUS LLC, ROGELIO SORIA, SPECIALIZED SERVICING, WARREN JONES ESQ., filed by TRACEY M. CANSLER. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(jdb)
August 22, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jmh)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. However, Plaintiff, who appears to bring suit against Defendants for wrongfully foreclosing on her residence, has improperly filed an interpleader action. Therefore, Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within 20 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 08/22/2019. (jmh)
August 12, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #2 Motion to Appoint Pro Bono submitted by the plaintiff on 08/09/2019 did not contain a proper signature. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER HANDWRITTEN SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jdb)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono by CRYSTAL CANSLER, TRACEY M. CANSLER, CALVON SIMMONS, PRINCE SIMMONS. (jdb)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP, #3 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Exhibit, #6 Envelope)(jdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CANSLER et al v. KONDAUR CAPITAL CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN JONES ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HON. KATIE A. GUMMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGELIO SORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECIALIZED SERVICING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KONDAUR CAPITAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROBER & RAPHAEL, A LAW CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCCABE WEISBERG AND CONWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SETERUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SETERUS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL CANSLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALVON SIMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACEY M. CANSLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRINCE SIMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?